COX v. FOSTER WHEELER, LLC et al
Defendant: GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY, JOHN CRANE INC., VELAN VALVE CORP. and VIACOMCBS INC.
Cross Defendant: JEAN C. COX, FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, GOODYEAR CANADA, POWELL VALVES and TACO PUMPS
Other: GENERAL ELECTRIC CO.
Case Number: 2:2024cv00305
Filed: January 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2024 Filing 27 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint With Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Crossclaim against All Parties by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC.(VALINIS, SUSAN)
March 7, 2024 Filing 26 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Crossclaims against All Parties by POWELL VALVES.(MCDEVITT HAGAN, TRACEY)
March 7, 2024 Filing 25 DEFENDANT GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY'S ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND REPLY TO CROSS CLAIMS, CROSSCLAIM against FLOWSERVE CORPORATION(individually and as successor to IDP Pumps f/k/a Ingersoll Dresser Pumps), FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, GENERAL ELECTRIC CO., GOODYEAR CANADA, GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, JOHN CRANE INC., POWELL VALVES, TACO PUMPS, VELAN VALVE CORP., VIACOMCBS INC.(f/k/a CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation) by GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY.(JACKSON, DAMIAN)
February 29, 2024 Filing 24 Alias Summons Issued as to FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY, POWELL VALVES. Forwarded To: Michael A. Rowe on 2/29/24 (fdc)
February 28, 2024 Filing 23 Praecipe to Issue Alias Summons filed by JEAN C. COX. (ROWE, MICHAEL)
February 28, 2024 Filing 22 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by JOHN CRANE INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF DEFENDANTS TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT #13 IS DENIED AS MOOT. PLAINTIFFS HAVBE FILED AND SERVED AN AMENDED COMPLAINT.SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 2/23/24.2/23/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
February 22, 2024 Filing 20 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses,, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by VIACOMCBS INC..(MCSHEA, JOHN)
February 22, 2024 Filing 19 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses,, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by GENERAL ELECTRIC CO..(MCSHEA, JOHN)
February 15, 2024 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JEAN C. COX.(ROWE, MICHAEL)
February 8, 2024 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's 12b(6) Motion) filed by JEAN C. COX. (ROWE, MICHAEL)
February 2, 2024 Notice of Removal Filing Fee of $405 receipt number APAEDC-17209809 #2 refunded to the credit card originally used as payment was received with receipt number APAEDC-17207510 #1 . (fdc)
February 1, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by JOEL M DONER on behalf of TACO PUMPS (DONER, JOEL)
January 29, 2024 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Smiths Group PLC by JOHN CRANE INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG TO HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/29/24. 1/29/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 26, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JOHN CRANE INC..Memorandum and Certificate of Service.(TURNER, TIFFANY)
January 26, 2024 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by VIACOMCBS INC..(MCSHEA, JOHN)
January 26, 2024 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GENERAL ELECTRIC CO..(MCSHEA, JOHN)
January 25, 2024 Filing 10 State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (CCP - Philadelphia County cv, )
January 25, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. MCMEEKIN on behalf of GOODYEAR CANADA with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
January 25, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC regarding Designation Form (LUNNEY, LINDSEY)
January 25, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. MCSHEA on behalf of VIACOMCBS INC. with Certificate of Service(MCSHEA, JOHN)
January 25, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. MCSHEA on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC CO. with Certificate of Service(MCSHEA, JOHN)
January 24, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. MCMEEKIN on behalf of GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
January 24, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A. ROWE on behalf of JEAN C. COX with Jury Demand Certificate of Service(ROWE, MICHAEL)
January 24, 2024 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. DEFENDANT's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Certification question asking if the case is/is not related needs to be answered. (sbt)
January 23, 2024 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including John Wood Group plc with Certificate of Service by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC.(LUNNEY, LINDSEY)
January 23, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17209809), filed by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC.(LUNNEY, LINDSEY)
January 23, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOHN CRANE INC. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17207510), filed by JOHN CRANE INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/24/2024) (sbt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COX v. FOSTER WHEELER, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: JEAN C. COX
Represented By: CASEY R COBURN
Represented By: MICHAEL A. ROWE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: FOSTER WHEELER, LLC
Represented By: LINDSEY E. LUNNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: FLOWSERVE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN C. MCMEEKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: GOODYEAR CANADA
Represented By: JOHN C. MCMEEKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: POWELL VALVES
Represented By: TRACEY MCDEVITT HAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: TACO PUMPS
Represented By: JOEL M DONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: GENERAL ELECTRIC CO.
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY
Represented By: DAMIAN JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE INC.
Represented By: TIFFANY F. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VELAN VALVE CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOMCBS INC.
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?