PEACOCK v. ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC
Plaintiff: STERLING PEACOCK
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC
Case Number: 2:2024cv01621
Filed: April 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Referring Judge: CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity - Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2024 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS Pretrial Status Video Conference held on 6/5/24 (rf, )
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT TRIAL DATE SET FOR 3/14/2025 10:00 AM IN Courtroom 3F. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 6/5/24. 6/5/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 2/6/2025., FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/14/2025 10:00 AM IN Judge's Chambers; JURY SELECTION SET FOR 3/14/2025 11:00 AM IN Courtroom 3F; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 3/17/2025 10:00 AM IN Courtroom 3F; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/21/2024 10:00 AM IN Video Conference; MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 2/6/2025., PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 2/20/2025., DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 2/20/2025. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 6/5/24. 6/5/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/5/2024 02:00 PM IN Telephone Conference. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 5/29/24. 5/29/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT AND ORDER TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THAT CASE IS ASSIGNED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE WELLS. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 5/9/24. (Attachments: #1 CLERKS MAGISTRATE SHEET) 5/9/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
May 8, 2024 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.. (HERMAN, DAVID)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT DISCOVERY DUE BY 9/9/2024., MOTIONS DUE BY 10/15/2024., MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 11/13/2024., FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/3/2024 10:30 PM IN Courtroom 14B; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/6/2024 03:00 PM IN Telephone Conference; PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/29/2024., DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/29/2024., TRIAL POOL SET FOR 12/9/2024. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 5/8/24. 5/8/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
May 8, 2024 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ Pretrial Conference held on 5/8/24. (rf, )
May 6, 2024 Filing 7 Report Of Rule 16 Conference by STERLING PEACOCK. (CARFAGNO, JAMES)
April 29, 2024 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Allstate Insurance Company with Certificate of Service by STERLING PEACOCK.(CARFAGNO, JAMES)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/8/2024 09:00 AM IN Telephone Conference. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 4/25/24. 4/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
April 25, 2024 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.(HERMAN, DAVID)
April 22, 2024 Filing 3 State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (CCP - Philadelphia County cv, )
April 19, 2024 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.(HERMAN, DAVID)
April 18, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC to Philadelphia Court (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17408673), filed by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit, #4 Designation Form)(HERMAN, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PEACOCK v. ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STERLING PEACOCK
Represented By: JAMES P. CARFAGNO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC
Represented By: DAVID A. HERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?