Benjamin Franklin Franchising SPE LLC v. Philco Services Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Franklin Franchising SPE LLC
Defendant: Philco Services Group, Inc. and Thomas Setteducato
Case Number: 2:2024cv01770
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KAI N SCOTT
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2024 Filing 21 Proposed Pretrial Order Amended Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Benjamin Franklin Franchising SPE LLC. (ARCHER, DAVID)
June 24, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE by Benjamin Franklin Franchising SPE LLC of Filing of Amended Proposed Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ARCHER, DAVID)
June 5, 2024 Filing 19 DEFAULT BY Philco Services Group, Inc., Thomas Setteducato FOR FAILURE TO PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (JL)
June 5, 2024 Default Entered (JL)
June 5, 2024 Filing 18 Request for Default Benjamin Franklin Franchising SPE LLC against Philco Services Group, Inc., Thomas Setteducato. (ARCHER, DAVID)
June 5, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE by Benjamin Franklin Franchising SPE LLC Notice of Compliance with Order to Serve Notice of Oral Argument (ARCHER, DAVID)
June 4, 2024 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT Motion Hearing held on 6/3/24 re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Benjamin Franklin Franchising SPE LLC Court Reporter: ESR. (JL)
June 4, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : MOTION HEARING SET FOR 6/25/2024 01:30 PM IN Courtroom 13B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT.(sfl)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ROBERT ZISK ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFFS IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 6/3/24.6/3/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
May 31, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Robert Zisk, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17506520.) filed by Benjamin Franklin Franchising SPE LLC.Certificate of Service.(SALMANSON, MICHAEL)
May 31, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE by Benjamin Franklin Franchising SPE LLC re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Proposed Order (SALMANSON, MICHAEL)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF MICHAEL STURM AS COUNSEL FOR BENJAMIN FRANKLIN FRANCHISING SPE, LLC IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 5/30/24. 5/30/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
May 28, 2024 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael L. Sturm by Benjamin Franklin Franchising SPE LLC. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17495897.). (ARCHER, DAVID)
May 28, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : MOTION HEARING SET FOR 6/3/2024 09:30 AM IN Courtroom 13B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT.(sfl)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF DAVID ARCHER TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFFS IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 5/23/24.5/23/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL) (Main Document 8 replaced on 5/24/2024) (jl).
May 23, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of David Archer, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17489532.) filed by Benjamin Franklin Franchising SPE LLC.Certificate of Service.(SALMANSON, MICHAEL)
May 22, 2024 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by John Auriemma re: served Summons, Complaint & Exhibits, Motion for Preliminary Injunction & Memorandum of Law upon Thomas Setteducato by Personal Service on 05/21/2024 (SALMANSON, MICHAEL)
May 22, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by John Auriemma re: served Summons, Complaint & Exhibits, Motion for Preliminary Injunction & Memorandum of Law upon Philco Services Group, Inc. by Personal Service on 05/09/2024 (SALMANSON, MICHAEL)
May 1, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Benjamin Franklin Franchising SPE LLC.Memorandum of Law. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration Declaration of Ted Rayno, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 - Franchise Agreement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A-2 - Franchise Agreement, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A-3 - Franchise Agreement, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A-4 - Franchise Agreement, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A-5 - Assignment & Assumption, #8 Exhibit Exhibit A-6 - Promissory Note, #9 Exhibit Exhibit A-7 - Notice of Default, #10 Exhibit Exhibit A-8 - Notice of Termination, #11 Exhibit Exhibit A-9 - Letter from Pa AG, #12 Exhibit Exhibit A-10 - E-Mail Transmission of Picture, #13 Exhibit Exhibit A-11 - Text Messages, #14 Exhibit Exhibit A-12 - E-Mail Transmission of Picture, #15 Exhibit Exhibit A-13 - Picture, #16 Exhibit Exhibit A-14 - Cease & Desist Notice, #17 Declaration Declaration of Tom Jaeb, #18 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(SALMANSON, MICHAEL)
April 26, 2024 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Benjamin Franklin Franchising SPE LLC.(SALMANSON, MICHAEL)
April 26, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Philco Services Group, Inc., Thomas Setteducato. Forwarded To: E-MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 4/26/24 (JL)
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Philco Services Group, Inc., Thomas Setteducato ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17426770.), filed by Benjamin Franklin Franchising SPE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Franchise Agreement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Franchise Agreement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Franchise Agreement, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Assignment & Assumption, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Promissory Note, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Notice of Default, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Notice of Termination, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Letter from PA AG, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J - Cease & Desist Notice, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Designation Form Designation Form)(SALMANSON, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benjamin Franklin Franchising SPE LLC v. Philco Services Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Franklin Franchising SPE LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL J. SALMANSON
Represented By: DAVID ARCHER
Represented By: Michael Lee Sturm
Represented By: ROBERT L. ZISK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philco Services Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Setteducato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?