STREET v. GAC SHIPPING USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY STREET
Defendant: GAC SHIPPING USA, INC., INDEPENDENT CONTAINER LINE LTD., TRANSESTE SCHIFFAHRT, GMBH, EF OLIVIA, LTD., EF OLIVIA GMBH & CO. KG, DOHLE SHIPMANAGEMENT, LTD. and PETER DOHLE SCHIFFARTS-KG
Case Number: 2:2024cv01739
Filed: April 25, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2024 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by KIMBERLY STREET. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavits of Service)(ZAJAC, ERIC)
May 9, 2024 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by INDEPENDENT CONTAINER LINE LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F - Stipulation to Amend, #2 Exhibit G - Order Granting Stipulation, #3 Exhibit H - Email dated 4-24-24, #4 Exhibit I - Email dated 4-26-24, #5 Unreported Cases, #6 Certificate of Service)(REEVES, MARY)
April 29, 2024 Filing 6 State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (CCP - Philadelphia County cv, )
April 26, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN G. O'DONOVAN on behalf of GAC SHIPPING USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(O'DONOVAN, KEVIN)
April 25, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by KIMBERLY STREET.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(ZAJAC, ERIC)
April 25, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE by INDEPENDENT CONTAINER LINE LTD. Corrected Designation Form (REEVES, MARY)
April 25, 2024 Filing 2 Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt)
April 25, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by INDEPENDENT CONTAINER LINE, LIMITED (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17423798), filed by INDEPENDENT CONTAINER LINE, LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form Designation Form, #3 Exhibit A - Writ of Summons, #4 Exhibit B - Affidavit of G. Esteves, #5 Exhibit C - Order Consolidating Cases, #6 Exhibit D - Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit E - Affidavit of D. Martin, #8 Certificate of Service)(REEVES, MARY)
April 25, 2024 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. DEFENDANT's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Signature is missing and the Civil Box is not checked off. (sbt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STREET v. GAC SHIPPING USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY STREET
Represented By: ERIC G. ZAJAC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAC SHIPPING USA, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN G. O'DONOVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDEPENDENT CONTAINER LINE LTD.
Represented By: MARY ELISA REEVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANSESTE SCHIFFAHRT, GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EF OLIVIA, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EF OLIVIA GMBH & CO. KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOHLE SHIPMANAGEMENT, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER DOHLE SCHIFFARTS-KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?