STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY v. PALERMO et al
Plaintiff: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY
Defendant: MICHAEL PALERMO, TERRY ABRAMS PLUMBING, LLC and A.O. SMITH CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2023cv04355
Filed: November 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Filing 22 Response to Cross-Claim of Terry Abrams Plumbing, LLC by A.O. SMITH CORPORATION. (KAIN, DANIEL)
January 4, 2024 Filing 21 Response to Cross-Claim of Michael Palermo by A.O. SMITH CORPORATION. (KAIN, DANIEL)
December 29, 2023 Filing 20 Response to Crossclaim of Terry Abrams Plumbing by MICHAEL PALERMO. (HOWTON, BRENDAN)
December 27, 2023 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ Telephone Conference held on 12/20/23 (JL)
December 21, 2023 Filing 18 Response To the Cross Claim of Defendant AO Smith Plumbing Corp by TERRY ABRAMS PLUMBING, LLC. (DiGiuseppe, Samantha)
December 21, 2023 Filing 17 Response to Crossclaim of Defendant AO Smith, Corp by TERRY ABRAMS PLUMBING, LLC. (DiGiuseppe, Samantha)
December 20, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by AMY G. WIRTH on behalf of STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY with Certificate of Service(WIRTH, AMY)
December 20, 2023 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/20/2023 03:45 PM BEFORE CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ.(stwe)
December 19, 2023 Filing 15 Response re #13 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by MICHAEL PALERMO. (HOWTON, BRENDAN)
December 18, 2023 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by TERRY ABRAMS PLUMBING, LLC.(DiGiuseppe, Samantha)
December 18, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, MICHAEL PALERMO by TERRY ABRAMS PLUMBING, LLC.(DiGiuseppe, Samantha)
December 15, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against A.O. SMITH CORPORATION by MICHAEL PALERMO.(HOWTON, BRENDAN)
December 14, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha N. DiGiuseppe on behalf of TERRY ABRAMS PLUMBING, LLC with Certificate of Service(DiGiuseppe, Samantha)
December 4, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against MICHAEL PALERMO, TERRY ABRAMS PLUMBING, LLC by A.O. SMITH CORPORATION.(KAIN, DANIEL)
December 4, 2023 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by A.O. SMITH CORPORATION.(KAIN, DANIEL)
December 4, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. KAIN on behalf of A.O. SMITH CORPORATION with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(KAIN, DANIEL)
November 28, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY re: Andney Gauslin served Summons and Complaint upon TERRY ABRAMS PLUMBING, LLC by Personal. TERRY ABRAMS PLUMBING, LLC served on 11/28/2023, answer due 12/19/2023. (DE LUCA, DANIEL)
November 22, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by BRENDAN M. HOWTON on behalf of MICHAEL PALERMO with Jury Demand(HOWTON, BRENDAN)
November 21, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY. MICHAEL PALERMO waiver sent on 11/20/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (DE LUCA, DANIEL)
November 14, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY re: Shawn Conrad served Summons and Complaint upon A.O. SMITH CORPORATION by Personal on Registered Agent. A.O. SMITH CORPORATION served on 11/13/2023, answer due 12/4/2023. (DE LUCA, DANIEL)
November 13, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY.Certificate of Service, MEMORANDUM. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(DE LUCA, DANIEL)
November 8, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, MICHAEL PALERMO, TERRY ABRAMS PLUMBING, LLC. Forwarded To: Daniel J. De Luca on 11/8/23 (fdc)
November 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, MICHAEL PALERMO, TERRY ABRAMS PLUMBING, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-17058230.), filed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY.(DE LUCA, DANIEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY v. PALERMO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: DANIEL J. DE LUCA
Represented By: AMY G. WIRTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL PALERMO
Represented By: BRENDAN M. HOWTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRY ABRAMS PLUMBING, LLC
Represented By: Samantha N. DiGiuseppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. SMITH CORPORATION
Represented By: DANIEL J. KAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?