RUBENSTEIN v. COUNTY OF CHESTER et al
Plaintiff: STEPHEN M. RUBENSTEIN
Defendant: COUNTY OF CHESTER, PRIME CARE MEDICAL INC, KAREN MURPHY, MARTIN ZARKOSKI and DR. MARTIN ZARKOSKI
Case Number: 2:2023cv05134
Filed: December 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M GALLAGHER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2024 Filing 22 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by COUNTY OF CHESTER.(LADOW, KATHERINE)
January 31, 2024 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT by STEPHEN M. RUBENSTEIN. (bw)
January 30, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION TO ENTER EXHIBITS AND DECLARATION filed by STEPHEN M. RUBENSTEIN..(bw)
January 23, 2024 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by COUNTY OF CHESTER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LADOW, KATHERINE)
January 18, 2024 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COUNTY OF CHESTER. COUNTY OF CHESTER waiver sent on 1/12/2024, answer due 3/12/2024. (LADOW, KATHERINE)
January 18, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE E. LADOW on behalf of COUNTY OF CHESTER with Certificate of Service(LADOW, KATHERINE)
January 18, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by GUY A. DONATELLI on behalf of COUNTY OF CHESTER with Certificate of Service(DONATELLI, GUY)
January 16, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE re #13 Request for Waiver of Service (er) Modified on 1/16/2024 (lisad, ).
January 16, 2024 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KAREN MURPHY, PRIME CARE MEDICAL INC, MARTIN ZARKOSKI. KAREN MURPHY waiver sent on 1/12/2024, answer due 3/12/2024; PRIME CARE MEDICAL INC waiver sent on 1/12/2024, answer due 3/12/2024; MARTIN ZARKOSKI waiver sent on 1/12/2024, answer due 3/12/2024. (NINOSKY, JOHN)
January 16, 2024 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Defendants on 1/12/24 by STEPHEN M. RUBENSTEIN. Waiver of Service due by 2/12/2024. (er) Modified on 1/16/2024 (er). (Main Document 13 replaced on 1/16/2024) (er). Modified on 1/16/2024 (lisad, ).
January 16, 2024 Doc. 12 Faxed to Warden of County of Chester (er)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE COURT'S JANUARY 10, 2024 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANTS TO FILE RESPONSES TO THE MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (ECF NO. 7) IS VACATED. PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (ECF NO. 1) IS GRANTED, ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE WARDEN OF CHESTER COUNTY PRISON. THE COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 2) IS DEEMED FILED, ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT IS SPECIALLY APPOINTED TO SERVE WRITTEN WAIVER REQUESTS ON THE FOLLOWING DEFENDANTS, PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4(D), TO EFFECT WAIVER OF SERVICE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 1/12/24. 1/12/24 ENTERED AND COPIES (NOT MAILED TO PRO SE) E-MAILED.(er)
January 12, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by KAREN MURPHY, PRIME CARE MEDICAL INC, MARTIN ZARKOSKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Murphy, #2 Exhibit B - PrimeCare Records)(NINOSKY, JOHN)
January 12, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN R. NINOSKY on behalf of KAREN MURPHY, PRIME CARE MEDICAL INC, MARTIN ZARKOSKI with Certificate of Service(NINOSKY, JOHN)
January 12, 2024 Filing 9 Clerks Office Response to Status Update (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(sbt)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION NO LATER THAN FRIDAY, JANUARY 12, 2024. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 1/10/24. 1/10/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. (er)
January 8, 2024 Filing 8 Request for Status Update dated 1/2/24 by STEPHEN M. RUBENSTEIN (sbt)
January 8, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL filed by STEPHEN M. RUBENSTEIN..(bw)
January 8, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION TO SHOW THE CAUSE FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER WITH DEFENDANTS AND CONTRACTORS filed by STEPHEN M. RUBENSTEIN..(bw)
December 28, 2023 COPY OF DOC. NO. 4 HAS BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE. (bw)
December 26, 2023 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw)
December 26, 2023 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by STEPHEN M. RUBENSTEIN. (bw) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/28/2023) (lisad, ).
December 26, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against COUNTY OF CHESTER, KAREN MURPHY, PRIME CARE MEDICAL INC, MARTIN ZARKOSKI, filed by STEPHEN M. RUBENSTEIN.(bw)
December 26, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by STEPHEN M. RUBENSTEIN..(bw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUBENSTEIN v. COUNTY OF CHESTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN M. RUBENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF CHESTER
Represented By: GUY A. DONATELLI
Represented By: KATHERINE E. LADOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIME CARE MEDICAL INC
Represented By: JOHN R. NINOSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN MURPHY
Represented By: JOHN R. NINOSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN ZARKOSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. MARTIN ZARKOSKI
Represented By: JOHN R. NINOSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?