Fannie Mae v. PF Hillside Manor, LP
Plaintiff: Fannie Mae
Defendant: PF Hillside Manor, LP
Case Number: 2:2023cv02024
Filed: May 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: BERLE M SCHILLER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2023 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Appoint Receiver Plaintiffs Motion for the Expedited Appointment of a Receiver filed by Fannie Mae. (Russell, Victoria)
July 21, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE by PF Hillside Manor, LP of Serving Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Kahane, S. Joshua)
July 14, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Appoint Receiver Plaintiffs Motion for the Expedited Appointment of a Receiver. RESPONSES DUE BY 7/21/2023. (bw)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF FANNIE MAE, LP SHALL FILE A REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE #19 OPPOSING PLAINTIFF FANNIE MAES MOTION FOR THE EXPEDITED APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER ON OR BEFORE FRIDAY, JULY 21, 2023. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 7/14/23. 7/14/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
July 14, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Appoint Receiver Plaintiffs Motion for the Expedited Appointment of a Receiver filed by PF Hillside Manor, LP. (Kahane, S. Joshua)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION to Appoint Receiver #4 ON OR BEFORE DUE BY 7/14/2023. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 7/6/23. 7/6/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
June 26, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR TUESDAY, JULY 25, 2023 AT 10:00 AM VIA TELEPHONE BEFORE THE HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER; CALL-IN NUMBER IS 888-684-8852 (ACCESS CODE: 9715761#). IT IS EXPECTED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL HAVE CONDUCTED SUBSTANTIAL DISCOVERY BY THE TIME OF THE RULE 16 CONFERENCE. ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED (cjc)
June 14, 2023 Filing 16 Disclosure of Citizenship with Certificate of Service by PF Hillside Manor, LP.(Kahane, S. Joshua) Modified on 6/15/2023 (lisad, ).
June 7, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK S. HALPERN on behalf of PF Hillside Manor, LP with Certificate of Service(HALPERN, MARK)
June 7, 2023 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Gary Winfrey re: served Summons upon Phyllis Williams, Clerk III by Designated by Law to Accept Service of Process on June 6, 2023 (Russell, Victoria)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT THE COURTS INDEPENDENT OBLIGATION TO ENSURE IT HAS SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, IT IS ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT PF HILLSIDE MANOR, SHALL, ON OR BEFORE FRIDAY, JUNE 9, 2023, FILE A DISCLOSURE OF CITIZENSHIP IN DIVERSITY JURISDICTION CASES CONSISTENT WITH THE FORM AVAILABLE AT HTTP://WWW.PAED.USCOURTS.GOV/DOCUMENTS/HANDBOOK/FORMS/DISCLCTZN.PDF. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 6/6/23. 6/6/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE #10 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 6/6/23.6/6/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
June 5, 2023 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by PF Hillside Manor, LP.(Kahane, S. Joshua)
June 5, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of S. Joshua Kahane, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16734816.) filed by PF Hillside Manor, LP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sponsor's Statement in Support of Motion of S. Joshua Kahane for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Admission PHV)(Kahane, S. Joshua)
June 5, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by PF Hillside Manor, LP.(Kahane, S. Joshua)
June 5, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE by PF Hillside Manor, LP Notice of Appearance of Mark S. Halpern Esq. (Kahane, S. Joshua) *FILED IN ERROR; CORRECT ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE* Modified on 6/6/2023 (lisad, ).
June 5, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by S. Joshua Kahane on behalf of PF Hillside Manor, LP (Kahane, S. Joshua)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF, ATTORNEY JARED S. ROACH, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT, IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 6/5/23. 6/5/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NEF REGENERATED TO DEFENSE COUNSEL. (bw) Modified on 6/6/2023 (lisad, ).
May 26, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to PF Hillside Manor, LP. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 5/26/23 (bw)
May 26, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Receiver Plaintiffs Motion for the Expedited Appointment of a Receiver filed by Fannie Mae.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Russell, Victoria)
May 26, 2023 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jared S. Roach by Fannie Mae. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16717255.). (Russell, Victoria)
May 26, 2023 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Fannie Mae.(Russell, Victoria)
May 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Mortgage Foreclosure against PF Hillside Manor, LP ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16716792.), filed by Fannie Mae. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5,COMPLAINT in Mortgage Foreclosure against PF Hillside Manor, LP ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16716792.), filed by Fannie Mae. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Designation Form)(Russell, Victoria) (Attachment 13 replaced on 5/26/2023) (sbt). #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Designation Form)(Russell, Victoria) (Attachment 13 replaced on 5/26/2023) (sbt). (Attachment 14 replaced on 5/26/2023) (sbt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fannie Mae v. PF Hillside Manor, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fannie Mae
Represented By: Victoria A. Russell
Represented By: JARED S. ROACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PF Hillside Manor, LP
Represented By: S. Joshua Kahane
Represented By: MARK S. HALPERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?