THE PHILADELPHIA REGIONAL PORT AUTHORITY v. UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS et al
Plaintiff: THE PHILADELPHIA REGIONAL PORT AUTHORITY
Defendant: UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, DISTRICT COMMANDER FOR THE PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT OF THE ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, JEFFREY BEEMAN, CHIEF OF THE REGULATORY BRANCH FOR THE PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT OF THE ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, TODD A. SCHAIBLE and MICHAEL L. CONNOR
Case Number: 2:2024cv01008
Filed: March 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 30 U.S.C. ยง 181 Environment: Review of Agency Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2024 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to MICHAEL L. CONNOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: US ATTY on 5/3/24 (amas)
May 2, 2024 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by THE PHILADELPHIA REGIONAL PORT AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(RILEY, BRANDON)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS COMPLAINT TO SUE THE ASSISTANT SECRETARY OF THE UNITED STATES ARMY FOR CIVIL WORKS, MICHAEL L. CONNOR, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY (ECF NO. 15) IS GRANTED REQUIRING THAT PLAINTIFF FILE THE AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT 1 TO ITS MOTION (ECF NO. 152) NO LATER THAN MAY 3, 2024. DEFENDANTS RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN MAY 20, 2024. NOTHING IN THIS ORDER AFFECTS THE PARTIES ONGOING OBLIGATIONS UNDER THE APRIL 25, 2024 ORDER (ECF NO. 12). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 5/2/24.5/2/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
May 2, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint (Attorney), (UNOPPOSED) filed by THE PHILADELPHIA REGIONAL PORT AUTHORITY.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Redline Original Complaint and Proposed Amended Complaint)(RILEY, BRANDON)
May 2, 2024 AMENDED PLEADINGS DUE BY 5/3/2024. (amas)
May 1, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE by CHIEF OF THE REGULATORY BRANCH FOR THE PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT OF THE ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, TODD A. SCHAIBLE, DISTRICT COMMANDER FOR THE PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT OF THE ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, JEFFREY BEEMAN, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS TO CERTIFY THE ADMINSTRATIVE RECORDS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2024-05-01_Section 404 10 Administrative Record Certification, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2024-05-01_Section 408 Administrative Record Certification)(SMITH, STACEY)
May 1, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T Hammons on behalf of CHIEF OF THE REGULATORY BRANCH FOR THE PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT OF THE ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, TODD A. SCHAIBLE, DISTRICT COMMANDER FOR THE PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT OF THE ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, JEFFREY BEEMAN, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS (Hammons, Jeffrey)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (DOC. NO. #9 ) IS DENIED. FURTHER INFORMATION OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/25/24.4/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
April 22, 2024 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEYin Courtroom 7B Motion Hearing held on 4/22/24 re #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Case Plan (JOINT) filed by CHIEF OF THE REGULATORY BRANCH FOR THE PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT OF THE ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, TODD A. SCHAIBLE, DISTRICT COMMANDER FOR THE PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT OF THE ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, JEFFREY BEEMAN, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS (amas)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERING THE JOINT MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE (ECF NO. 21) IN 23CV4283 AND ECF NO. #9 IN 24CV1008, WE SHALL HOLD A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ON THE JOINT MOTIONS ON 4/22/2024 AT 3:30 PM I BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 04/18/2024. 04/19/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd)
April 18, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Case Plan (JOINT) filed by CHIEF OF THE REGULATORY BRANCH FOR THE PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT OF THE ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, TODD A. SCHAIBLE, DISTRICT COMMANDER FOR THE PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT OF THE ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, JEFFREY BEEMAN, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed_Order_on_Mtn_Consolidate_and_Case_Plan, #2 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Consolidate_Newell Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1-A - ER_(O&M - Section 204(f)))(SMITH, STACEY)
April 18, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by STACEY L.B. SMITH on behalf of CHIEF OF THE REGULATORY BRANCH FOR THE PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT OF THE ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, TODD A. SCHAIBLE, DISTRICT COMMANDER FOR THE PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT OF THE ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, JEFFREY BEEMAN, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS with Certificate of Service(SMITH, STACEY)
March 20, 2024 Filing 7 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (amas)
March 12, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew S. Levine on behalf of THE PHILADELPHIA REGIONAL PORT AUTHORITY with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(Levine, Andrew)
March 11, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CHIEF OF THE REGULATORY BRANCH FOR THE PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT OF THE ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, TODD A. SCHAIBLE, DISTRICT COMMANDER FOR THE PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT OF THE ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, JEFFREY BEEMAN. (amas)
March 11, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: US ATTY on 3/11/24 (amas)
March 8, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by BRANDON MICHAEL RILEY on behalf of THE PHILADELPHIA REGIONAL PORT AUTHORITY with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(RILEY, BRANDON)
March 8, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. ENGLE on behalf of THE PHILADELPHIA REGIONAL PORT AUTHORITY with Certificate of Service(ENGLE, MICHAEL)
March 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17315237.), filed by THE PHILADELPHIA REGIONAL PORT AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7)(RILEY, BRANDON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE PHILADELPHIA REGIONAL PORT AUTHORITY v. UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE PHILADELPHIA REGIONAL PORT AUTHORITY
Represented By: ANDREW S. LEVINE
Represented By: BRANDON MICHAEL RILEY
Represented By: MICHAEL J. ENGLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Represented By: Jeffrey T Hammons
Represented By: STACEY L.B. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT COMMANDER FOR THE PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT OF THE ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, JEFFREY BEEMAN
Represented By: Jeffrey T Hammons
Represented By: STACEY L.B. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIEF OF THE REGULATORY BRANCH FOR THE PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT OF THE ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, TODD A. SCHAIBLE
Represented By: Jeffrey T Hammons
Represented By: STACEY L.B. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL L. CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?