MOHN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: JUSTIN MOHN
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE and ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES
Case Number: 2:2023cv02653
Filed: July 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2023 Filing 18 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (jaa, )
August 10, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUSTIN MOHN re: DAVE ZIMMERMAN AND CORA HEISHMAN served Summons and Complaint upon ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES, U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE by CERTIFIED MAIL. ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES served on 8/4/2023 ; U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE served on 8/2/2023 . (Attachments: #1 COVER LETTER)(jaa, ) Modified on 8/21/2023 (nd).
August 4, 2023 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #16 TO UNREPS ON 8/4/23. (jaa, )
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT WE GRANT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (ECF NO. 15) REQUIRING THE CLERK OF COURT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/3/23.8/3/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO UNREPS. (jaa, )
August 3, 2023 Filing 15 PLAINTIFFS [UNOPPOSED] MOTION TO DISMISS US ATTORNEYS OFFICE AND US ATTORNEY GENERAL AS DEFENDANTS AND AMEND THE CASE CAPTION filed by JUSTIN MOHN.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 COVER LETTER)(jaa, )
August 1, 2023 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRIES #13 #14 TO UNREP PARTIES ON 8/1/23. (jaa, )
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RECUSE (ECF NO. 10) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/31/23. 7/31/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO UNREPS. (jaa, )
July 31, 2023 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/31/23. 7/31/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO UNREPS. (jaa, ) (Main Document 13 replaced on 8/8/2023) (jaa, ).
July 27, 2023 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES, U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General EMAILED To: PLAINTIFF AND US ATTORNEY'S on 7/27/23 (jaa, )
July 27, 2023 Filing 11 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 20011546 (jaa, )
July 24, 2023 Filing 10 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECUSAL filed by JUSTIN MOHN.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 COVER LETTER)(jaa, )
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT DENY PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (ECF NO. S); AND GRANT PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO PAY THE $402 FILING FEE ON OR BEFORE JULY 28, 2023 BEFORE WE DISMISS THE COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/20/23. 7/21/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
July 20, 2023 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/20/23. 7/21/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS REQUEST (ECF NO. 6) IS DENIED AS MOOTED BY HIS PRESENT RECEIPT OF NOTICE AND FILINGS THROUGH EMAIL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/19/23. 7/20/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
July 19, 2023 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PAPERLESS COMMUNICATIONS by JUSTIN MOHN. (Attachments: #1 COVER LETTER)(jaa, )
July 17, 2023 Filing 5 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS filed by JUSTIN MOHN. (Attachments: #1 COVER LETTER)(jaa, )
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Order #4 and Non-Prisoner IFP Form mailed to Mohn. (fdc)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE (ECF DOC. NO. 1) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO ALLOW: 1. PLAINTIFF SHALL, ON OR BEFORE AUGUST 11, 2023, EITHER: (1) PAY $402 (THE $350 FILING FEE AND $52 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR (2) RETURN A COMPLETED MOTION PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, INCLUDING POSSIBLY SUPPLEMENTING HIS MONTHLY EXPENSES IF HE CAN DO SO IN GOOD FAITH; 2. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND THIS ORDER TO PLAINTIFF ALONG WITH A COPY OF THE APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF THIS CASE; 1 3. NO SUMMONS SHALL ISSUE UNTIL FURTHER ORDER; AND, WE MAY DISMISS THE CASE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/12/23.7/13/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) Modified on 7/14/2023 (tjd). Modified on 7/20/2023 (jaa, ).
July 12, 2023 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (fdc)
July 10, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES, U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by JUSTIN MOHN. *IFP PENDING* (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Cover Sheet)(fdc) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/12/2023) (fdc)COMPLAINT against ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES, U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by JUSTIN MOHN. *IFP PENDING* (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Cover Sheet)(fdc)
July 10, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by JUSTIN MOHN..(fdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOHN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN MOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?