HOUCK et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: RYAN-MARIE HOUCK and MARK HOUCK
Defendant: JOHN DOE #1, JOHN DOE #3, BRIAN CALABRESE, MICHAEL ROGERS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, STEPHEN CAPUTO, ZACH BROSIUS, STEVE JOHNSON, JOHN DOE #2, JUAN BARRIOS and JOHN DOE #4
Case Number: 2:2024cv02151
Filed: May 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER THAT MOTION (DOC. 33) IS GRANTED. UNITED STATES SHALL RESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINTBY 8/22/24. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 7/17/24.7/18/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 17, 2024 Filing 33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Attorney), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(TERRELL, STEPHEN)
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S #25 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JUSTIN D. SMITH, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/28/24.6/28/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S #23 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF TODD P. GRAVES, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/28/24.6/28/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF MARK HOUCK'S #22 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MATTHEW J. BRITTON, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/28/24.6/28/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S #21 APPLICATION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF KATHERINE E. GRAVES, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/28/24.6/28/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF, MARK HOUCK'S #20 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF GREGORY DWIGHT ARTIS, JR., ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/28/24.6/28/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF MARK HOUCK'S #19 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF EDWARD D. GREIM, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/28/24.6/28/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS Brian Calabrese, Stephen Caputo, Steve Johnson, and Zach Brosius's #24 MOTION TO CLARIFY IS GRANTED AND THAT THESE FOUR DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE A MOTION, ANSWER, OR OTHER RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 8/22/24. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/27/24.6/27/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 27, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Justin D. Smith, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17566808.) filed by MARK HOUCK.Certificate of Service.(BOCHETTO, GEORGE)
June 27, 2024 Filing 24 UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CLARIFY RESPONSE DEADLINE AND FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT as to #1 Complaint (Attorney), filed by ZACH BROSIUS, BRIAN CALABRESE, STEPHEN CAPUTO, STEVE JOHNSON, Memorandum, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service, Supporting Exhibits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Caputo Deputation Paperwork, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Calabrese Deputation Paperwork, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Johnson Deputation Paperwork, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Brosius Deputation Paperwork)(Hackert, Connor) Modified on 6/28/2024 (md).
June 27, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Todd P. Graves, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17565737.) filed by MARK HOUCK.Certificate of Service.(BOCHETTO, GEORGE)
June 27, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Matthew J. Britton, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17565710.) filed by MARK HOUCK.Certificate of Service.(BOCHETTO, GEORGE)
June 27, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Katherine E. Graves, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17565694.) filed by MARK HOUCK.Certificate of Service.(BOCHETTO, GEORGE)
June 27, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Gregory Dwight Artis Jr., Esquire ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17565673.) filed by MARK HOUCK.Certificate of Service.(BOCHETTO, GEORGE)
June 27, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Edward D. Greim,Esquire ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17565660.) filed by MARK HOUCK.Certificate of Service.(BOCHETTO, GEORGE)
June 26, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Connor John Hackert on behalf of ZACH BROSIUS, BRIAN CALABRESE, STEPHEN CAPUTO, STEVE JOHNSON (Hackert, Connor)
June 26, 2024 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARK HOUCK re: Guaranteed Subpoena Service, Inc served Summons and Complaint upon STEVE JOHNSON by Summons and Complaint were left with defendant's mother Victoria Johnson at defendant's residence. STEVE JOHNSON served on 6/7/2024, answer due 6/28/2024. (BOCHETTO, GEORGE)
June 26, 2024 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARK HOUCK re: Guaranteed Subpoena Service, Inc. served Summons and Complaint upon STEPHEN CAPUTO by Served personally upon the defendant c/o City Solicitor. STEPHEN CAPUTO served on 6/7/2024, answer due 6/28/2024. (BOCHETTO, GEORGE)
June 26, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARK HOUCK re: Guaranteed Subpoena Service, Inc. served Summons and Complaint upon BRIAN CALABRESE by Served personally upon the defendant. BRIAN CALABRESE served on 6/14/2024, answer due 7/5/2024. (BOCHETTO, GEORGE)
June 26, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARK HOUCK re: it's DONE! Courier served Summons and Complaint upon ZACH BROSIUS by Hand Delivered. (BOCHETTO, GEORGE)
June 26, 2024 Filing 13 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE Re: accepted summons and complaint for ZACH BROSIUS on 6/23/2024, answer due 7/15/2024. (BOCHETTO, GEORGE) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; ATTY TO REFILE) Modified on 6/26/2024 (md).
June 24, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by BRYAN R. LENTZ on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LENTZ, BRYAN)
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE COMMONWEALTH DEFENDANTS' #10 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER IS GRANTED. THE COMMONWEALTH DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE THEIR RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 7/28/24. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/24/24.6/24/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 21, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by JUAN BARRIOS, MICHAEL ROGERS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(Box, Adrienne)
June 4, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN R. LENTZ on behalf of MARK HOUCK, RYAN-MARIE HOUCK(ON BEHALF OF M.H., A.M.H., K.H., T.H., J.H., A.H., and I.H.), RYAN-MARIE HOUCK (LENTZ, BRYAN)
June 4, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan T. Kirk on behalf of MARK HOUCK, RYAN-MARIE HOUCK(ON BEHALF OF M.H., A.M.H., K.H., T.H., J.H., A.H., and I.H.), RYAN-MARIE HOUCK (Kirk, Ryan)
June 3, 2024 Filing 7 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (rf, )
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS MAGISTRATE JUDGE STRAW. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 5/29/24. 5/29/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
May 22, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to JUAN BARRIOS, ZACH BROSIUS, BRIAN CALABRESE, STEPHEN CAPUTO, STEVE JOHNSON, MICHAEL ROGERS. (rf, )
May 22, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (rf, )
May 20, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE by MARK HOUCK, RYAN-MARIE HOUCK(ON BEHALF OF M.H., A.M.H., K.H., T.H., J.H., A.H., and I.H.), RYAN-MARIE HOUCK re #1 Complaint (Attorney), Designation Form (BOCHETTO, GEORGE)
May 20, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE BOCHETTO on behalf of A.H., A.M.H., MARK HOUCK, RYAN-MARIE HOUCK, I.H., J.H., K.H., M.H., T.H. (BOCHETTO, GEORGE)
May 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17479994.), filed by MARK HOUCK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Designation Form)(BOCHETTO, GEORGE) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/20/2024) (sbt). (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/20/2024) (sbt). (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/21/2024) (sbt).
May 20, 2024 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. The Yes/No questions have to be answered. (sbt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOUCK et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN CALABRESE
Represented By: Connor John Hackert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL ROGERS
Represented By: Adrienne Box
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: STEPHEN R. TERRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN CAPUTO
Represented By: Connor John Hackert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZACH BROSIUS
Represented By: Connor John Hackert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE JOHNSON
Represented By: Connor John Hackert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUAN BARRIOS
Represented By: Adrienne Box
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN-MARIE HOUCK
Represented By: Ryan T. Kirk
Represented By: GEORGE BOCHETTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK HOUCK
Represented By: TODD P. GRAVES
Represented By: MATTHEW J. BRITTON
Represented By: KATHERINE E. GRAVES
Represented By: JUSTIN D. SMITH
Represented By: GREGORY DWIGHT ARTIS, JR.
Represented By: EDWARD DEAN GREIM
Represented By: Ryan T. Kirk
Represented By: GEORGE BOCHETTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?