WALRATH v. SELFRIDGE et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL WALRATH
Defendant: MELISSA SELFRIDGE, BRIAN COSGROVE and USA COIL AND AIR, INC.
Case Number: 2:2023cv03053
Filed: August 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: Labor Litigations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON WEDNESDAY, OCTOBER 4, 2023, AT 9:30 A.M. BEFORE THE UNDERSIGNED. ANY REQUEST TO CANCEL OR POSTPONE THE CONFERENCE MUST BE RECEIVED AT LEAST TWO WEEKS IN ADVANCE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 9/20/23. 9/20/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) Modified on 9/21/2023 (tjd).
September 18, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE THAT THIS MATTER HAVING BEEN REFERRED TO JUDGE HEY FOR THE PURPOSES OF CONDUCTING SETTLEMENT PROCEEDINGS, THE FOLLOWING PROCEDURES SHALL APPLY (SEE JUDGE HEY'S POLICIES AND PROCEDURES) AS OUTLINED HEREIN; ETC.(JL)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO BE SCHEDULED IN THE NEXT 30 DAYS IF POSSIBLE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/6/23. 9/6/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE ACTION IS STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/6/23. 9/6/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
September 6, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN DEAN BOREMAN on behalf of BRIAN COSGROVE, MELISSA SELFRIDGE (BOREMAN, BRIAN)
September 6, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY PATRICK BURKE on behalf of USA COIL AND AIR, INC. with Certificate of Service(BURKE, JEFFREY)
September 6, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT A. BURKE on behalf of USA COIL AND AIR, INC. with Certificate of Service(BURKE, ROBERT)
September 6, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/6/2023 02:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III.(JL)
September 5, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/6/2023 09:00 AM IN Telephone Conference BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III.(jaa, )
August 25, 2023 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MICHAEL WALRATH. MELISSA SELFRIDGE waiver sent on 8/9/2023, answer due 10/10/2023. (MEYERSON, JACK)
August 25, 2023 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MICHAEL WALRATH. BRIAN COSGROVE waiver sent on 8/9/2023, answer due 10/10/2023. (MEYERSON, JACK)
August 10, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BRIAN COSGROVE, MELISSA SELFRIDGE, USA COIL AND AIR, INC. EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/10/23. (jaa, )
August 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRIAN COSGROVE, MELISSA SELFRIDGE, USA COIL AND AIR, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16866976.), filed by MICHAEL WALRATH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form Designation Form)(MEYERSON, JACK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALRATH v. SELFRIDGE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL WALRATH
Represented By: JACK MEYERSON
Represented By: MATTHEW L. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELISSA SELFRIDGE
Represented By: BRIAN DEAN BOREMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN COSGROVE
Represented By: BRIAN DEAN BOREMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA COIL AND AIR, INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY PATRICK BURKE
Represented By: ROBERT A. BURKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?