ANDERSON v. MERCY CATHOLIC MEDICAL CENTER OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA et al
Plaintiff: Mr. JAMES W ANDERSON and TAMIKA GRIFFITH-JOHNSON
Defendant: PROMEDICA SENIOR CARE OF PHILADELPHIA PA, LLC D/B/A PROMEDICA TOTAL REHAB +, TRINITY HEALTH OF THE MID-ATLANTIC REGION, JOHN DOE 1-4, MANORCARE OF DELAWARE COUNTY, LLC, MERCY MANAGEMENT OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA, PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., HCR HEALTHCARE, LLC, PROMEDICA SENIOR CARE OF PHILADELPHIA PA, LLC doing business as PROMEDICA TOTAL REHAB+, HEARTLAND EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC, TRINITY HEALTH CORPORATION, HCR II HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR MANOR CARE SERVICES, LLC, HCR MANORCARE, INC., MERCY CATHOLIC MEDICAL CENTER OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA D/B/A MERCY CATHOLIC MEDICAL CENTER MERCY FITZGERALD CAMPUS A/K/A MERCY FITZGERALD HOSPITAL A/K/A MERCY CATHOLIC MEDICAL CENTER F/N/A MERCY FITZGERALD HOSPITAL, HEARTLAND REHABILITATION SERVICES, LLC, HCR IV HEALTHCARE, LLC, MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA and HCR III HEALTHCARE, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Ms. TAMIKA GRIFFITH-JOHNSON
Case Number: 2:2023cv01633
Filed: April 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: BERLE M SCHILLER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by TAMIKA GRIFFITH-JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(GOVOROV, ANDREI)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE (ECF 8) IS STRICKEN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS OR FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT BY FRIDAY, JUNE 16, 2023 OR THE COURT WILL TREAT THE MOTION TO DISMISS AS UNOPPOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 6/1/23. 6/1/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND ECF #7 AND DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE ECF #11 IS DENIED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 5/31/23.5/31/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
May 26, 2023 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by HCR HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR II HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR III HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR IV HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR MANOR CARE SERVICES, LLC, HCR MANORCARE, INC., HEARTLAND EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC, HEARTLAND REHABILITATION SERVICES, LLC, MANORCARE OF DELAWARE COUNTY, LLC, PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., PROMEDICA SENIOR CARE OF PHILADELPHIA PA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(ATOR, ALEXANDRIA)
May 24, 2023 Filing 10 AMENDED DISCLOSURE REGARDING DIVERSITY OF CITIZENSHIP PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1(a)(2) including N/A with Certificate of Service by HCR HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR II HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR III HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR IV HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR MANOR CARE SERVICES, LLC, HCR MANORCARE, INC., HEARTLAND EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC, HEARTLAND REHABILITATION SERVICES, LLC, MANORCARE OF DELAWARE COUNTY, LLC, PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., PROMEDICA SENIOR CARE OF PHILADELPHIA PA, LLC.(ATOR, ALEXANDRIA) Modified on 5/25/2023 (tjd).
May 24, 2023 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including N/A with Certificate of Service by HCR HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR II HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR III HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR IV HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR MANOR CARE SERVICES, LLC, HCR MANORCARE, INC., HEARTLAND EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC, HEARTLAND REHABILITATION SERVICES, LLC, MANORCARE OF DELAWARE COUNTY, LLC, PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., PROMEDICA SENIOR CARE OF PHILADELPHIA PA, LLC.(ATOR, ALEXANDRIA)
May 24, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by TAMIKA GRIFFITH-JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Motion)(GOVOROV, ANDREI) Modified on 6/1/2023 (jaa, ). *STRICKEN PER ORDER 6/1/23.
May 16, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by TAMIKA GRIFFITH-JOHNSON.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(GOVOROV, ANDREI)
May 8, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by HCR HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR II HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR III HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR IV HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR MANOR CARE SERVICES, LLC, HCR MANORCARE, INC., HEARTLAND EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC, HEARTLAND REHABILITATION SERVICES, LLC, MANORCARE OF DELAWARE COUNTY, LLC, PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., PROMEDICA SENIOR CARE OF PHILADELPHIA PA, LLC.Memorandum, Brief, Affidavit, Declaration, Certificate of Counsel or Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit)(ATOR, ALEXANDRIA)
May 5, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREI N. GOVOROV on behalf of TAMIKA GRIFFITH-JOHNSON (GOVOROV, ANDREI)
May 5, 2023 Filing 4 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (afm)
May 1, 2023 Filing 3 Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by HCR HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR II HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR III HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR IV HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR MANOR CARE SERVICES, LLC, HCR MANORCARE, INC., HEARTLAND EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC, HEARTLAND REHABILITATION SERVICES, LLC, MANORCARE OF DELAWARE COUNTY, LLC, PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., PROMEDICA SENIOR CARE OF PHILADELPHIA PA, LLC . (BOOTIER, MICHAEL)
May 1, 2023 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HCR HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR II HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR III HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR IV HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR MANOR CARE SERVICES, LLC, HCR MANORCARE, INC., HEARTLAND EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC, HEARTLAND REHABILITATION SERVICES, LLC, MANORCARE OF DELAWARE COUNTY, LLC, PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., PROMEDICA SENIOR CARE OF PHILADELPHIA PA, LLC.(BOOTIER, MICHAEL)
May 1, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MANORCARE OF DELAWARE COUNTY, LLC, PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., HCR HEALTHCARE, LLC, PROMEDICA SENIOR CARE OF PHILADELPHIA PA, LLC, HEARTLAND EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC, HCR II HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR MANOR CARE SERVICES, LLC, HCR MANORCARE, INC., HEARTLAND REHABILITATION SERVICES, LLC, HCR IV HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR III HEALTHCARE, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16661675), filed by MANORCARE OF DELAWARE COUNTY, LLC, PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., HCR HEALTHCARE, LLC, PROMEDICA SENIOR CARE OF PHILADELPHIA PA, LLC, HEARTLAND EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC, HCR II HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR MANOR CARE SERVICES, LLC, HCR MANORCARE, INC., HEARTLAND REHABILITATION SERVICES, LLC, HCR IV HEALTHCARE, LLC, HCR III HEALTHCARE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit A)(BOOTIER, MICHAEL) Modified on 5/1/2023 (tjd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANDERSON v. MERCY CATHOLIC MEDICAL CENTER OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Ms. TAMIKA GRIFFITH-JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. JAMES W ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMIKA GRIFFITH-JOHNSON
Represented By: ANDREI N. GOVOROV
Represented By: DENINE MARIE MOSCARIELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROMEDICA SENIOR CARE OF PHILADELPHIA PA, LLC D/B/A PROMEDICA TOTAL REHAB +
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRINITY HEALTH OF THE MID-ATLANTIC REGION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANORCARE OF DELAWARE COUNTY, LLC
Represented By: ALEXANDRIA K. ATOR
Represented By: MICHAEL BOOTIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCY MANAGEMENT OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: ALEXANDRIA K. ATOR
Represented By: MICHAEL BOOTIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCR HEALTHCARE, LLC
Represented By: ALEXANDRIA K. ATOR
Represented By: MICHAEL BOOTIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROMEDICA SENIOR CARE OF PHILADELPHIA PA, LLC doing business as PROMEDICA TOTAL REHAB+
Represented By: ALEXANDRIA K. ATOR
Represented By: MICHAEL BOOTIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEARTLAND EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL BOOTIER
Represented By: ALEXANDRIA K. ATOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRINITY HEALTH CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCR II HEALTHCARE, LLC
Represented By: ALEXANDRIA K. ATOR
Represented By: MICHAEL BOOTIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCR MANOR CARE SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: ALEXANDRIA K. ATOR
Represented By: MICHAEL BOOTIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCR MANORCARE, INC.
Represented By: ALEXANDRIA K. ATOR
Represented By: MICHAEL BOOTIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCY CATHOLIC MEDICAL CENTER OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA D/B/A MERCY CATHOLIC MEDICAL CENTER MERCY FITZGERALD CAMPUS A/K/A MERCY FITZGERALD HOSPITAL A/K/A MERCY CATHOLIC MEDICAL CENTER F/N/A MERCY FITZGERALD HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEARTLAND REHABILITATION SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: ALEXANDRIA K. ATOR
Represented By: MICHAEL BOOTIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCR IV HEALTHCARE, LLC
Represented By: ALEXANDRIA K. ATOR
Represented By: MICHAEL BOOTIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCR III HEALTHCARE, LLC
Represented By: ALEXANDRIA K. ATOR
Represented By: MICHAEL BOOTIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?