OKUM v. SIMON et al
Plaintiff: KEVIN OKUM
Defendant: KAREN SIMON, M.D., SAMANTHA MORRISON, M.D. and PROSPECT CCMC, INC. doing business as CROZER-CHESTER MEDICAL CENTER
Case Number: 2:2023cv02977
Filed: August 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN F MURPHY
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2023 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by KEVIN OKUM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Capacete, Matthew)
September 19, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Vacate filed by KAREN SIMON, M.D., Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(MCGRATH, MARY) Modified on 9/20/2023 (fb).
September 19, 2023 Filing 21 (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; SEE PAPER #22 FOR CORRECT FILING). MOTION to Dismiss filed by MARY KATE MCGRATH.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(MCGRATH, MARY) Modified on 9/20/2023 (fb).
September 18, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PROSPECT CCMC, INC., SAMANTHA MORRISON, M.D., Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint)(MCGRATH, MARY) Modified on 9/19/2023 (fb).
September 18, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN A. POST on behalf of KAREN SIMON, M.D. with Jury Demand(POST, BENJAMIN) Modified on 9/19/2023 (fb).
September 18, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by MARY KATHLEEN MCGRATH on behalf of KAREN SIMON, M.D. with Jury Demand(MCGRATH, MARY) Modified on 9/19/2023 (fb).
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES IS STRICKEN. DEFENDANTS SAMANTHA MORRISON, M.D. AND PROSPECT CCMC, INC. SHALL RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT BY 9/25/23. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ENTER DEFAULT ON DEFENDANT KAREN SIMON, M.D.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 9/18/23.9/18/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
September 18, 2023 Default Entered AS TO KAREN SIMON, M.D. (JL)
September 15, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by MARY KATE MCGRATH-MAY..(MCGRATH, MARY)
September 15, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by MARY KATE MCGRATH-MAY..(MCGRATH, MARY) (STRICKEN PER #17)
September 14, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN A. POST on behalf of SAMANTHA MORRISON, M.D., PROSPECT CCMC, INC. with Jury Demand(POST, BENJAMIN) Modified on 9/15/2023 (fb).
September 14, 2023 Filing 13 (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; SEE PAPER #14 FOR CORRECT FILING). NOTICE of Appearance by MARY KATHLEEN MCGRATH on behalf of BENJAMIN A. POST with Jury Demand(MCGRATH, MARY) Modified on 9/15/2023 (fb).
September 14, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by MARY KATHLEEN MCGRATH on behalf of SAMANTHA MORRISON, M.D., PROSPECT CCMC, INC. with Jury Demand(MCGRATH, MARY) Modified on 9/15/2023 (fb).
September 14, 2023 Filing 11 Request for Entry of Default against Defendants filed by KEVIN OKUM.Affidavit, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service)(BEASLEY, JAMES) Modified on 9/15/2023 (fb).
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL, NO LATER THAN 9/27/23, SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY WE SHOULD NOT DISMISS THE CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 9/13/23. 9/13/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
August 21, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman Services re: served summons and complaint upon Karen Simon, M.D. by agent or person in charge on August 8, 2023 (BEASLEY, JAMES)
August 21, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman Services re: served summons and complaint upon Prospect CCMC, Inc., d/b/a Crozer Chester Medical Center by agent or person in charge on August 8, 2023 (BEASLEY, JAMES)
August 21, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman Services re: served summons and complaint upon Samantha Morrison, M.D. by agent or person in charge on August 17, 2023 (BEASLEY, JAMES)
August 21, 2023 Filing 6 Statement of Plaintiff of Complete Diversity by KEVIN OKUM. (Capacete, Matthew)
August 15, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Alexander Capacete on behalf of KEVIN OKUM with jury demand(Capacete, Matthew)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED that on or before August 21, 2023, plaintiff shall file a statement setting forth, on a good faith basis, the information necessary for the Court to evaluate whether it may exercise diversity of citizenship jurisdiction over the instant case as described herein. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 8/11/2023. 4/14/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. MAILED TO UNREPS.(sg)
August 3, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SAMANTHA MORRISON, MD, PROSPECT CCMC, INC., KAREN SIMON, MD. Forwarded To: E-MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 8/3/23 (JL)
August 3, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE by KEVIN OKUM (BEASLEY, JAMES)
August 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT plaintiffs against Samantha Morrison, Prospect CCMC, Inc., d/b/a /Crozer-Chester Medical Center, Karen Simon ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16856551.), filed by kevin okum.(BEASLEY, JAMES)
August 3, 2023 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Related Case section is incomplete. The Yes/No questions need to be answered. (sbt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OKUM v. SIMON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN OKUM
Represented By: JAMES E. BEASLEY, JR.
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Capacete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN SIMON, M.D.
Represented By: BENJAMIN A. POST
Represented By: MARY KATHLEEN MCGRATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMANTHA MORRISON, M.D.
Represented By: BENJAMIN A. POST
Represented By: MARY KATHLEEN MCGRATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROSPECT CCMC, INC. doing business as CROZER-CHESTER MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: BENJAMIN A. POST
Represented By: MARY KATHLEEN MCGRATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?