TODD v. RYAN RAMAEL TODD ESTATE et al
Plaintiff: RONNIE RAMAEL TODD
Defendant: RYAN RAMAEL TODD ESTATE, Not Named Graham Estate, CHRISTINE RIDLEY ESTATE, ROONEY TODD ESTATE ET AL, KENNETH SHAUN TODD ESTATE, GRAHAM, LACE MONIQUE LACE MONIQUE GRAHAM, RAMAEL BLACKWELL EL ESTAT, LILA RAMAYA EL ESTATE, JEROME BLACKWELL ESTATE, GARLAND, MERRICK D/B/AMERRICK GARLAND ATTORNEY GENERAL ET AL., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, SAUL, ANDREW D/B/A ANDREW SAUL COMMISSIONER ET AL., SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, YELLEN, JANET LOUISE D/B/A JANET LOUISE YELLEN SECRETARY OF THE TREASURY ET AL., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, BLINKEN, ANTONY D/B/A ANTONY BLINKEN SECRETARY OF STATE ET AL., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, DEBRA ANN HAALAND, CHARLES PAUL RETTIG D/B/A CHARLES PAUL RETTIG COMMISSIONER, ET AL., INTERNAL REVENUE HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, DONNA MARTIN D/B/A DONNA MARTIN PROVOST MARSHAL GENERAL ET AL., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS D/B/A ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS SECRETARY OF HOMELAND SECURITY ET AL., DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, BRNOVICH, MARK D/B/A MARK BRNOVICHATTORNEY GENERAL ET AL.,ARIZONA ATTORNEY GENERAL HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, EISELE, BRETT D/B/A BRETT EISELECENTRAL PINAL JUSTICE COURT PRECINCT 3 JUDGE ET AL.,CEN CENTRAL PINAL JUSTICE COURT PRECINCT 3 HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, TINGLING, MILTON ADAIR D/B/A MILTON ADAIR TINGLING NEW YORK COUNTY CLERK/SUPREME COURT CLERK ET AL., NEW YORK COUNTY HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, JAMES, LETITIA D/B/A LETITIA JAMES ATTORNEY GENERAL ET AL., NEW YORK ATTORNEY GENERAL HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, LUNDFELT, GEOFF D/B/A GEOFF LUNDFELTCHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER ET AL., ALASKA USA FEDERAL CREDIT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, KADISHA, NEIL D/B/A NEIL KADISHA CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER ET AL., OMNINET CAPITAL, LLC D/B/A OMNINET SOUTHWEST D/B/A VALENCIA PARK APARTMENTS HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, BRUTINEL, ROBERT D/B/A ROBERT BRUTINEL CHIEF JUSTICE OF THE SUPREME COURT ET AL., ARIZONA CHIEF JUSTICE, GOODAY, HENRY JR D/B/A HENRY GOODAY JR PINAL COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT JUDGE ET AL., PINAL COUNTY SUPERIOR COURTHEIRS AND ASSIGNS, MITCHELL, CHELSEA D/B/ACHELSEA MITCHELL PROSECUTOR/ATTORNEY ET AL.,PINAL COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICEHEIRS AND ASSIGNS, MCDERMOTT, THOMAS D/B/A THOMAS MCDERMOTT PROSECUTOR/ATTORNEY ET AL., PINAL COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, MARK LAMB D/B/A MARK LAMB PINAL COUNTY SHERIFF ET AL.,PINAL COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, LOUIS DeJOY D/B/A LOUIS DEJOYPOSTMASTER GENERAL ET AL., UNITED STATES POST OFFICEHEIRS AND ASSIGNS, ROSADO, ROSSANA D/B/A ROSSANA ROSADO NEW YORK SECRETARY OF STATE ET AL., NEW YORK SECRETARY OF STATE HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, STRINGER, SCOTT M D/B/A SCOTT M. STRINGER NEW YORK CITY COMPTROLLER ET AL., NYC COMPTROLLER'S OFFICEHEIRS AND ASSIGNS, DINAPOLI, THOMAS D/B/A THOMAS DINAPOLI NEW YORK STATE COMPTROLLER ET AL., NEW YORK COMPTROLLER'S OFFICE, JOHNSON, JANET D/B/A JANET JOHNSON CLERK OF THE ARIZONA SUPREME COURT ET AL., ARIZONA SUPREME COURTHEIRS AND ASSIGNS, JASIMINE K. WARD, PADILLA, REBECCA D/B/A REBECCA PADILLA CLERK OF THE PINAL COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ET AL.,PINAL COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, GRANT MURRAY SNOW D/B/A GRANT MURRAY SNOW CHIEF JUDGE OF THE DISTRICT COURT OF THE UNITED STATES ET AL., DISTRICT COURT OF THE UNITED STATESHEIRS AND ASSIGNS, DEBRA LUCAS D/B/A DEBRA LUCAS CLERK OF THE DISTRICT COURT OF UNITED STATES ET AL DISTRICT COURT OF THE UNITED STATES HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, DRIGGS, LEONORE D/B/A LEONORE DRIGGS ARCADIA BILTMORE JUSTICE COURT JUDGE ET AL.,ARCADIA BILTMORE JUSTICE COURTHEIRS AND ASSIGNS, ANDREW M. HULL M. D/B/A ANDREW M. HULL#004153, HOLLIDAY, DENISE D/B/A DENISE HOLLIDAY #017275 HOLLIDAY, KEVIN D/B/AKEVIN HOLLIDAY #017276 SCHLABACK, MATTHEW R. D/B/A MATTHEW SCHLABACH#034118 ATTORNEYS/NEXT OF FRIEND ET AL.,HULL,HOLLIDAY & HOLLIDAY P, RICHER,STEPHEN D/B/A STEPHEN RICHER MARICOPA COUNTY RECORDER ET AL., MARICOPA COUNTY RECORDER OFFICE HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, WILLIAMS, JERI.L D/B/A JERI L. WILLIAMS CHIEF POLICE OF PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT ET AL., PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT HEADQUARTERHEIRS AND ASSIGNS, WILLER, BLAKE D/B/A BLAKE WILLER BADGE # 10328 POLICE OFFICER ET AL., DESERT HORIZON PRECINCT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, ALTNEU, MATTHEW D/B/A MATTHEW ALTNEUBADGE # 11073 POLICE OFFICER ET AL., DESERT HORIZON PRECINCT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, ROSCOE, DOUGLAS ANTHONY JR D/B/A DOUGLAS A.ROSCOE JR D/B/A DOUG DUCEY ARIZONA GOVERNOR ET AL., OFFICE OF THE ARIZONA GOVERNOR HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, PAUL PENZONE D/B/A PAUL PENZONE MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF ET AL., MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, DRAKULICH, GENE D/B/A GENE DRAKULICH RENO MUNICIPAL COURT JUDGE ET AL., RENO MUNICIPAL COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, CHEUVRONT, KEN D/B/A KEN CHEUVRONT JUSTICE COURT JUDGE ET AL., MARICOPA COUNTY JUSTICE COURT EIRS AND ASSIGNS, ROBERTS, ANN D/B/A ANN ROBERTS PROSECUTOR ET AL., COCHISE COUNTY JUSTICE COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, STAGGS, BRUCE D/B/A BRUCE STAGGS, JUSTICE COURT JUDGE ET AL., COCHISE COUNTY JUSTICE COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, JOHNSON, LISA MUTH D/B/A LISA JOHNSON MESA MUNICIPAL COURT JUDGE ET AL., MESA MUNICIPAL COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, RIGGS, TAMMY D/B/A TAMMY RIGGS RENO MUNICIPAL COURT JUDGE ET AL., RENO MUNICIPAL COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, ONEILL, SHELLY D/B/A SHELLY ONEILL RENO MUNICIPAL COURT JUDGE ET AL., RENO MUNICIPAL COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, MCCARTHY, BARBARA D/B/A BARBARA MCCARTHY MUNICIPAL COURT JUDGE ET AL., SPARKS MUNICIPAL COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, RAY, JORDAN D/B/A JORDAN RAY (HIGHLAND) JUSTICE COURT JUDGE ET AL., MARICOPA COUNTY JUSTICE COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, WATTS, DONALD D/B/A DONALD WATTS MANISTEE JUSTICE COURT JUDGE ET AL., MARICOPA COUNTY JUSTICE COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, BEGAY, DEBORAH D/B/A DEBORAH BEGAYMOON VALLEY JUSTICE COURT JUDGE ET AL., MARICOPA COUNTY JUSTICE COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, COOK,EDDIE D/B/A EDDIE COOK MARICOPA COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR ET AL., MARICOPA COUNTY ASSESSOR'S OFFICE HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, BRENT A HAYMORE D/B/A BRENT A HAYMOREBENSON POLICE OFFICER ET AL.,BENSON POLICE DEPARTMENT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, JOSEPH ATTAWAY ESTATE, TERRANCE JOHNSON ESTATE, OROARK, PATRICIA D/B/A PATRICIA OROARK VICE PRESIDENT ET AL.,DUNLAP & MAGEE/LA TERRAZA APARTMENTS HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, COLANDA MARIE DUERSON ESTATE, CARMEL LOLA DUERSON ESTATE, CHRYSTIANA MYEA DUERSON ESTATE, LAND RAMARI EL ESTATE, FUENTES LOMELI, LESLIE D/B/A LESLIE FUENTES LOMELI BADGE #11528 PHOENIX POLICE OFFICER/PRIVATEER ET AL., MOUNTAIN VIEW PRECINCT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, JOHNSON, TANNER D/B/A TANNER JOHNSON BADGE #10563 PHOENIX POLICE/PRIVATEER ET AL., MOUNTAIN VIEW PRECINCT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, NARBAEZ, ROMAN D/B/A ROMAN NARBAEZ BADGE #8988 PHOENIX POLICE/PRIVATEER ET AL., MOUNTAIN VIEW PRECINCT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, VNGUIEN, LIZ D/B/A LIZ VNGUIEN ET AL. PRO TEMPORE JUDGE/PRIVATEER ET AL., ARCADIA BILTMORE JUSTICE COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, MITCHELL, RACHEL H D/B/ARACHELL H. MITCHELL ET AL., MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY ET AL., HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, VINCENT ANTHONY DUVAL JR ESTATE, LOGAN, STEVEN PAUL D/B/A STEVEN P. LOGAN UNITED STATES DISTRICT JUDGE ET AL., UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURTHEIRS AND ASSIGNS, MILLER, KIMBERLY D/B/A KIMBERLY MILLER LA TERRAZA APARTMENTS MANAGER ET AL., HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, PRATER, J D/B/A J. PRATER BADGE # 8534, PHOENIX POLICE OFFICER, LUMLEY, I D/B/A I. LUMLEY BADGE # 9901 PHOENIX POLICE OFFICER ET AL PHOENIX POLICE HEADQUARTERS HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, PAGANETTI, BILL D/B/A BILL PAGANETTI PRESIDENT/GEN MGR/OWNER, PEPPERMILL HOTEL & CASINO ET AL. HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, TAYLOR, BRACLE DON III D/B/A BRACLE DON TAYLOR III CHIEF JUDGE OF PHOENIX MUNICIPAL COURT ET AL., PHOENIX MUNICIPAL COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, ZUCKERBERG, MARK D/B/A MARK ZUCKERBERG CEO OF META/FACEBOOK ET AL., HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, HOCHUL, KATHY D/B/A KATHY HOCHUL GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK ET AL., HEIRS AND ASSIGNS and BIDEN, JOSEPH ROBINETTE D/B/A JOSEPH ROBINETTE BIDEN PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA ET AL., HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Case Number: 2:2022cv04777
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #4 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by RONNIE RAMAEL TODD. USCA Case Number 22-3366 (JL)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT ARE STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 12/22/22. 12/23/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
December 20, 2022 Filing 9 RONNIE RAMAEL TODD PROOF OF CONSIDERATION FOR NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(JL)
December 20, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALTNEU, MATTHEW, BEGAY, DEBORAH, CARMEL LOLA DUERSON ESTATE, CHRYSTIANA MYEA DUERSON ESTATE, ROSCOE, DOUGLAS ANTHONY JR, WATTS, DONALD, CHEUVRONT, KEN, FUENTES LOMELI, LESLIE, HOCHUL, KATHY, JOHNSON, LISA MUTH, LOGAN, STEVEN PAUL, MILLER, KIMBERLY, ONEILL, SHELLY, PAGANETTI, BILL, RIGGS, TAMMY, VINCENT ANTHONY DUVAL JR ESTATE, WILLER, BLAKE, BIDEN, JOSEPH ROBINETTE, BLINKEN, ANTONY, BRNOVICH, MARK, BRUTINEL, ROBERT, CHRISTINE RIDLEY ESTATE, COLANDA MARIE DUERSON ESTATE, COOK,EDDIE, DINAPOLI, THOMAS, DRAKULICH, GENE, DRIGGS, LEONORE, LOUIS DeJOY, EISELE, BRETT, GARLAND, MERRICK, GOODAY, HENRY JR, GRAHAM, LACE MONIQUE LACE MONIQUE GRAHAM, DEBRA ANN HAALAND, BRENT A HAYMORE, ANDREW M. HULL, JAMES, LETITIA, JEROME BLACKWELL ESTATE, JOHNSON, JANET, JOHNSON, TANNER, JOSEPH ATTAWAY ESTATE, KADISHA, NEIL, KENNETH SHAUN TODD ESTATE, MARK LAMB, LAND RAMARI EL ESTATE, LILA RAMAYA EL ESTATE, DEBRA LUCAS, LUMLEY, I, LUNDFELT, GEOFF, DONNA MARTIN, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, MCCARTHY, BARBARA, MCDERMOTT, THOMAS, MITCHELL, CHELSEA, MITCHELL, RACHEL H, NARBAEZ, ROMAN, Not Named Graham Estate, OROARK, PATRICIA, PADILLA, REBECCA, PAUL PENZONE, PHOENIX POLICE OFFICER, PRATER, J, RAMAEL BLACKWELL EL ESTAT, RAY, JORDAN, CHARLES PAUL RETTIG, RICHER,STEPHEN, ROBERTS, ANN, ROONEY TODD ESTATE ET AL, ROSADO, ROSSANA, RYAN RAMAEL TODD ESTATE, SAUL, ANDREW, GRANT MURRAY SNOW, STRINGER, SCOTT M, TAYLOR, BRACLE DON III, TERRANCE JOHNSON ESTATE, TINGLING, MILTON ADAIR, VNGUIEN, LIZ, JASIMINE K. WARD, WILLIAMS, JERI.L, YELLEN, JANET LOUISE, ZUCKERBERG, MARK, filed by RONNIE RAMAEL TODD.(JL) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/20/2022) (jl). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2022: #1 EMAIL) (jl). Modified on 12/23/2022 (jl). (STRICKEN PER #10)
December 19, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALTNEU, MATTHEW, BEGAY, DEBORAH, CARMEL LOLA DUERSON ESTATE, CHRYSTIANA MYEA DUERSON ESTATE, ROSCOE, DOUGLAS ANTHONY JR, WATTS, DONALD, CHEUVRONT, KEN, FUENTES LOMELI, LESLIE, HOCHUL, KATHY, JOHNSON, LISA MUTH, LOGAN, STEVEN PAUL, MILLER, KIMBERLY, ONEILL, SHELLY, PAGANETTI, BILL, RIGGS, TAMMY, STAGGS, BRUCE, VINCENT ANTHONY DUVAL JR ESTATE, WILLER, BLAKE, BIDEN, JOSEPH ROBINETTE, BLINKEN, ANTONY, BRNOVICH, MARK, BRUTINEL, ROBERT, CHRISTINE RIDLEY ESTATE, COLANDA MARIE DUERSON ESTATE, COOK,EDDIE, DINAPOLI, THOMAS, DRAKULICH, GENE, DRIGGS, LEONORE, LOUIS DeJOY, EISELE, BRETT, GARLAND, MERRICK, GOODAY, HENRY JR, GRAHAM, LACE MONIQUE LACE MONIQUE GRAHAM, DEBRA ANN HAALAND, BRENT A HAYMORE, ANDREW M. HULL, JAMES, LETITIA, JEROME BLACKWELL ESTATE, JOHNSON, JANET, JOHNSON, TANNER, JOSEPH ATTAWAY ESTATE, KADISHA, NEIL, KENNETH SHAUN TODD ESTATE, MARK LAMB, LAND RAMARI EL ESTATE, LILA RAMAYA EL ESTATE, DEBRA LUCAS, LUMLEY, I, LUNDFELT, GEOFF, DONNA MARTIN, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, MCCARTHY, BARBARA, MCDERMOTT, THOMAS, MITCHELL, CHELSEA, MITCHELL, RACHEL H, NARBAEZ, ROMAN, Not Named Graham Estate, OROARK, PATRICIA, PADILLA, REBECCA, PAUL PENZONE, PHOENIX POLICE OFFICER, PRATER, J, RAMAEL BLACKWELL EL ESTAT, RAY, JORDAN, CHARLES PAUL RETTIG, RICHER,STEPHEN, ROBERTS, ANN, ROONEY TODD ESTATE ET AL, ROSADO, ROSSANA, RYAN RAMAEL TODD ESTATE, SAUL, ANDREW, GRANT MURRAY SNOW, STRINGER, SCOTT M, TAYLOR, BRACLE DON III, TERRANCE JOHNSON ESTATE, TINGLING, MILTON ADAIR, VNGUIEN, LIZ, JASIMINE K. WARD, WILLIAMS, JERI.L, YELLEN, JANET LOUISE, ZUCKERBERG, MARK, filed by RONNIE RAMAEL TODD. (Attachments: #1 E-MAIL)(bw) (STRICKEN PER #10)
December 15, 2022 Filing 6 PROOF OF CONSIDERATION by RONNIE RAMAEL TODD (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(JL)
December 15, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALTNEU, MATTHEW, BEGAY, DEBORAH, CARMEL LOLA DUERSON ESTATE, CHRYSTIANA MYEA DUERSON ESTATE, ROSCOE, DOUGLAS ANTHONY JR, WATTS, DONALD, CHEUVRONT, KEN, FUENTES LOMELI, LESLIE, HOCHUL, KATHY, JOHNSON, LISA MUTH, LOGAN, STEVEN PAUL, MILLER, KIMBERLY, ONEILL, SHELLY, PAGANETTI, BILL, RIGGS, TAMMY, STAGGS, BRUCE, VINCENT ANTHONY DUVAL JR ESTATE, WILLER, BLAKE, BIDEN, JOSEPH ROBINETTE, BLINKEN, ANTONY, BRNOVICH, MARK, BRUTINEL, ROBERT, CHRISTINE RIDLEY ESTATE, COLANDA MARIE DUERSON ESTATE, COOK,EDDIE, DINAPOLI, THOMAS, DRAKULICH, GENE, DRIGGS, LEONORE, LOUIS DeJOY, EISELE, BRETT, GARLAND, MERRICK, GOODAY, HENRY JR, GRAHAM, LACE MONIQUE LACE MONIQUE GRAHAM, DEBRA ANN HAALAND, BRENT A HAYMORE, ANDREW M. HULL, JAMES, LETITIA, JEROME BLACKWELL ESTATE, JOHNSON, JANET, JOHNSON, TANNER, JOSEPH ATTAWAY ESTATE, KADISHA, NEIL, KENNETH SHAUN TODD ESTATE, MARK LAMB, LAND RAMARI EL ESTATE, LILA RAMAYA EL ESTATE, DEBRA LUCAS, LUMLEY, I, LUNDFELT, GEOFF, DONNA MARTIN, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, MCCARTHY, BARBARA, MCDERMOTT, THOMAS, MITCHELL, CHELSEA, MITCHELL, RACHEL H, NARBAEZ, ROMAN, Not Named Graham Estate, OROARK, PATRICIA, PADILLA, REBECCA, PAUL PENZONE, PHOENIX POLICE OFFICER, PRATER, J, RAMAEL BLACKWELL EL ESTAT, RAY, JORDAN, CHARLES PAUL RETTIG, RICHER,STEPHEN, ROBERTS, ANN, ROONEY TODD ESTATE ET AL, ROSADO, ROSSANA, RYAN RAMAEL TODD ESTATE, SAUL, ANDREW, GRANT MURRAY SNOW, STRINGER, SCOTT M, TAYLOR, BRACLE DON III, TERRANCE JOHNSON ESTATE, TINGLING, MILTON ADAIR, VNGUIEN, LIZ, JASIMINE K. WARD, WILLIAMS, JERI.L, YELLEN, JANET LOUISE, ZUCKERBERG, MARK, filed by RONNIE RAMAEL TODD. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(JL)
December 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #3 Pro Se Civil Admin Order 5,, by RONNIE RAMAEL TODD. (NO IFP GRANTED, NO FEE PAID) (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(JL)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF HAVING FILE A COMPLAINT WITH THE COURT WITHOUT EITHER PAYING THE FEES TO COMMENCE A CIVIL ACTION OR FILING A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, PLAINTIFF MUST, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER PAY $402 TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, THE CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 12/12/22. 12/13/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
November 30, 2022 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (JL)
November 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALTNEU, MATTHEW, BEGAY, DEBORAH, CARMEL LOLA DUERSON ESTATE, CHRYSTIANA MYEA DUERSON ESTATE, ROSCOE, DOUGLAS ANTHONY JR, WATTS, DONALD, CHEUVRONT, KEN, FUENTES LOMELI, LESLIE, HOCHUL, KATHY, JOHNSON, LISA MUTH, LOGAN, STEVEN PAUL, MILLER, KIMBERLY, ONEILL, SHELLY, PAGANETTI, BILL, RIGGS, TAMMY, STAGGS, BRUCE, VINCENT ANTHONY DUVAL JR ESTATE, WILLER, BLAKE, BIDEN, JOSEPH ROBINETTE, BLINKEN, ANTONY, BRNOVICH, MARK, BRUTINEL, ROBERT, CHRISTINE RIDLEY ESTATE, COLANDA MARIE DUERSON ESTATE, COOK,EDDIE, DINAPOLI, THOMAS, DRAKULICH, GENE, DRIGGS, LEONORE, LOUIS DeJOY, EISELE, BRETT, GARLAND, MERRICK, GOODAY, HENRY JR, GRAHAM, LACE MONIQUE LACE MONIQUE GRAHAM, DEBRA ANN HAALAND, BRENT A HAYMORE, ANDREW M. HULL, JAMES, LETITIA, JEROME BLACKWELL ESTATE, JOHNSON, JANET, JOHNSON, TANNER, JOSEPH ATTAWAY ESTATE, KADISHA, NEIL, KENNETH SHAUN TODD ESTATE, MARK LAMB, LAND RAMARI EL ESTATE, LILA RAMAYA EL ESTATE, DEBRA LUCAS, LUMLEY, I, LUNDFELT, GEOFF, DONNA MARTIN, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, MCCARTHY, BARBARA, MCDERMOTT, THOMAS, MITCHELL, CHELSEA, MITCHELL, RACHEL H, NARBAEZ, ROMAN, Not Named Graham Estate, OROARK, PATRICIA, PADILLA, REBECCA, PAUL PENZONE, PHOENIX POLICE OFFICER, PRATER, J, RAMAEL BLACKWELL EL ESTAT, RAY, JORDAN, CHARLES PAUL RETTIG, RICHER,STEPHEN, ROBERTS, ANN, ROONEY TODD ESTATE ET AL, ROSADO, ROSSANA, RYAN RAMAEL TODD ESTATE, SAUL, ANDREW, GRANT MURRAY SNOW, STRINGER, SCOTT M, TAYLOR, BRACLE DON III, TERRANCE JOHNSON ESTATE, TINGLING, MILTON ADAIR, VNGUIEN, LIZ, JASIMINE K. WARD, WILLIAMS, JERI.L, YELLEN, JANET LOUISE, ZUCKERBERG, MARK, filed by RONNIE RAMEAL TODD. (NO FEE PAID, NO IFP MOTION) (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4)(JL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TODD v. RYAN RAMAEL TODD ESTATE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONNIE RAMAEL TODD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN RAMAEL TODD ESTATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Not Named Graham Estate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINE RIDLEY ESTATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROONEY TODD ESTATE ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH SHAUN TODD ESTATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAHAM, LACE MONIQUE LACE MONIQUE GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAMAEL BLACKWELL EL ESTAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LILA RAMAYA EL ESTATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEROME BLACKWELL ESTATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLAND, MERRICK D/B/AMERRICK GARLAND ATTORNEY GENERAL ET AL., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAUL, ANDREW D/B/A ANDREW SAUL COMMISSIONER ET AL., SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YELLEN, JANET LOUISE D/B/A JANET LOUISE YELLEN SECRETARY OF THE TREASURY ET AL., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLINKEN, ANTONY D/B/A ANTONY BLINKEN SECRETARY OF STATE ET AL., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA ANN HAALAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES PAUL RETTIG D/B/A CHARLES PAUL RETTIG COMMISSIONER, ET AL., INTERNAL REVENUE HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNA MARTIN D/B/A DONNA MARTIN PROVOST MARSHAL GENERAL ET AL., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS D/B/A ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS SECRETARY OF HOMELAND SECURITY ET AL., DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRNOVICH, MARK D/B/A MARK BRNOVICHATTORNEY GENERAL ET AL.,ARIZONA ATTORNEY GENERAL HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EISELE, BRETT D/B/A BRETT EISELECENTRAL PINAL JUSTICE COURT PRECINCT 3 JUDGE ET AL.,CEN CENTRAL PINAL JUSTICE COURT PRECINCT 3 HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TINGLING, MILTON ADAIR D/B/A MILTON ADAIR TINGLING NEW YORK COUNTY CLERK/SUPREME COURT CLERK ET AL., NEW YORK COUNTY HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES, LETITIA D/B/A LETITIA JAMES ATTORNEY GENERAL ET AL., NEW YORK ATTORNEY GENERAL HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUNDFELT, GEOFF D/B/A GEOFF LUNDFELTCHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER ET AL., ALASKA USA FEDERAL CREDIT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KADISHA, NEIL D/B/A NEIL KADISHA CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER ET AL., OMNINET CAPITAL, LLC D/B/A OMNINET SOUTHWEST D/B/A VALENCIA PARK APARTMENTS HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUTINEL, ROBERT D/B/A ROBERT BRUTINEL CHIEF JUSTICE OF THE SUPREME COURT ET AL., ARIZONA CHIEF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODAY, HENRY JR D/B/A HENRY GOODAY JR PINAL COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT JUDGE ET AL., PINAL COUNTY SUPERIOR COURTHEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITCHELL, CHELSEA D/B/ACHELSEA MITCHELL PROSECUTOR/ATTORNEY ET AL.,PINAL COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICEHEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCDERMOTT, THOMAS D/B/A THOMAS MCDERMOTT PROSECUTOR/ATTORNEY ET AL., PINAL COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK LAMB D/B/A MARK LAMB PINAL COUNTY SHERIFF ET AL.,PINAL COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS DeJOY D/B/A LOUIS DEJOYPOSTMASTER GENERAL ET AL., UNITED STATES POST OFFICEHEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSADO, ROSSANA D/B/A ROSSANA ROSADO NEW YORK SECRETARY OF STATE ET AL., NEW YORK SECRETARY OF STATE HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STRINGER, SCOTT M D/B/A SCOTT M. STRINGER NEW YORK CITY COMPTROLLER ET AL., NYC COMPTROLLER'S OFFICEHEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DINAPOLI, THOMAS D/B/A THOMAS DINAPOLI NEW YORK STATE COMPTROLLER ET AL., NEW YORK COMPTROLLER'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON, JANET D/B/A JANET JOHNSON CLERK OF THE ARIZONA SUPREME COURT ET AL., ARIZONA SUPREME COURTHEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASIMINE K. WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PADILLA, REBECCA D/B/A REBECCA PADILLA CLERK OF THE PINAL COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ET AL.,PINAL COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRANT MURRAY SNOW D/B/A GRANT MURRAY SNOW CHIEF JUDGE OF THE DISTRICT COURT OF THE UNITED STATES ET AL., DISTRICT COURT OF THE UNITED STATESHEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA LUCAS D/B/A DEBRA LUCAS CLERK OF THE DISTRICT COURT OF UNITED STATES ET AL DISTRICT COURT OF THE UNITED STATES HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRIGGS, LEONORE D/B/A LEONORE DRIGGS ARCADIA BILTMORE JUSTICE COURT JUDGE ET AL.,ARCADIA BILTMORE JUSTICE COURTHEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. HULL M. D/B/A ANDREW M. HULL#004153, HOLLIDAY, DENISE D/B/A DENISE HOLLIDAY #017275 HOLLIDAY, KEVIN D/B/AKEVIN HOLLIDAY #017276 SCHLABACK, MATTHEW R. D/B/A MATTHEW SCHLABACH#034118 ATTORNEYS/NEXT OF FRIEND ET AL.,HULL,HOLLIDAY & HOLLIDAY P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHER,STEPHEN D/B/A STEPHEN RICHER MARICOPA COUNTY RECORDER ET AL., MARICOPA COUNTY RECORDER OFFICE HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAMS, JERI.L D/B/A JERI L. WILLIAMS CHIEF POLICE OF PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT ET AL., PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT HEADQUARTERHEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLER, BLAKE D/B/A BLAKE WILLER BADGE # 10328 POLICE OFFICER ET AL., DESERT HORIZON PRECINCT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTNEU, MATTHEW D/B/A MATTHEW ALTNEUBADGE # 11073 POLICE OFFICER ET AL., DESERT HORIZON PRECINCT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSCOE, DOUGLAS ANTHONY JR D/B/A DOUGLAS A.ROSCOE JR D/B/A DOUG DUCEY ARIZONA GOVERNOR ET AL., OFFICE OF THE ARIZONA GOVERNOR HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL PENZONE D/B/A PAUL PENZONE MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF ET AL., MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRAKULICH, GENE D/B/A GENE DRAKULICH RENO MUNICIPAL COURT JUDGE ET AL., RENO MUNICIPAL COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEUVRONT, KEN D/B/A KEN CHEUVRONT JUSTICE COURT JUDGE ET AL., MARICOPA COUNTY JUSTICE COURT EIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERTS, ANN D/B/A ANN ROBERTS PROSECUTOR ET AL., COCHISE COUNTY JUSTICE COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STAGGS, BRUCE D/B/A BRUCE STAGGS, JUSTICE COURT JUDGE ET AL., COCHISE COUNTY JUSTICE COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON, LISA MUTH D/B/A LISA JOHNSON MESA MUNICIPAL COURT JUDGE ET AL., MESA MUNICIPAL COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIGGS, TAMMY D/B/A TAMMY RIGGS RENO MUNICIPAL COURT JUDGE ET AL., RENO MUNICIPAL COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONEILL, SHELLY D/B/A SHELLY ONEILL RENO MUNICIPAL COURT JUDGE ET AL., RENO MUNICIPAL COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCCARTHY, BARBARA D/B/A BARBARA MCCARTHY MUNICIPAL COURT JUDGE ET AL., SPARKS MUNICIPAL COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAY, JORDAN D/B/A JORDAN RAY (HIGHLAND) JUSTICE COURT JUDGE ET AL., MARICOPA COUNTY JUSTICE COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATTS, DONALD D/B/A DONALD WATTS MANISTEE JUSTICE COURT JUDGE ET AL., MARICOPA COUNTY JUSTICE COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEGAY, DEBORAH D/B/A DEBORAH BEGAYMOON VALLEY JUSTICE COURT JUDGE ET AL., MARICOPA COUNTY JUSTICE COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK,EDDIE D/B/A EDDIE COOK MARICOPA COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR ET AL., MARICOPA COUNTY ASSESSOR'S OFFICE HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENT A HAYMORE D/B/A BRENT A HAYMOREBENSON POLICE OFFICER ET AL.,BENSON POLICE DEPARTMENT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH ATTAWAY ESTATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRANCE JOHNSON ESTATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OROARK, PATRICIA D/B/A PATRICIA OROARK VICE PRESIDENT ET AL.,DUNLAP & MAGEE/LA TERRAZA APARTMENTS HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLANDA MARIE DUERSON ESTATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARMEL LOLA DUERSON ESTATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRYSTIANA MYEA DUERSON ESTATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAND RAMARI EL ESTATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FUENTES LOMELI, LESLIE D/B/A LESLIE FUENTES LOMELI BADGE #11528 PHOENIX POLICE OFFICER/PRIVATEER ET AL., MOUNTAIN VIEW PRECINCT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON, TANNER D/B/A TANNER JOHNSON BADGE #10563 PHOENIX POLICE/PRIVATEER ET AL., MOUNTAIN VIEW PRECINCT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NARBAEZ, ROMAN D/B/A ROMAN NARBAEZ BADGE #8988 PHOENIX POLICE/PRIVATEER ET AL., MOUNTAIN VIEW PRECINCT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VNGUIEN, LIZ D/B/A LIZ VNGUIEN ET AL. PRO TEMPORE JUDGE/PRIVATEER ET AL., ARCADIA BILTMORE JUSTICE COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITCHELL, RACHEL H D/B/ARACHELL H. MITCHELL ET AL., MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY ET AL., HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VINCENT ANTHONY DUVAL JR ESTATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOGAN, STEVEN PAUL D/B/A STEVEN P. LOGAN UNITED STATES DISTRICT JUDGE ET AL., UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURTHEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILLER, KIMBERLY D/B/A KIMBERLY MILLER LA TERRAZA APARTMENTS MANAGER ET AL., HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRATER, J D/B/A J. PRATER BADGE # 8534
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHOENIX POLICE OFFICER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUMLEY, I D/B/A I. LUMLEY BADGE # 9901 PHOENIX POLICE OFFICER ET AL PHOENIX POLICE HEADQUARTERS HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAGANETTI, BILL D/B/A BILL PAGANETTI PRESIDENT/GEN MGR/OWNER, PEPPERMILL HOTEL & CASINO ET AL. HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAYLOR, BRACLE DON III D/B/A BRACLE DON TAYLOR III CHIEF JUDGE OF PHOENIX MUNICIPAL COURT ET AL., PHOENIX MUNICIPAL COURT HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZUCKERBERG, MARK D/B/A MARK ZUCKERBERG CEO OF META/FACEBOOK ET AL., HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOCHUL, KATHY D/B/A KATHY HOCHUL GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK ET AL., HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIDEN, JOSEPH ROBINETTE D/B/A JOSEPH ROBINETTE BIDEN PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA ET AL., HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?