ALI-YUZON GAUS v. MCGEE, et. al
Petitioner: ISA ALI-YUZON GAUS
Respondent: SEAN P. MCGEE, MONTGOMERY COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE and PENNSYLVANIA OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 2:2024cv01271
Filed: March 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M GALLAGHER
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH T HEY
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT M. FALIN on behalf of SEAN P. MCGEE, MONTGOMERY COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, PENNSYLVANIA OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL with Certificate of Service(FALIN, ROBERT)
May 14, 2024 Doc. 7 mailed to pro se. (er)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY SHALL FILE SPECIFIC AND DETAILED ANSWERS WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE ENTRY OF THIS ORDER. FURTHER ORDERED TO ENSURE THEN IN A FEDERAL HABEAS CORPRUS PROCEEDING ARISING OUT OF A STATE CONVICTION, ANY VICTIMS ARE AFFORDED THEIR RIGHTS UNDER THE CRIMES VICTIM ACT, AS AMENDED 7/27/2006. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 5/13/24. 5/13/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND EMAILED TO DA OF MONTCO AND PA ATTORNEY GENERAL(rf, )
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CHANGE THE CAPTION TO REFLECT THAT THIS IS NOT AN IN RE CASE, BUT RATHER THAT THERE ARE NAMED RESPONDENTS. LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE ELIZABETH T. HEY, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO PROVIDE THE MONTGOMERY COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE AND THE PENNSYLVANIA OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL WITH A COPY OF THE PETITION; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 5/13/24. 5/13/24 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED TO THE MONTGOMERY COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE AND THE PENNSYLVANIA OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL.(mas)
April 12, 2024 Filing 6 ISA ALI-YUZON GAUS APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS.(JL)
April 12, 2024 Filing 5 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against ISA ALI-YUZON GAUS, filed by ISA ALI-YUZON GAUS.(rf, ) (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/19/2024) (ke). (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/19/2024) (ke).
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PETITIONER HAVING FILED A PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS 2241 WITHOUT EITHER PAYING THE FEE OR FILING A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, AND FURTHER RECOGNIZING THAT THE PETITIONER HAS FAILED TO USE THE COURTS STANDARD FORM, A BLANK COPY OF THE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, STANDARD FORM FOR FILING A PETITION 2241 ALONG WITH THIS ORDER WILL BE MAILED TO PETITIONER. IF PETITIONER MUST WITHIN 30 DAYS PAY THE REQUIRED $5 FILING FEE OR COMPLETE AND RETURN THE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT. PETITIONER SHALL ALSO COMPLETE THE PETITION FORM, SIGN AND RETURN TO THE COURT. IF PETITIONER FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, THE PETITION MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE.. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 3/29/24. 3/29/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO GAUS ALONG WITH IFP (SHORT FORM) AND 2241 PACKET(rf, )
March 27, 2024 MAILED OUT PRO SE GUIDELINES TO PETITIONER ON 3/27/24. (jaa, )
March 25, 2024 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (rf, )
March 25, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION filed by ISA ALI-YUZON GAUS..(rf, )
March 25, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by ISA ALI-YUZON GAUS. *NO FEE PAID. NO IFP*(rf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALI-YUZON GAUS v. MCGEE, et. al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ISA ALI-YUZON GAUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SEAN P. MCGEE
Represented By: ROBERT M. FALIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MONTGOMERY COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Represented By: ROBERT M. FALIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PENNSYLVANIA OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: ROBERT M. FALIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?