USA ex rel INTL. BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS V. THE FAIRFIELD CO.
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, LOCAL UNION NO.98
Defendant: THE FARFIELD COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2009cv04230
Filed: September 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Allentown Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: LAWRENCE F. STENGEL
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER RELATOR'S MOTION 235 IS GRANTED IN PART TO AWARD THE RELATOR $1,229,927.55 IN REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND $203,226.45 IN REASONABLE COSTS TO BE INCORPORATED IN TODAY'S JUDGMENT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/10/2020. 4/10/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ka, )
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT WE OVERRULE THE DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS 215 TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND, CONSISTENT WITH THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM, ADOPT THE SPECIAL MASTER'S FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; DEFENDANT THE FAIR FIELD COMPANY IS LIABLE, UNDER 31 USC SEC. 3729, TO PAY $1,055,320.62 ALLOCATED AS $316,596.19 AWARDED TO PLAINTIFF-RELATOR AND $787,724.43 AWARDED TO THE UNITED STATES; ON OR BEFORE 2/19/20, PLAINTIFF MAY MOVE FOR AN AWARD OF REASONAB LE EXPENSES, ATTORNEY'S FEES, AND COSTS UNDER 31 USC SEC. 3730(D)(2) COMPLIANT WITH OUR POLICIES AND INCLUDING SUPPORTING COMPARATOR REASONABLENESS AFFIDAVITS WITH A RESPONSE DUE NO LATER THAN 3/4/20; AND, WE DEFER ENTRY OF JUDGMENT UNTIL AN AWARD, IF ANY, OF REASONABLE EXPENSES, ATTORNEY'S FEES, AND COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/5/20. 2/5/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(fdc, )
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 10/15/2019. 10/16/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(nd, )
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 182 IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/26/19. 8/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS 162 IS DENIED; AND, WE WILL HOLD A TELEPHONIC TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON MONDAY, 5/20/19 AT 8:45 AM. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL SHALL INITIATE THIS CALL AND TIMELY CALL CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7680 WHEN ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 5/2/19. 5/3/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO THE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR CONCERNING THE ISSUE OF COMPLEX WORKER CLASSIFICATIONS AND WAGE DETERMINATIONS PURSUANT TO THE DAVIS-BACON ACT, 40 USC:267(A) ET SEQ.; THE CASE IS STAYED PENDING THE OUTCOME OF THE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR'S FINDINGS; AND THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO PLACE THIS MATTER IN SUSPENSE AND MARK THIS CASE CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. THIS COURT SHALL RETAIN JURISDICTION, AND THE CASE WILL BE RESTORED TO THE TRIAL DOC KET, IF NECESSARY, WHEN THE ACTION IS IN A STATUS SO THAT IT MAY PROCEED TO FINAL DISPOSITION. THIS ORDER SHALL NOT PREJUDICE THE RIGHTS OF THE PARTIES TO THIS LITIGATION. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 9/26/17. 9/26/17 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS HERBEY DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 7/2/2013. 7/2/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA ex rel INTL. BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS V. THE FAIRFIELD CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE FARFIELD COMPANY
Represented By: ZACHARY R. DAVIS
Represented By: SUSAN R. FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, LOCAL UNION NO.98
Represented By: ELIZABETH ANN COLEMAN
Represented By: MARC L. GELMAN
Represented By: RICHARD B. SIGMOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?