Fraternal Order of Police Pennsylvania et al v. TOWNSHIP OF SPRINGFIELD et al
Plaintiff: FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE PENNSYLVANIA LODGE, SPRINGFIELD TOWNSHIP POLICE BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION, CHRISTIAN WILBUR, ROBERT BAIADA and CHRIS CALHOUN
Defendant: TOWNSHIP OF SPRINGFIELD, JAMES LEE, BAIRD M. STANDISH, MICHAEL E MAXWELL, SUSANNA O RATSAVONG, PETER D WILSON, JONATHAN C COBB, EDDIE T GRAHAM and A MICHAEL TAYLOR
Case Number: 2:2023cv00332
Filed: January 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2023 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #25 MOTION for Protective Order filed by ROBERT BAIADA, CHRIS CALHOUN, FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE PENNSYLVANIA LODGE, SPRINGFIELD TOWNSHIP POLICE BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION, CHRISTIAN WILBUR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(ZIMOLONG, WALTER)
March 24, 2023 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON Status Conference by TELEPHONE held on 3/24/23. (JL)
March 24, 2023 Filing 26 Memorandum re #25 MOTION for Protective Order , RESPONSE in Opposition filed by JONATHAN C COBB, EDDIE T GRAHAM, JAMES LEE, MICHAEL E MAXWELL, SUSANNA O RATSAVONG, BAIRD M. STANDISH, A MICHAEL TAYLOR, TOWNSHIP OF SPRINGFIELD, PETER D WILSON. (JENNINGS, RUFUS)
March 23, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION for Protective Order filed by ROBERT BAIADA, CHRIS CALHOUN, FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE PENNSYLVANIA LODGE, SPRINGFIELD TOWNSHIP POLICE BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION, CHRISTIAN WILBUR.brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(ZIMOLONG, WALTER)
March 21, 2023 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Support re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION filed by JONATHAN C COBB, EDDIE T GRAHAM, JAMES LEE, MICHAEL E MAXWELL, SUSANNA O RATSAVONG, BAIRD M. STANDISH, A MICHAEL TAYLOR, TOWNSHIP OF SPRINGFIELD, PETER D WILSON. (JENNINGS, RUFUS)
March 14, 2023 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION filed by ROBERT BAIADA, CHRIS CALHOUN, FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE PENNSYLVANIA LODGE, SPRINGFIELD TOWNSHIP POLICE BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION, CHRISTIAN WILBUR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(ZIMOLONG, WALTER)
February 21, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION filed by JONATHAN C COBB, EDDIE T GRAHAM, JAMES LEE, MICHAEL E MAXWELL, SUSANNA O RATSAVONG, BAIRD M. STANDISH, A MICHAEL TAYLOR, TOWNSHIP OF SPRINGFIELD, PETER D WILSON.Brief, Certificate or Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A")(JENNINGS, RUFUS)
February 17, 2023 COPY OF DOC. NO. 21 HAS BEEN MAILED TO COUNSEL. (bw)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: DEFENDANTS SHALL ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT BY FEBRUARY 21, 2023. PLAINTIFFS SHALL RESPOND TO ANY MOTION TO DISMISS BY MARCH 14, 2023. DISCOVERY DUE BY 4/28/2023. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 7/21/2023. THE COURT SHALL HOLD ORAL ARGUMENT ON ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON SEPTEMBER 6, 2023 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 16B.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 2/16/23. 2/16/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. ATTY GARRITY NOT MAILED. (va)
February 16, 2023 Doc. 17 Mailed to Counsel. (er)
February 14, 2023 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON. Off the record Pretrial Conference held on 02/14/2023. (va)
February 9, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by RUFUS A. JENNINGS on behalf of JONATHAN C COBB, EDDIE T GRAHAM, JAMES LEE, MICHAEL E MAXWELL, SUSANNA O RATSAVONG, BAIRD M. STANDISH, A MICHAEL TAYLOR, TOWNSHIP OF SPRINGFIELD, PETER D WILSON (JENNINGS, RUFUS)
February 9, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by HARRY G. MAHONEY on behalf of JONATHAN C COBB, EDDIE T GRAHAM, JAMES LEE, MICHAEL E MAXWELL, SUSANNA O RATSAVONG, BAIRD M. STANDISH, A MICHAEL TAYLOR, TOWNSHIP OF SPRINGFIELD, PETER D WILSON (MAHONEY, HARRY)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT LEAD COUNSEL SHALL APPEAR FOR A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 16(A) ON FEBRUARY 14, 2023, AT 11:30 A.M., CHAMBERS ROOM NO. 16613, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA 19106. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL EXCHANGE INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(A)(1) AT LEAST ONE (1) BUSINESS DAY IN ADVANCE OF THE RULE 16 CONFERENCE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 2/7/23. 2/7/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. ATTY GARRITY NOT MAILED. (va) Modified on 2/15/2023 (va).
February 3, 2023 PAPER #8, #9 MAILED TO COUNSEL (JL)
February 2, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID M. BURKHOLDER on behalf of JONATHAN C COBB, EDDIE T GRAHAM, JAMES LEE, MICHAEL E MAXWELL, SUSANNA O RATSAVONG, BAIRD M. STANDISH, A MICHAEL TAYLOR, PETER D WILSON with Certificate of Service(BURKHOLDER, DAVID)
February 2, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by DEBORAH R. STAMBAUGH on behalf of JONATHAN C COBB, EDDIE T GRAHAM, JAMES LEE, MICHAEL E MAXWELL, SUSANNA O RATSAVONG, BAIRD M. STANDISH, A MICHAEL TAYLOR, TOWNSHIP OF SPRINGFIELD, PETER D WILSON with Certificate of Service(STAMBAUGH, DEBORAH)
February 2, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN RICHARD ELIAS on behalf of JONATHAN C COBB, EDDIE T GRAHAM, JAMES LEE, MICHAEL E MAXWELL, SUSANNA O RATSAVONG, BAIRD M. STANDISH, A MICHAEL TAYLOR, PETER D WILSON with Certificate of Service(ELIAS, BRIAN)
February 2, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by DEBORAH R. STAMBAUGH on behalf of TOWNSHIP OF SPRINGFIELD with Certificate of Service(STAMBAUGH, DEBORAH)
February 2, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James Joseph Fitzpatrick, III on behalf of ROBERT BAIADA, CHRIS CALHOUN, FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE PENNSYLVANIA LODGE, SPRINGFIELD TOWNSHIP POLICE BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION, CHRISTIAN WILBUR with Certificate of Service(Fitzpatrick, James)
February 2, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID M. BURKHOLDER on behalf of TOWNSHIP OF SPRINGFIELD with Certificate of Service(BURKHOLDER, DAVID)
February 2, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN RICHARD ELIAS on behalf of TOWNSHIP OF SPRINGFIELD with Certificate of Service(ELIAS, BRIAN)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THE EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND ORAL ARGUMENT PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 2, 2023 IS CANCELLED, AND PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (DOC. NO. #2 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 2/1/23. 2/1/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ALL OTHER REGULATIONS, GUIDELINES, LAWS, AND POLICIES OF SPRINGFIELD TOWNSHIP AND ITS POLICE DEPARTMENT, EXCEPT RESOLUTION NUMBER 1592, SHALL REMAIN IN FULL EFFECT AND WITHOUT CHANGE BY VIRTUE OF THIS STIPULATED ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 2/1/23. 2/1/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va)
January 31, 2023 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON. Off the Record Telephone Status Conference held on 1/30/23. (va)
January 31, 2023 DOC. NO. 5 MAILED TO UNREPS ON 1/31/2023. (md)
January 30, 2023 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON. Telephone Status Conference held on 1/27/23. (va)
January 30, 2023 Copy of Doc. 4 mailed to Unreps. (mas)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND ORAL ARGUMENT PLAINTIFFS' ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (DOC NO. #2 ) IS SCHEDULED FOR 2/2/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 16B B; THE MOTION IS DENIED TO THE EXTENT IT SEEKS THE ISSUANCE OF A TRO; THE COURT RESERVES RULING ON THE REMAINDER OF THE MOTION, WHICH SEEKS A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION UNTIL AFTER THE EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND ORAL ARUGMENT SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 2, 2023 AT 10:00 A.M.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 01/27/2023. 01/27/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(nd)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE CONVERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR TODAY, 1/27/2023 AT 03:30 PM TO DISCUSS #2 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRO AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 1/27/23. 1/27/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. UNREPS NOT MAILED. (va)
January 27, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JONATHAN C COBB, EDDIE T GRAHAM, JAMES LEE, MICHAEL E MAXWELL, SUSANNA O RATSAVONG, BAIRD M. STANDISH, A MICHAEL TAYLOR, TOWNSHIP OF SPRINGFIELD, PETER D WILSON. Forwarded To: Plaintiff's Counsel on 1/27/23 (va)
January 27, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and preliminary injunction filed by ROBERT BAIADA, CHRIS CALHOUN, FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE PENNSYLVANIA LODGE, CHRISTIAN WILBUR.memorandum of law, certificate of service, declarations. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(ZIMOLONG, WALTER). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 1/27/2023 (nd). Modified on 1/27/2023 (nd).
January 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16460413.), filed by Fraternal Order of Police Pennsylvania, Springfield Township Police Benevolent Association, ROBERT BAIADA, CHRIS CALHOUN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(ZIMOLONG, WALTER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fraternal Order of Police Pennsylvania et al v. TOWNSHIP OF SPRINGFIELD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE PENNSYLVANIA LODGE
Represented By: WALTER STEPHEN ZIMOLONG
Represented By: James Joseph Fitzpatrick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPRINGFIELD TOWNSHIP POLICE BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION
Represented By: WALTER STEPHEN ZIMOLONG
Represented By: James Joseph Fitzpatrick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTIAN WILBUR
Represented By: WALTER STEPHEN ZIMOLONG
Represented By: James Joseph Fitzpatrick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT BAIADA
Represented By: WALTER STEPHEN ZIMOLONG
Represented By: James Joseph Fitzpatrick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRIS CALHOUN
Represented By: WALTER STEPHEN ZIMOLONG
Represented By: James Joseph Fitzpatrick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWNSHIP OF SPRINGFIELD
Represented By: JAMES J. GARRITY
Represented By: BRIAN RICHARD ELIAS
Represented By: DAVID M. BURKHOLDER
Represented By: DEBORAH R. STAMBAUGH
Represented By: HARRY G. MAHONEY
Represented By: RUFUS A. JENNINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES LEE
Represented By: DEBORAH R. STAMBAUGH
Represented By: HARRY G. MAHONEY
Represented By: RUFUS A. JENNINGS
Represented By: JAMES J. GARRITY
Represented By: BRIAN RICHARD ELIAS
Represented By: DAVID M. BURKHOLDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAIRD M. STANDISH
Represented By: JAMES J. GARRITY
Represented By: BRIAN RICHARD ELIAS
Represented By: DAVID M. BURKHOLDER
Represented By: DEBORAH R. STAMBAUGH
Represented By: HARRY G. MAHONEY
Represented By: RUFUS A. JENNINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL E MAXWELL
Represented By: JAMES J. GARRITY
Represented By: BRIAN RICHARD ELIAS
Represented By: DAVID M. BURKHOLDER
Represented By: RUFUS A. JENNINGS
Represented By: DEBORAH R. STAMBAUGH
Represented By: HARRY G. MAHONEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSANNA O RATSAVONG
Represented By: JAMES J. GARRITY
Represented By: BRIAN RICHARD ELIAS
Represented By: DAVID M. BURKHOLDER
Represented By: DEBORAH R. STAMBAUGH
Represented By: HARRY G. MAHONEY
Represented By: RUFUS A. JENNINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER D WILSON
Represented By: JAMES J. GARRITY
Represented By: BRIAN RICHARD ELIAS
Represented By: DAVID M. BURKHOLDER
Represented By: DEBORAH R. STAMBAUGH
Represented By: HARRY G. MAHONEY
Represented By: RUFUS A. JENNINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN C COBB
Represented By: JAMES J. GARRITY
Represented By: BRIAN RICHARD ELIAS
Represented By: DAVID M. BURKHOLDER
Represented By: DEBORAH R. STAMBAUGH
Represented By: HARRY G. MAHONEY
Represented By: RUFUS A. JENNINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDDIE T GRAHAM
Represented By: JAMES J. GARRITY
Represented By: BRIAN RICHARD ELIAS
Represented By: DAVID M. BURKHOLDER
Represented By: DEBORAH R. STAMBAUGH
Represented By: HARRY G. MAHONEY
Represented By: RUFUS A. JENNINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A MICHAEL TAYLOR
Represented By: JAMES J. GARRITY
Represented By: BRIAN RICHARD ELIAS
Represented By: DAVID M. BURKHOLDER
Represented By: DEBORAH R. STAMBAUGH
Represented By: HARRY G. MAHONEY
Represented By: RUFUS A. JENNINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?