F. et al v. SOVEREIGN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT
Plaintiff: GREGORY F., ZACHARY F., GREGORY FAMOUS and ZACHARY FAMOUS
Defendant: SOVEREIGN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT
Case Number: 2:2023cv00161
Filed: January 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2023 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON Pretrial Conference held on 3/7/23. (rf, )
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL MOTIONS TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT AND TO JOIN OR ADD ADDITIONAL PARTIES SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE MARCH 17, 2023; THE PARTIES SHALL COMPLETE ALL DISCOVERY BY JUNE 30, 2023; MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY JULY 28, 2023. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID FOR PURPOSES OF CONDUCTING SETTLEMENT PROCEEDINGS, AS JUDGE REID DEEMS APPROPRIATE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 3/07/2023. 3/07/2023 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja)
March 1, 2023 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by SOVEREIGN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT.. (MECOLI, GINO)
February 28, 2023 Filing 13 JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT by SOVEREIGN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT. (MECOLI, GINO) Modified on 3/2/2023 (md).
February 24, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by SOVEREIGN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT.(MECOLI, GINO)
February 23, 2023 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against SOVEREIGN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, filed by GREGORY F., ZACHARY F..(MCCOMB, DAVID)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING #2 PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM, FOR THE REASONS OULINED HEREIN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 23, 2023, PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT USING THEIR FULL NAMES. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 2/16/2023.2/16/2023 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja)
February 16, 2023 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: AMENDED COMPLAINT DUE BY 2/23/2023. (ja)
February 14, 2023 Filing 9 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by SOVEREIGN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT.(MECOLI, GINO)
February 10, 2023 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SOVEREIGN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT.(MECOLI, GINO)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT, ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 17, 2023, DEFENDANT SHALL EITHER (A) FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER, ASSERTING ONLY AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES THAT IT HAS A GOOD FAITH BASIS TO ASSERT, OR (B) SHOW CAUSE, IN A MEMORANDUM NOT TO EXCEED 10 PAGES, WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT STRIKE ALL OF THE ASSERTED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 11(C)(3). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 2/10/2023. 2/10/2023 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT LEAD COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES SHALL APPEAR FOR A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 7, 2023 AT 2:00 PM IN CHAMBERS, ROOM 12613, BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 2/09/2023. 2/09/2023 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja)
February 9, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by SOVEREIGN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT.(MECOLI, GINO)
January 30, 2023 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jerry Menichini re: served Summons, Complaint and Motion To Proceed Under Pseudonym upon Jeanine BowIger, Authorized To Accept service for Sovereign Property Management by personal service on 1/20/2023 (MCCOMB, DAVID)
January 18, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SOVEREIGN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT. (rf, )
January 13, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM filed by GREGORY F., ZACHARY F...(MCCOMB, DAVID) Modified on 1/13/2023 (lisad, ).
January 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOVEREIGN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16430974.), filed by GREGORY F., ZACHARY F.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit)(MCCOMB, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: F. et al v. SOVEREIGN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY F.
Represented By: DAVID F. MCCOMB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZACHARY F.
Represented By: DAVID F. MCCOMB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY FAMOUS
Represented By: DAVID F. MCCOMB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZACHARY FAMOUS
Represented By: DAVID F. MCCOMB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOVEREIGN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT
Represented By: GINO P. MECOLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?