QINGDAO MAXWELL COMMERCIAL AND TRADING COMPANY LTD. v. ZERO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Plaintiff: QINGDAO MAXWELL COMMERCIAL AND TRADING COMPANY LTD.
Defendant: ZERO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv04518
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2023 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman's Services for the Professional, Inc. re: served Summons and Amended Complaint upon Zero Technologies, LLC by Process Server on 12/20/2023 (COLE, SIOBHAN)
December 5, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to ZERO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (amas)
December 4, 2023 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ZERO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, filed by QINGDAO MAXWELL COMMERCIAL AND TRADING COMPANY LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(COLE, SIOBHAN)
December 4, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by VINCENT N. BARBERA on behalf of QINGDAO MAXWELL COMMERCIAL AND TRADING COMPANY LTD. with Certificate of Service(BARBERA, VINCENT)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY TO HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 11/28/23. 11/29/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
November 17, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by QINGDAO MAXWELL COMMERCIAL AND TRADING COMPANY LTD.. ZERO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC waiver sent on 11/16/2023, answer due 1/15/2024. (COLE, SIOBHAN)
November 16, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ZERO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (amas)
November 16, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by QINGDAO MAXWELL COMMERCIAL AND TRADING COMPANY LTD. re #1 Complaint (Attorney), Designation Form (COLE, SIOBHAN)
November 16, 2023 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Related Case section is incomplete. The Yes/No questions and Certification question asking if the case is/is not related need to be answered. (sbt)
November 15, 2023 Filing 2 Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure by QINGDAO MAXWELL COMMERCIAL AND TRADING COMPANY LTD.. (COLE, SIOBHAN)
November 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ZERO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-17074801.), filed by QINGDAO MAXWELL COMMERCIAL AND TRADING COMPANY LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Designation Form)(COLE, SIOBHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: QINGDAO MAXWELL COMMERCIAL AND TRADING COMPANY LTD. v. ZERO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QINGDAO MAXWELL COMMERCIAL AND TRADING COMPANY LTD.
Represented By: SIOBHAN KATHERINE COLE
Represented By: VINCENT N. BARBERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZERO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?