PLASS v. AMAZON.COM, INC., et. al.
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE PLASS
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM, L.L.C., U.S. LOGISTICS SERVICE CORPORATION, CIRRO FULFILLMENT, CIRRO, CHINA LILANG, LTD, LILANG LIMITED, JOHN DOE CORPORATION 1-5 and LUISLADDERS
Case Number: 2:2023cv04632
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Doc. #21 mailed to Unrep parties. (fdc)
January 16, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT PROCEEDURES FROM CHAMBERS OF JUDGE HEY. UNREPS NOT MAILED. (va)
January 12, 2024 COPY OF DOC. NO. 20 HAS EEN MAILED TO UNREPS. (bw)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: THE CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH HEY FOR SETTLEMENT. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/6/2025 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 11A. DISCOVERY DUE BY 10/4/2024. MOTIONS DUE BY 1/27/2025. MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 4/17/2025. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 1/27/2025. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 4/29/2025. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 4/29/2025. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 5/13/2025 AT 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 11A, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 1/10/24. 1/11/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. UNREPS NOT MAILED. (va) Modified on 1/12/2024 (va).
January 10, 2024 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT. Rule 16 Pretrial Conference Not on the Record held on 01/10/2024. (va)
January 8, 2024 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Pursuant to Rule 26(f) by U.S. LOGISTICS SERVICE CORPORATION. (ERNY, FREDERICK)
January 8, 2024 DOC. NO. 17 MAILED TO UNREPS (ems)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #15 #16 MOTIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE OF MENGXUE XIE AND SHANA ORTIZ SEE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 1/5/24. 1/8/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. UNREPS NOT MAILED. (va)
January 5, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Shana Ortiz See ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17173191.) filed by U.S. LOGISTICS SERVICE CORPORATION.Affidavit. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ERNY, FREDERICK)
January 5, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Mengxue Xie ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17173130.) filed by U.S. LOGISTICS SERVICE CORPORATION.Affidavit. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ERNY, FREDERICK)
December 28, 2023 COPY OF DOC. NO. 14 HAS BEEN MAILED TO UNREPS. (bw)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON WEDNESDAY, JANUARY 10, 2024 AT 3:00 P.M., VIA TELEPHONE. THE COURT WILL PROVIDE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION. RULE 1 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE REQUIRES THOSE RULES TO BE CONSIDERED, ADMINISTERED AND EMPLOYED BY THE COURT AND THE PARTIES TO SECURE THE JUST, SPEEDY AND INEXPENSIVE DETERMINATION OF THIS CASE. THE COURT AND COUNSEL MUST THEREFORE WORK COOPERATIVELY TO CONTROL THE CASES SCHEDULE AND COST. THIS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS AN IMPORTANT PART OF THE PROCESS BY WHICH THE COURT, WITH THE PARTIES COOPERATION AND ASSISTANCE, WILL MANAGE THIS LITIGATION. ALL COUNSEL MUST READ AND STRICTLY ADHERE TO THE COURTS POLICIES AND PROCEDURES. THE PARTIES SHALL MAKE THE REQUIRED INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 26(A) WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THIS ORDER; THE PARTIES SHALL COMMENCE DISCOVERY IMMEDIATELY; AFTER CONSULTATION WITH COUNSEL FOR ALL PARTIES, COUNSEL SHALL COMPLETE AND FILE WITH THE CLERK THE REQUIRED REPORT OF THE RULE 26(F) MEETING INCORPORATING ALL THE INFORMATION IN THE ATTACHED FORM REPORT ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 8, 2024; ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 12/27/23. 12/27/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. UNREPS NOT MAILED. (va) Modified on 12/27/2023 (va).
December 20, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to Amazon.com, Inc.'s CrossClaim re #8 Answer to Complaint by CIRRO, CIRRO FULFILLMENT, U.S. LOGISTICS SERVICE CORPORATION. (ERNY, FREDERICK) Modified on 12/20/2023 (md).
December 20, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by CIRRO, CIRRO FULFILLMENT, U.S. LOGISTICS SERVICE CORPORATION.(ERNY, FREDERICK)
November 30, 2023 DOC 11 MAILED TO UNREPS (rf, )
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR ELOGISTICS DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER BY 12/20/2023. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 11/29/23. 11/29/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. UNREPS NOT MAILED. (va) Modified on 11/29/2023 (va).
November 29, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by CIRRO, CIRRO FULFILLMENT, U.S. LOGISTICS SERVICE CORPORATION.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ERNY, FREDERICK)
November 29, 2023 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by AMAZON.COM, INC..(Notaristefano, Andrew)
November 29, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by AMAZON.COM, INC..(Notaristefano, Andrew)
November 28, 2023 Filing 7 State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (CCP - Philadelphia County cv, )
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN GREWE on behalf of AMAZON.COM, INC. with Certificate of Service(GREWE, ERIN)
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN JOHN O'NEIL on behalf of AMAZON.COM, INC. with Certificate of Service(O'NEIL, RYAN)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Notaristefano on behalf of AMAZON.COM, INC. with Certificate of Service(Notaristefano, Andrew)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by CIRRO, CIRRO FULFILLMENT, U.S. LOGISTICS SERVICE CORPORATION of Designation Form (ERNY, FREDERICK)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by U.S. LOGISTICS SERVICE CORPORATION.(ERNY, FREDERICK)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CIRRO, U.S. LOGISTICS SERVICE CORPORATION, CIRRO FULFILLMENT (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-17089589), filed by CIRRO, U.S. LOGISTICS SERVICE CORPORATION, CIRRO FULFILLMENT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Consent to Removal, #5 Exhibit C - State Court Documents)(ERNY, FREDERICK)
November 22, 2023 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. DEFENDANT's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. The Yes/No Questions needs to be answered. (sbt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PLASS v. AMAZON.COM, INC., et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE PLASS
Represented By: ALLAN J. AIGELDINGER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, INC.
Represented By: Andrew Notaristefano
Represented By: ERIN GREWE
Represented By: RYAN JOHN O'NEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, L.L.C.
Represented By: Andrew Notaristefano
Represented By: RYAN JOHN O'NEIL
Represented By: ERIN GREWE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. LOGISTICS SERVICE CORPORATION
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Represented By: Shana Ortiz See
Represented By: Mengxue Xie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIRRO FULFILLMENT
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIRRO
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHINA LILANG, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LILANG LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATION 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUISLADDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?