HATCHIGIAN et al v. GUNTON CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: DAVID HATCHIGIAN, JOAN HATCHIGIAN and JOAN RANDAZZO
Defendant: GUNTON CORPORATION, PELLA CORPORATION, PELLA WINDOWS AND DOORS, FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP, JOHN P MANDLER, AMY R FITERMAN and SHANE A ANDERSON
Case Number: 2:2023cv02379
Filed: June 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN F MURPHY
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDERED we will hold a case management conference on August 31, 2023 at 10:00A.M. in Courtroom 3B. Both plaintiffs must attend and unexcused absence is grounds for dismissal. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 8/16/2023. 8/16/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(sg) Modified on 8/18/2023 (sg).
August 15, 2023 Filing 29 Letter dated August 15, 2023 by SHANE A ANDERSON, FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP, AMY R FITERMAN, JOHN P MANDLER. (Paninopoulos, Michelle)
August 15, 2023 Filing 26 Letter dated August 15, 2023 by PELLA CORPORATION, PELLA WINDOWS AND DOORS. (MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
August 14, 2023 Filing 28 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against SHANE A ANDERSON, FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP, AMY R FITERMAN, GUNTON CORPORATION, JOHN P MANDLER, PELLA CORPORATION, PELLA WINDOWS AND DOORS, filed by DAVID HATCHIGIAN.(sg)
August 14, 2023 Filing 27 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION PURSUANT TO ORDER DATED AUGUST 8, 2023 FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by DAVID HATCHIGIAN..(sg)
August 9, 2023 PAPER #25 MAILED TO PRO SE (JL)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDERED:1. Plaintiffs and defendants shall, no later than August 15, 2023, meet and confer and submit a statement to the Court that addresses: (a) whether defendants oppose Mr. Hatchigians second amended complaint and (b) Ms. Randazzos position on the second amended complaint.2. Plaintiff shall, no later than August 15, 2023, file a redlined version of his amended complaint. 3. Defendants Gunton Corporation, Pella Corporation, and Pella Windows and Doors motion to dismiss (DI 11) and defendants Faegre Baker Daniels LLP, John P. Mandler, Amy R. Fiterman, and Shane A. Andersons motion to dismiss (DI 12) are DENIED as moot.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 8/8/2023.8/8/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(sg) .
July 30, 2023 Filing 24 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against SHANE A ANDERSON, FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP, AMY R FITERMAN, JOHN P MANDLER, filed by DAVID HATCHIGIAN. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBITS, #2 COVER LETTER)(sg) Modified on 8/1/2023 (sg).
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDERED:1. Plaintiff David Hatchigians request (DI 22) is GRANTED and David Hatchigian may file electronically on CM/ECF for this case only;2. David Hatchigian is directed to promptly create a PACER account, and to visit this courts website for detailed instructions on how to request access to file electronically with the Eastern District of Pennsylvania;3. David Hatchigian is reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.1.2, subsection 4(c), by becoming a registered ECF user he is consenting to make and receive electronic service of all documents filed in this case; and, 4. David Hatchigian shall review and comply with all local civil rules pertaining to electronic filing.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 7/21/2023. 7/21/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(sg)
July 20, 2023 Filing 22 PRO-SE REQUEST PERMISSION TO E-FILE, by DAVID HATCHIGIAN. (Attachments: #1 COVER LETTER)(sg)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT upon considering plaintiffs motion for a twenty day extension of time (DI 20) to respond to defendants motions to dismiss (DI 11, 12), and upon review of our July 17, 2023 order (DI 19) granting plaintiffs until August 4, 2023 to respond to defendants motions to dismiss (DI 11, 12), it is ORDERED plaintiffs motion for a twenty day extension of time (DI 20) is DENIED as moot in light of our July 17, 2023 order (DI 19). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 7/20/2023.7/20/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES AND E-MAILED.(sg) Modified on 7/20/2023 (sg).
July 19, 2023 Filing 20 PRO-SE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TWENTY DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, filed by DAVID HATCHIGIAN..(sg)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT upon considering defendants motions to dismiss (DI 11, 12), and no timely responses, it is ORDERED plaintiffs shall file responses to defendants motions to dismiss (DI 11, 12) no later than August 4, 2023, or the case may be dismissed for failure to prosecute or failure to comply with a court order.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 7/17/2023. 7/17/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SES AND E-MAILED.(sg) Modified on 7/18/2023 (sg).
June 30, 2023 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #11 MOTION to Dismiss by JENNIFER SEME on behalf of GUNTON CORPORATION, PELLA CORPORATION, PELLA WINDOWS AND DOORS(SEME, JENNIFER)
June 30, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE by SHANE A ANDERSON, FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP, AMY R FITERMAN, JOHN P MANDLER re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Certification of Meet and Confer (Paninopoulos, Michelle)
June 29, 2023 Filing 17 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES. Mailed to plaintiffs on 6/30/23. (lisad, )
June 29, 2023 Filing 15 AMENDED DOCUMENT by SHANE A ANDERSON, FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP, AMY R FITERMAN, JOHN P MANDLER. Amendment to #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Amended Certificate of Service. (Paninopoulos, Michelle)
June 29, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE by SHANE A ANDERSON, FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP, AMY R FITERMAN, JOHN P MANDLER Consent to Removal with Cert of Svc (Paninopoulos, Michelle)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL REMOVE SHANNON M. MCNULTY, ESQ. FROM THE DOCKET AS SHE DOES NOT REPRESENT THE PLAINTIFFS AT THIS TIME; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 6/29/23. 6/29/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE'S AND UNREPS.(JL) .
June 28, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SHANE A ANDERSON, FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP, AMY R FITERMAN, JOHN P MANDLER.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Paninopoulos, Michelle)
June 28, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by GUNTON CORPORATION.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
June 28, 2023 Filing 10 AMENDED DOCUMENT by GUNTON CORPORATION. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal (Attorney), #2 Notice of Removal (Attorney) . (MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
June 27, 2023 DUPLICATE FILING FEE (RECEIPT APAEDC-16766711) ECF ENTRY #1 REFUNDED (JL)
June 23, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL P. DALY on behalf of SHANE A ANDERSON, FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP, AMY R FITERMAN, JOHN P MANDLER with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(DALY, MICHAEL)
June 23, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle A. Paninopoulos on behalf of SHANE A ANDERSON, FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP, AMY R FITERMAN, JOHN P MANDLER (Paninopoulos, Michelle)
June 23, 2023 Filing 7 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Montgomery County. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Complaint Civil Action, #2 Complaint Amended Complaint, #3 Complaint Amended Complaint, #4 Supplement Notice of Removal)(CCP - Montgomery County, )
June 22, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by GUNTON CORPORATION DESIGNATION FORM (MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
June 22, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by GUNTON CORPORATION DESIGNATION FORM (MCMEEKIN, JOHN) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/22/2023) (sbt).
June 22, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by GUNTON CORPORATION CIVIL COVER SHEET (MCMEEKIN, JOHN) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/22/2023) (sbt).
June 22, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER SEME on behalf of GUNTON CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(SEME, JENNIFER)
June 22, 2023 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. DEFENDANT's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED CIVIL COVER SHEET AND DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. (sbt)
June 22, 2023 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. DEFENDANT's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Related Case section is incomplete. The Yes/No questions need to be answered. (sbt)
June 21, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GUNTON CORPORATION (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16766723), filed by GUNTON CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
June 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GUNTON CORPORATION (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16766711), filed by GUNTON CORPORATION.(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HATCHIGIAN et al v. GUNTON CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HATCHIGIAN
Represented By: SHANNON M. MCNULTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAN HATCHIGIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAN RANDAZZO
Represented By: SHANNON M. MCNULTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUNTON CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN C. MCMEEKIN
Represented By: JENNIFER SEME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PELLA CORPORATION
Represented By: JENNIFER SEME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PELLA WINDOWS AND DOORS
Represented By: JENNIFER SEME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP
Represented By: MICHAEL P. DALY
Represented By: Michelle A. Paninopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN P MANDLER
Represented By: MICHAEL P. DALY
Represented By: Michelle A. Paninopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY R FITERMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL P. DALY
Represented By: Michelle A. Paninopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANE A ANDERSON
Represented By: MICHAEL P. DALY
Represented By: Michelle A. Paninopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?