Hadnot v. Welz
Plaintiff: Albert James Hadnot
Defendant: Joseph Welz
Case Number: 2:2023cv04659
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDERED:1. WE AMEND OUR DECEMBER 29, 2023 ORDER (ECF NO. 46) TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF MAIL HIS MOTION (ECF NO. 45) AS WELL AS THIS ORDER TO THE DEFENDANT AND CONFIRM HIS SERVICE BY FILING A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE CONFIRMING COMPLIANCE WITH THIS ORDER ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 19, 2024; AND,2. WE GRANT DEFENDANT LEAVE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DAMAGES (ECF NO. 45) NO LATER THAN FEBRUARY 16, 2024. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/4/2024. 1/5/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(sg)
January 3, 2024 Filing 47 Letter dated 12/20/2023 by Albert James Hadnot (sg)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL SERVE HIS MOTION FOR SPECIFIC DAMAGES WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BY 1/10/23 AND FILE A NOTICE CONFIRMING SERVICE OF HIS MOTION CONSISTENT WITH THIS ORDER OR WE MAY STRIKE THE MOTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO BE TIMELY RENEWED AFTER CONFIRMING SERVICE UPON DEFENDANT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 12/29/23. 12/29/23 ENTERED AND NOT MAILED TO PRO SE OR UNREP.(JL)
December 29, 2023 Copy of order #46 mailed to pro se ALBERT JAMES HADNOT and unrepresented party JOSEPH WELZ. (afm)
December 28, 2023 Filing 45 MOTION FOR SPECIFIC DAMAGES, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY Albert James Hadnot.(amas)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERING THE INCARCERATED PLAINTIFFS LETTER #43 EXPRESSING HIS DESIRE TO PROCEED WITH HIS PENDING MOTION FOR DEFAULT, BUT NOTING PLAINTIFF HAS NOT FILED A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE VERIFYING HE SERVED THE MOTION #32 OR DECLARATION #33 ON THE DEFENDANT, IT IS ORDERED THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FORTHWITH MAIL A COPY OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION AND DECLARATION (ECF NOS. 32, 33) TO DEFENDANT WELZ; PLAINTIFF IS REMINDED ALL FILINGS SHOULD INCLUDE A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE VERIFYING HE MAILED A COPY OF HIS FILING TO THE DEFENDANT; AND, DEFENDANT WELZ MAY RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS #32 NO LATER THAN JANUARY 26, 2024 CONSISTENT WITH OUR DECEMBER 4, 2023 ORDER #42 . SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 12/28/23. 12/28/23 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(bw) Modified on 12/28/2023 (bw). MAILED BY CHAMBERS. DOC. NOs. 32, 33 MAILED TO DEFENDANT BY CHAMBERS.
December 22, 2023 Filing 43 Letter dated 12/6/23 by Albert James Hadnot TO CLERK OF COURT (JL)
December 6, 2023 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #42 TO PLAINTIFF ON 12/6/23. (jaa, )
December 6, 2023 COPY OF ORDER #42 MAILED TO DEFENDANT WELZ BY CHAMBERS ON 12/6/2023. (uh)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A DETAILED MOTION FOR SPECIFIC DAMAGES NO LATER THAN 1/5/2024. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A COS BY NO LATER THAN 1/12/2024 AS OUTLINED HEREIN. ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 12/4/2023. 12/5/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. MAILED TO UNREP. (sg)
November 29, 2023 Filing 41 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (sbt)
November 29, 2023 Pro Se Guidelines Mailed Out on 11/29/23 (sbt)
November 28, 2023 Filing 40 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:23-cv-00791. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) IT IS ORDERED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) that this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C Carlson on 11/22/23. (rw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry). Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C Carlson on 11/22/23. (rw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
November 22, 2023 VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Martin C Carlson for all further proceedings. (jw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
November 22, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (rw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Welz shall refile the letter received on October 31, 2023, #36 , signed by either himself or, after filing a notice of appearance, an attorney, on or before December 1, 2023. If he fails to do so, the October 31, 2023 letter will be stricken from the record. Further, we note for Welzs benefit that this letter will not be considered a proper answer to the complaint, even if it is filed with a signature. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 11/3/23. (rw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
October 31, 2023 Filing 36 Letter to Court from Joseph Welz re case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
October 18, 2023 Filing 35 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Joseph Welz.(aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
October 18, 2023 Filing 34 Letter to Court from Albert James Hadnot requesting docket sheet. Document sent. (aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
October 18, 2023 Filing 33 DECLARATION by Albert James Hadnot. (aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
October 18, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION for Default Judgment by Albert James Hadnot.(aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
October 12, 2023 Filing 31 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Albert James Hadnot. (aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
September 25, 2023 Filing 30 Letter from Albert Hadnot re case. (ll) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
September 25, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc. #26 and #29 were mailed to plaintiff per his request #30 . (ae) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - that the motion doc. #27 is DISMISSED AS MOOT without prejudice to Hadnot seeking entry of default if Welz fails to file a responsive pleading on or before September 27, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on September 11, 2023. (ae) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
September 6, 2023 Filing 28 Letter to Court from Albert Hadnot re case. (aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
September 6, 2023 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Albert James Hadnot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Welz shall file a responsive pleading on or before September 27, 2023. Welz is advised that this is his final opportunity to respond to the complaint. If he fails to do so, he risks Albert James Hadnot moving for default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55. Joseph Welz answer due 9/27/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 9/5/23. (ae) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
August 29, 2023 Filing 25 Letter from Albert James Hadnot re status of case. (ibr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
August 29, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Copy of docket sheet mailed to plaintiff. (ae) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
August 15, 2023 Filing 24 Letter from Albert James Hadnot re case. Packet of local rules sent. (sh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the following documents filed by the plaintiff Albert James Hadnot #17 , #18 , #19 , #21 and #22 shall be STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 7/20/23. (rw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
July 18, 2023 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT filed by Albert James Hadnot of Affiant Edwin Escobedo re law library. (ibr) STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD per order dated 7/20/23. [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
July 18, 2023 Filing 21 Affidavit of Supporting Facts filed by Albert James Hadnot. (ibr) STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD per order dated 7/20/23. [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
July 10, 2023 Filing 20 Letter from Joseph Welzant. Mailed copy of ORDER from 06/30/2023 (doc. 16). (ibr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
July 6, 2023 Filing 19 "Final Statement of Facts" filed by Albert James Hadnot. (ibr) STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD per order dated 7/20/23. [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
July 6, 2023 Filing 18 Letter from Albert James Hadnot dated June 29, 2023. (ibr) STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD per order dated 7/20/23. [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
July 6, 2023 Filing 17 Letter from Albert James Hadnot dated June 27th, 2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (ibr) STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD per order dated 7/20/23. [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Upon consideration of the document #14 filed by the dft, Joseph Welz (Welz), and the waiver of service returned by Welz #15 , IT IS ORDERED that the document (doc. 14) does not satisfy Welzs obligation to answer the complaint. Accordingly, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Welz must file a responsive pleading on or before 8/14/23. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 6/30/23. (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
June 27, 2023 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned. Joseph Welz waiver sent on 6/15/2023, answer due 8/14/2023. (ga) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
June 26, 2023 Filing 14 Document filed by Joseph Welz.. (ga). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
June 15, 2023 Filing 13 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to Joseph Welz Waiver of Service due by 7/17/2023. (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: upon consideration of the pro se Pltfs Complaint #1 , accompanied by the corrected Application for Leave to Proceed IFP #7 and the Certified Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (or institutional equivalent) #9 , it is hereby ORDERED that:1.Pltfs Application for Leave to Proceed IFP (doc. 7) is GRANTED.2.Pltf shall pay the full filing fee of $350.00,per instructions in this order.3.Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(l) and (2), the Superintendent/Warden, or other appropriate official at Pltfs place of confinement is directed to deduct an initial partial filing fee and future payments per this order.4. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the Superintendent/Warden of the institution wherein Pltf is presently confined.5. The Complaint is DEEMED filed.6. In accordance with FRCP 4(c)(3), the Clerk of Court is directed to SERVE a copy of the complaint (doc. 1), notice of lawsuit and requests to waive service of summons (form AO 398), waiver of the service of summons (form AO 399) and this Order on the named Dft(s). In the interests of efficient administrative judicial economy, the Court requests that the Dft(s) waive service pursuant to FRCP 4(d).7. If service is unable to be completed due to Plaintiffs failure to properly name the Defendant(s), or provide an accurate mailing address, Plaintiff will be required to correct this deficiency. Failure to comply may result in the dismissal of Plaintiffs claims against the Dft(s) pursuant to FRCP 4(m).8. Because we have granted Pltfs most recent Application to Proceed IFP, Pltfs prior Application #2 for Leave to Proceed IFP is DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 6/15/23. (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying pltf's Motion to Appoint Counsel #9 Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 6/14/23 (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
June 13, 2023 Filing 10 Proposed Summons filed by Albert James Hadnot. (ibr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
June 13, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Albert James Hadnot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(sh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
June 13, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Albert James Hadnot. (sh) Modified on 6/13/2023 (lp). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
June 13, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Albert James Hadnot.(sh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
May 16, 2023 Filing 6 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 05/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP)(lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
May 15, 2023 Filing 5 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (ibr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
May 15, 2023 Filing 4 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER. (ibr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
May 15, 2023 Filing 3 (CERTIFIED) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by Albert James Hadnot. (ibr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
May 15, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Albert James Hadnot. (ibr) Modified on 5/16/2023 (lp). Incorrect Form [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]
May 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joseph Welz lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Albert James Hadnot. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ibr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/28/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hadnot v. Welz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert James Hadnot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Welz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?