Doe K.B. v. Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe K.B.
Defendant: SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSIT AUTHORITY, Leslie Richards, Kenneth Divers, Thomas J. Nestle, III, Thomas Schrillo, Brian Buck, Patrick Barr, John Doe, ALLIED UNIVERSAL SECURITY SERVICES, Fiston Ngoy, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, John Doe Barone, John Doe Sept, John Doe Security Services and John Doe Defendants 1-10
Case Number: 2:2023cv03900
Filed: October 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2023 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Gary Winfrey re: served Civil Complaint upon Fiston Ngoy by Personal Service on 12.5.23 (FEDEN, KRISTEN)
December 11, 2023 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Allied Universal Security Services.(DONOVAN, JOHN)
December 11, 2023 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Allied Universal Security Services.(DONOVAN, JOHN)
November 29, 2023 Filing 22 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by Allied Universal Security Services. (DONOVAN, JOHN)
November 29, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Baird on behalf of Allied Universal Security Services with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(Baird, Jamie)
November 29, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN T. DONOVAN on behalf of Allied Universal Security Services with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(DONOVAN, JOHN)
November 27, 2023 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Philadelphia County Sheriff's Department re: served Civil Action Complaint upon Nathaniel Hagood by hand delivery of complaint on 10/11/2023 (BERGER, MARNI)
November 22, 2023 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ Telephone Conference held on 11/2/2023 (sg)
November 21, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint in Part Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) filed by John Doe Barone, Patrick Barr, Brian Buck, Kenneth Divers, Thomas J. Nestle, III, Leslie Richards, Thomas Schrillo, John Doe Sept, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. (GOTTLIEB, MARK)
November 17, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint in Part Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) filed by Jane Doe K.B.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Probable Cause)(HAAZ, SAMUEL)
November 8, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by SAMUEL A. HAAZ on behalf of Jane Doe K.B. (HAAZ, SAMUEL)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT upon consideration of Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Extend the Page Limit for Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 13), it is ORDERED the Motion is GRANTED.. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/6/2023.11/7/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
November 6, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Extend the Page Limit for Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the SEPTA Defendants 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by Jane Doe K.B..Memorandum of Law; Certification of Unconcester Motion. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order Certification of Uncontested Motion)(BERGER, MARNI)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT upon consideration of Plaintiff Jane Doe K.B.s uncontested Request for Extension (ECF No. 10), it is ORDERED the request is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff shall have until November 17, 2023, to file her opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/3/2023. 11/3/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
November 3, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint in Part Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6). RESPONSES DUE BY 11/17/2023. (sg)
November 2, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTEN M. FEDEN on behalf of Jane Doe K.B. (FEDEN, KRISTEN)
November 1, 2023 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/2/2023 at 03:00 PM BEFORE CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ.(stwe)
October 31, 2023 Filing 10 Letter dated 10/31/2023 by Jane Doe K.B. (sg)
October 30, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by MARNI BERGER on behalf of Jane Doe K.B. (BERGER, MARNI)
October 20, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint in Part Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) filed by John Doe Barone, Patrick Barr, Brian Buck, Kenneth Divers, Thomas J. Nestle, III, Leslie Richards, Thomas Schrillo, John Doe Sept, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority.Proposed Order, Memorandum, Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(GOTTLIEB, MARK)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT upon consideration of Defendants Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Dispositive Motion (ECF No. 5), it is ORDERED the Motion is GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 10/18/2023.10/18/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
October 17, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JUSTINE A. BAAKMAN on behalf of John Doe Barone, Patrick Barr, Brian Buck, Kenneth Divers, Thomas J. Nestle, III, Leslie Richards, Thomas Schrillo, John Doe Sept, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority with JURY DEMAND AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BAAKMAN, JUSTINE)
October 16, 2023 Filing 5 Memorandum of law in support of MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Dispositive Motion filed by John Doe Barone, Patrick Barr, Brian Buck, Kenneth Divers, Thomas J. Nestle, III, Leslie Richards, Thomas Schrillo, John Doe Sept, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority.Memorandum of Law.(GROFF, JOSHUA) Modified on 10/19/2023 (lvj).
October 16, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. GROFF on behalf of John Doe Barone, Patrick Barr, Brian Buck, Kenneth Divers, Thomas J. Nestle, III, Leslie Richards, Thomas Schrillo, John Doe Sept, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority (GROFF, JOSHUA)
October 13, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK E. GOTTLIEB on behalf of John Doe Barone, Patrick Barr, Brian Buck, Kenneth Divers, Thomas J. Nestle, III, Leslie Richards, Thomas Schrillo, John Doe Sept, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority with JURY DEMAND AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GOTTLIEB, MARK)
October 12, 2023 Filing 2 State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (CCP - Philadelphia County cv, )
October 6, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSIT AUTHORITY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16995820), filed by SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSIT AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(GOTTLIEB, MARK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe K.B. v. Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe K.B.
Represented By: KRISTEN M. FEDEN
Represented By: MARNI BERGER
Represented By: SAMUEL A. HAAZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Represented By: MARK E. GOTTLIEB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Richards
Represented By: JOSHUA D. GROFF
Represented By: MARK E. GOTTLIEB
Represented By: JUSTINE A. BAAKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Divers
Represented By: MARK E. GOTTLIEB
Represented By: JOSHUA D. GROFF
Represented By: JUSTINE A. BAAKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Nestle, III
Represented By: MARK E. GOTTLIEB
Represented By: JOSHUA D. GROFF
Represented By: JUSTINE A. BAAKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Schrillo
Represented By: JOSHUA D. GROFF
Represented By: MARK E. GOTTLIEB
Represented By: JUSTINE A. BAAKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Buck
Represented By: MARK E. GOTTLIEB
Represented By: JOSHUA D. GROFF
Represented By: JUSTINE A. BAAKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Barr
Represented By: JOSHUA D. GROFF
Represented By: MARK E. GOTTLIEB
Represented By: JUSTINE A. BAAKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIED UNIVERSAL SECURITY SERVICES
Represented By: JOHN T. DONOVAN
Represented By: Jamie Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiston Ngoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority
Represented By: JOSHUA D. GROFF
Represented By: JUSTINE A. BAAKMAN
Represented By: MARK E. GOTTLIEB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Barone
Represented By: MARK E. GOTTLIEB
Represented By: JOSHUA D. GROFF
Represented By: JUSTINE A. BAAKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Sept
Represented By: MARK E. GOTTLIEB
Represented By: JOSHUA D. GROFF
Represented By: JUSTINE A. BAAKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Security Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?