RICE v. KARASTON et al
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY RICE
Defendant: C/O KARASTON, C/O MANTUCE, C/O ANTWON and UNIT MANAGER GRADY
Case Number: 2:2024cv01501
Filed: April 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KELLEY BRISBON HODGE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2024 Doc. 6 and 7, Prisoner Complaint mailed to Pro Se. (er) Modified on 6/6/2024 (er).
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE SUPERINTENDENT OF SCI PHOENIX. COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED IN PART WITH PREJUDICE AND DISMISSED IN PART WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. CLEKR OF COURT SHALL SEND RICE A PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT BEARING CASE NUMBER, ETC. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 6/5/24. 6/5/24 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (rf, )
June 5, 2024 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 6/5/24. 6/5/24 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(rf, )
June 5, 2024 DOCS 6 & 7 EMAIL TO SUPERINTENDENT OF SCI PHOENIX (rf, )
April 29, 2024 Filing 5 Response by TIMOTHY RICE. (rf, )
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF HAVING FAILED TO FILE A CERTIFIED COPY OF THE PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT, AS REQUIRED, PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS CANNOT BE ADJUDICATED AT THIS TIME. PLAINTIFF SHALL, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, FILE A CERTIFIED COPY OF THE PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT. ALTERNATIVELY PLAINTIFF CAN PROCEED BY SUBMITTING $405 TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, THE CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE.. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 4/22/24. 4/22/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. (rf, )
April 12, 2024 Copy of Pro Se Guidelines Notice (#3) mailed to Rice. (fdc)
April 8, 2024 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES (rf, )
April 8, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ANTWON, GRADY, KARASTON, MANTUCE, filed by TIMOTHY RICE. *IFP PENDING*(rf, )
April 8, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by TIMOTHY RICE. *ONLY 2 PAGES OF THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IFP WERE RECEIVED BY CLERKS OFFICE*.(rf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RICE v. KARASTON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY RICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O KARASTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O MANTUCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O ANTWON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIT MANAGER GRADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?