WRIGHT v. FEDDER et al
Plaintiff: SEAN WRIGHT
Defendant: UNIT MANAGER FEDDER, COIII FONDI, NURSE (DAN), COL. WAYNE STYLES and COL. R. KALB
Case Number: 2:2023cv05099
Filed: December 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2024 COPY OF DOC. NO. 17 AND USM285 FORM HAS BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE. (bw)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF 2/13/24 THAT A DEFENDANT IN THIS CASE COULD NOT BE SERVED BY WAIVER PURSUANT TO FRCP 4(d), IT IS ORDERED THAT: THE CASE SHALL PROCEED AT THIS TIME TO SERVICE BY THE U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH 28 U.S.C. 1915(d) AND FRCP 4(c)(3), AGAINST DEFENDANT a. NURSE DAN. IN ANTICIPATION OF SERVICE BY THE U.S. MARSHAL THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO WRIGHT TOGETHER WITH A COPY OF THE U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE OR PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN FORM USM-285 FOR EACH DEFENDANT LISTED IN PARAGRAPH ONE (1) OF THIS ORDER. THE CLERK OF COURT IS FURTHER ORDERED TO RECORD THE MAILING ON THE DOCKET. TO PROCEED WITH SERVICE, WRIGHT MUST COMPLETE ONE USM-285 FORM FOR EACH DEFENDNAT LISTED IN PARAGRAPH ONE (1) AND RETURN THE COMPLETED FORM(S) TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE WITHIN TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SERVICE CANNOT BE MADE BY THE U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE UNTIL WRIGHT COMPLETES AND RETURNS THESE FORMS. ETC. WRIGHT IS CAUTIONED THAT FAILURE TO RETURN THE COMPLETED USM-285 FORM(S) IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ABOVE INSTRUCTIONS MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE, WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO DOCKET ANY USM-285 FORMS THAT WRIGHT RETURNS IN THIS CASE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED NOT TO ISSUE SUMMONSES AT THIS TIME. THE COURT WILL DIRECT ISSUANCE OF SUMMONSES UPON RECEIPT OF PROPERLY COMPLETED USM-285 FORMS. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 2/13/24. 2/13/24 ENTERED. (DT) (COPY NOT MAILED TO PRO SE)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT WRIGHTS MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL, ECF NO. #15 , IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 2/7/24.2/7/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mas)
February 5, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL BY PRO SE PLAINTIFF SEAN WRIGHT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (ENVELOPE ATTACHED) (DT)
January 31, 2024 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by R. KALB, FONDI, FEDDER, WAYNE STYLES. R. KALB waiver sent on 1/3/2024, answer due 3/4/2024; FONDI waiver sent on 1/3/2024, answer due 3/4/2024; FEDDER waiver sent on 1/3/2024, answer due 3/4/2024; WAYNE STYLES waiver sent on 1/3/2024, answer due 3/4/2024. (Mullen, Brendan)
January 12, 2024 Filing 13 Filing fee: $ 22.01, receipt number 20016499 (jaa, )
January 8, 2024 Filing 12 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by SEAN WRIGHT. (mas)
January 4, 2024 Doc. 11 mailed to pro se. (er)
January 3, 2024 Doc. 5 Mailed to Pro Se. Document 5, Notice, Waiver and Complaint mailed to Defts. certified mail. (er)
January 2, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF RE: WAIVER OF SERVICE MAILED ON 1/3/24. (DT)
January 2, 2024 Filing 10 Notice of REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Nurse Dan, Corrections Health Care on 1/3/24. Waiver of Service due by 2/1/2024. (Attachments: #1 waiver)(dt) Modified on 1/4/2024 (dt).
January 2, 2024 Filing 9 Notice of REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Corrections Officer Wayne Styles on 1/3/24. Waiver of Service due by 2/1/2024. (Attachments: #1 waiver)(dt) Modified on 1/4/2024 (dt).
January 2, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Corrections Officer Kolb on 1/3/24. Waiver of Service due by 2/1/2024. (Attachments: #1 waiver)(dt) Modified on 1/4/2024 (dt).
January 2, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Corrections Officer Fondi on 1/3/24. Waiver of Service due by 2/1/2024. (Attachments: #1 waiver)(dt) Modified on 1/4/2024 (dt).
January 2, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Unit Manager Fedder on 1/3/24. Waiver of Service due by 2/1/2024. (Attachments: #1 WAIVER)(dt) Modified on 1/3/2024 (dt). Modified on 1/4/2024 (dt).
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF 1/2/24 THAT PLAINTIFF SEAN WRIGHT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (ECF NO. 1) IS GRANTED. ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND THIS ORDER TO THE SUPERINTENDENT OF SCI FOREST. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. WRIGHTS REQUEST FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF IS DENIED. ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT IS SPECIALLY APPOINTED TO SERVE WRITTEN WAIVER REQUESTS ON THE THE FOLLOWING DEFENDANTS PURSUANT TO FRCP 4(d). UNIT MANAGER FEDDER, CORRETIONS OFFICER FONDI, NURSE DAN, CORRECTIONS HEALTH CARE, CORRECTIONS OFFICER R. KOLB, CORRECTIONS OFFICER WAYNE STYLES. ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED NOT TO ISSUE SUMMONSES UNTIL FURTHER ORDER. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 1/2/24. 1/3/24 ENTERED AND COPY E-MAILED TO SUPERINTENDANT OF SCI FOREST. (COPY NOT MAILED TO PRO SE) (DT)
December 26, 2023 DOC 4 MAILED TO PRO SE (rf, )
December 22, 2023 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES. NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg)
December 22, 2023 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by SEAN WRIGHT. (sg) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/22/2023) (lisad, ).
December 21, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against FEDDER, FONDI, R. KALB, NURSE (DAN), WAYNE STYLES, filed by SEAN WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE)(sg) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/22/2023) (lisad, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/22/2023) (lisad, ).
December 21, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by SEAN WRIGHT..(sg) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/22/2023) (lisad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WRIGHT v. FEDDER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIT MANAGER FEDDER
Represented By: Brendan Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COIII FONDI
Represented By: Brendan Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE (DAN)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COL. WAYNE STYLES
Represented By: Brendan Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COL. R. KALB
Represented By: Brendan Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?