LASSITER v. 801 RESIDENCE et al
Plaintiff: JIHAAD R LASSITER
Defendant: 801 RESIDENCE, SAMUEL A BERGER, HENRY A BERGER, COMMUNITY REALTY MANAGEMENT, INC., AMERICAN POSTAL WORKERS HOUSE ASSOCIATES, BERGER ASSOCIATES LLC, ROBERT BERGER, JOSEPH BERGER, ERICA JOHNSON, NAKEISHA SIMMONS, AMERICAN POSTAL WORKERS HOUSE Residential Property doing business as PHILADELPHIA POSTAL UNION HOUSING CORPORATION and AMERICAN POSTAL WORKERS HOUSE (APWH) RESIDENTIAL PROPERTY doing business as PHILADELPHIA POSTAL UNION HOUSING CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2022cv05224
Filed: December 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN F MURPHY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2023 COPY OF DOC. NO. 3 HAS BEEN MAILED TO UNREPS. (bw)
February 1, 2023 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by 801 RESIDENCE, COMMUNITY REALTY MANAGEMENT, INC., ERICA JOHNSON, NAKEISHA SIMMONS.(KAYE, MARJORIE)
January 31, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah B. Simanglatt on behalf of 801 RESIDENCE, COMMUNITY REALTY MANAGEMENT, INC., ERICA JOHNSON, NAKEISHA SIMMONS with Certificate of Service(Simanglatt, Sarah)
January 31, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MARJORIE KAYE, JR on behalf of 801 RESIDENCE, COMMUNITY REALTY MANAGEMENT, INC., ERICA JOHNSON, NAKEISHA SIMMONS with Certificate of Service(KAYE, MARJORIE)
January 31, 2023 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COMMUNITY REALTY MANAGEMENT, INC., ERICA JOHNSON, 801 RESIDENCE, NAKEISHA SIMMONS. COMMUNITY REALTY MANAGEMENT, INC. waiver sent on 1/19/2023, answer due 3/20/2023; ERICA JOHNSON waiver sent on 1/19/2023, answer due 3/20/2023; 801 RESIDENCE waiver sent on 1/19/2023, answer due 3/20/2023; NAKEISHA SIMMONS waiver sent on 1/19/2023, answer due 3/20/2023. (KAYE, MARJORIE)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE TO HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS SIGNED BY GEORGE V. WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/30/23. 1/31/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO UNREPS.(bw) Modified on 2/1/2023 (bw). Modified on 2/1/2023 (bw).
December 30, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to 801 RESIDENCE, AMERICAN POSTAL WORKERS HOUSE (APWH), AMERICAN POSTAL WORKERS HOUSE ASSOCIATES, HENRY A BERGER, JOSEPH BERGER, ROBERT BERGER, SAMUEL A BERGER, BERGER ASSOCIATES LLC, COMMUNITY REALTY MANAGEMENT, INC., ERICA JOHNSON, NAKEISHA SIMMONS. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 12/30/22 (bw)
December 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 801 RESIDENCE, AMERICAN POSTAL WORKERS HOUSE, AMERICAN POSTAL WORKERS HOUSE ASSOCIATES, HENRY A BERGER, JOSEPH BERGER, ROBERT BERGER, SAMUEL A BERGER, BERGER ASSOCIATES LLC, COMMUNITY REALTY MANAGEMENT, INC., ERICA JOHNSON, NAKEISHA SIMMONS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16400744.), filed by JIHAAD R LASSITER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(NASCIMENTO, LUCAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LASSITER v. 801 RESIDENCE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIHAAD R LASSITER
Represented By: LUCAS TAVARES NASCIMENTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 801 RESIDENCE
Represented By: MARJORIE KAYE, JR.
Represented By: Sarah B. Simanglatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL A BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENRY A BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY REALTY MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: MARJORIE KAYE, JR.
Represented By: Sarah B. Simanglatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN POSTAL WORKERS HOUSE ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERGER ASSOCIATES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERICA JOHNSON
Represented By: MARJORIE KAYE, JR.
Represented By: Sarah B. Simanglatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAKEISHA SIMMONS
Represented By: MARJORIE KAYE, JR.
Represented By: Sarah B. Simanglatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN POSTAL WORKERS HOUSE Residential Property doing business as PHILADELPHIA POSTAL UNION HOUSING CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN POSTAL WORKERS HOUSE (APWH) RESIDENTIAL PROPERTY doing business as PHILADELPHIA POSTAL UNION HOUSING CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?