LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY v. RED ROOF INNS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: RED ROOF INNS, INC., RED ROOF FRANCHISING, LLC, RRI WEST MANAGEMENT, LLC, G. D. and N. Z.
Case Number: 2:2023cv01692
Filed: May 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KELLEY BRISBON HODGE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2023 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by RED ROOF FRANCHISING, LLC, RED ROOF INNS, INC., RRI WEST MANAGEMENT, LLC.(LYTLE, JOANN)
June 30, 2023 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by RED ROOF FRANCHISING, LLC, RED ROOF INNS, INC., RRI WEST MANAGEMENT, LLC.(LYTLE, JOANN)
June 30, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by MEGAN K. SHANNON on behalf of RED ROOF FRANCHISING, LLC, RED ROOF INNS, INC., RRI WEST MANAGEMENT, LLC (SHANNON, MEGAN)
June 30, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY LAUREN TURNER on behalf of RED ROOF FRANCHISING, LLC, RED ROOF INNS, INC., RRI WEST MANAGEMENT, LLC (TURNER, ASHLEY)
June 30, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by JOANN M. LYTLE on behalf of RED ROOF FRANCHISING, LLC, RED ROOF INNS, INC., RRI WEST MANAGEMENT, LLC (LYTLE, JOANN)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ALEC ZADEK, ESQUIRE (ECF #9 ), ALEXANDRA GALLO-COOK (ECF #10 ), ELLEN FARRELL (ECF #11 ) AND NANCY ADAMS, ESQUIRE (ECF #12 ).. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 6/15/23. 6/21/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va)
June 16, 2023 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. N. Z. waiver sent on 5/17/2023, answer due 7/17/2023. (SULLIVAN, JOHN)
June 16, 2023 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. G. D. waiver sent on 5/17/2023, answer due 7/17/2023. (SULLIVAN, JOHN)
June 1, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Nancy Adams ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16727212.) filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(SULLIVAN, JOHN)
June 1, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Ellen Farrell ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16727199.) filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(SULLIVAN, JOHN)
June 1, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Alexandra Gallo-Cook ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16727177.) filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(SULLIVAN, JOHN)
June 1, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Alec Zadek ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16727140.) filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(SULLIVAN, JOHN)
June 1, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. RED ROOF FRANCHISING, LLC waiver sent on 5/4/2023, answer due 7/3/2023. (SULLIVAN, JOHN)
June 1, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. RED ROOF INNS, INC. waiver sent on 5/4/2023, answer due 7/3/2023. (SULLIVAN, JOHN)
June 1, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. RRI WEST MANAGEMENT, LLC waiver sent on 5/4/2023, answer due 7/3/2023. (SULLIVAN, JOHN)
May 4, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY M. BRENNER on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (BRENNER, JEFFREY)
May 4, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN K. KERNS on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (KERNS, KATHLEEN)
May 4, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to G. D., RED ROOF FRANCHISING, LLC, RED ROOF INNS, INC., RRI WEST MANAGEMENT, LLC, N. Z.. Forwarded To: Plaintiff's Counsel on 5/4/23 (va)
May 4, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to RED ROOF FRANCHISING, LLC, RED ROOF INNS, INC., RRI WEST MANAGEMENT, LLC., G.D., N.Z. E-mailed to John C. Sullivan on 5/4/23 (fdc) (FILED IN ERROR. RE-FILED AT ECF #3 .) (va).
May 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against G. D., RED ROOF FRANCHISING, LLC, RED ROOF INNS, INC., RRI WEST MANAGEMENT, LLC, N. Z. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16668777.), filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(SULLIVAN, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY v. RED ROOF INNS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN C. SULLIVAN
Represented By: ALEC J. ZADEK
Represented By: ALEXANDRA GALLO-COOK
Represented By: ELLEN FARRELL
Represented By: JEFFREY M. BRENNER
Represented By: KATHLEEN K. KERNS
Represented By: NANCY D. ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RED ROOF INNS, INC.
Represented By: JOANN M. LYTLE
Represented By: ASHLEY LAUREN TURNER
Represented By: MEGAN K. SHANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RED ROOF FRANCHISING, LLC
Represented By: JOANN M. LYTLE
Represented By: ASHLEY LAUREN TURNER
Represented By: MEGAN K. SHANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RRI WEST MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: JOANN M. LYTLE
Represented By: ASHLEY LAUREN TURNER
Represented By: MEGAN K. SHANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Z.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?