FSD Pharma, Inc. v. Bokhari
Petitioner: FSD Pharma, Inc.
Respondent: Raza Bokhari
Case Number: 2:2023mc00150
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Miscellaneous
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT RESPONDENT RAZA BOKHARI'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE PETITION #1 IS 2/9/24. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 1/23/24. 1/23/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 20, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW M. ERDLEN on behalf of Raza Bokhari with Certificate of Service(ERDLEN, ANDREW)
January 20, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN S. SUMMERS on behalf of Raza Bokhari with Certificate of Service(SUMMERS, JOHN)
January 17, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE by FSD Pharma, Inc. Notice of Proof of Service of Petition to Confirm a Foreign Arbitration Award on Respondent Raza Bokhari (FLETCHER, ANDREW)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PETITIONERS PETITION TO ALLOW FOR SERVICE BY US MARSHAL (ECF. 3) IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN, ETC. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 12/22/23. 12/22/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
December 19, 2023 Filing 3 PETITION ALLOW FOR SERVICE BY U.S. MARSHAL re #1 Registration of Foreign Judgment (Attorney) filed by FSD Pharma, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FLETCHER, ANDREW) Modified on 12/22/2023 (lvj).
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE TO DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 12/7/23. 12/7/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
December 4, 2023 Filing Fee for MISCELLANEOUS CASE by FSD Pharma, Inc.. (Filing Fee $52, receipt number APAEDC-17107667). (FLETCHER, ANDREW)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD filed by FSD Pharma, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF DONAL CARROLL, #2 Exhibit TO DECLARATION, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(FLETCHER, ANDREW) Modified on 12/4/2023 (nd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FSD Pharma, Inc. v. Bokhari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FSD Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: ANDREW K. FLETCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Raza Bokhari
Represented By: ANDREW M. ERDLEN
Represented By: JOHN S. SUMMERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?