A.R. et al v. TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. et al
Plaintiff: A.R., NAOMIS RIVERA SAEZ and LUIS OSCAR HERNANDEZ CRUZ
Defendant: TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC., TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., CLINTON A. TURNER, M.D., JENNIFER IMBRIALE, M.D. and THE UNITED STATES
Case Number: 2:2023cv03880
Filed: October 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN F MURPHY
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 Second MOTION to Remand CROSSCLAIM DEFENDANT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S JOINDER IN DEFENDANT TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND filed by THE UNITED STATES. (Jean-Pierre, Isaac)
December 4, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 Second MOTION to Remand [Response of Defendants Temple University Hospital, Inc., Temple University Health System, Inc. and Jennifer Imbraile, M.D. In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand] filed by JENNIFER IMBRIALE, M.D., TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 6.2.23 Defendants' Answer with New Matter and Crossclaim, #2 Certificate of Service of Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #3 Brief in Support of Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand, #4 Text of Proposed Order to Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand)(MARGULIES, RICHARD)
November 22, 2023 Filing 18 Second MOTION to Remand filed by A.R., LUIS OSCAR HERNANDEZ CRUZ, NAOMIS RIVERA SAEZ.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(CHAIKEN, JOSEPH)
November 22, 2023 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Temple University - Of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education with Certificate of Service by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC..(MARGULIES, RICHARD)
November 22, 2023 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Temple University Health System with Certificate of Service by JENNIFER IMBRIALE, M.D., TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC..(MARGULIES, RICHARD)
November 21, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to #13 Answer to Crossclaim,,, [Answer of Defendants, Temple University Hospital, Temple University Health System, Inc. and Jennifer Imbraiale, M.D. to Crossclaim of United States with Affirmative Defenses] by JENNIFER IMBRIALE, M.D., TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC..(MARGULIES, RICHARD)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD AN INITIAL PRETRIAL VIDEOCONFERENCE ON 12/19/2023, AT 3:00 PM, BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 11/20/23. 11/20/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
November 20, 2023 Filing 13 DEFENDANT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM against JENNIFER IMBRIALE, M.D., TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. by THE UNITED STATES.(Jean-Pierre, Isaac)
November 10, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint together with WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT , CROSSCLAIM against THE UNITED STATES by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC., JENNIFER IMBRIALE, M.D., TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC..(MARGULIES, RICHARD)
November 9, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by A.R., LUIS OSCAR HERNANDEZ CRUZ, NAOMIS RIVERA SAEZ As To the United States(CHAIKEN, JOSEPH)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS JENNIFER IMBRIALE, M.D.; TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.; TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. SHALL FILE THEIR ANSWERS TO THE COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 11/17/23. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 11/6/23. D 11/6/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND (DI 7) IS DENIED. DR. TURNER IS DROPPED AS A DEFENDANT IN THIS ACTION AND SUBSTITUTED WITH THE UNITED STATES AS A DEFENDANT IN HIS PLACE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL AMEND THE CAPTION AS ABOVE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 10/30/23.10/31/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
October 27, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CLINTON A. TURNER, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(CHERICO, COLIN)
October 17, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by A.R., LUIS OSCAR HERNANDEZ CRUZ, NAOMIS RIVERA SAEZ.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(CHAIKEN, JOSEPH)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANT CLINTON A. TURNERS RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT SHALL BE DUE NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 11, 2023.SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 10/12/23.10/12/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
October 12, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint filed by CLINTON A. TURNER, MD.Brief in support, Certificate of Service.(Jean-Pierre, Isaac)
October 10, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH A. WILLIAMS on behalf of JENNIFER IMBRIALE, M.D., TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(WILLIAMS, ELIZABETH)
October 10, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES A. YOUNG on behalf of JENNIFER IMBRIALE, M.D., TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(YOUNG, JAMES)
October 10, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD S. MARGULIES on behalf of JENNIFER IMBRIALE, M.D., TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(MARGULIES, RICHARD)
October 5, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CLINTON A. TURNER, MD from Court of Common Pleas Philadelphia, case number 221102635., filed by CLINTON A. TURNER, MD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit 1)(Jean-Pierre, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.R. et al v. TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.R.
Represented By: JOSEPH CHAIKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAOMIS RIVERA SAEZ
Represented By: JOSEPH CHAIKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS OSCAR HERNANDEZ CRUZ
Represented By: JOSEPH CHAIKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. WILLIAMS
Represented By: JAMES A. YOUNG
Represented By: RICHARD S. MARGULIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: JAMES A. YOUNG
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. WILLIAMS
Represented By: RICHARD S. MARGULIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLINTON A. TURNER, M.D.
Represented By: ISAAC J. JEAN-PIERRE
Represented By: Isaac Jonathan Jean-Pierre
Represented By: COLIN M. CHERICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER IMBRIALE, M.D.
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. WILLIAMS
Represented By: RICHARD S. MARGULIES
Represented By: JAMES A. YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES
Represented By: COLIN M. CHERICO
Represented By: Isaac Jonathan Jean-Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?