ZEBBY SULECKI, INC. v. LSOP 3 PA 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ZEBBY SULECKI, INC.
Defendant: LSOP 3 PA 1, LLC and NEWREZ, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv04756
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M YOUNGE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ZEBBY SULECKI, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(KATZ, WILLIAM)
January 11, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by NEWREZ, LLC.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit A - Newrez v Libert Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Liberty v Newrez Complaint, #5 Exhibit C - Sulecki v Norwood Complaint)(CORTES, SAMUEL)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED. DEFENDANT NEWREZ, LLC SHALL FILE ITS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY 1/11/24; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 12/21/23. 12/22/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
December 19, 2023 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by NEWREZ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CORTES, SAMUEL)
December 13, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Cook on behalf of NEWREZ, LLC with Certificate of Service(Cook, Lindsey)
December 13, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by SAMUEL W. CORTES on behalf of NEWREZ, LLC with Certificate of Service(CORTES, SAMUEL)
December 4, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to LSOP 3 PA 1, LLC and NEWREZ, LLC. Forwarded To: counsel on 12/4/23. (mbh)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17106956.), filed by ZEBBY SULECKI, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subcontract1, #2 Exhibit B - Subcontract2, #3 Exhibit C - Change Orders, #4 Exhibit D - Payment Requests1, #5 Exhibit E - Payment Request2)(KATZ, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZEBBY SULECKI, INC. v. LSOP 3 PA 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZEBBY SULECKI, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM CARL KATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSOP 3 PA 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEWREZ, LLC
Represented By: SAMUEL W. CORTES
Represented By: Lindsey Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?