FULTON BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. NATCITY INVESTMENTS, INC.
Plaintiff: FULTON FINANCIAL ADVISORS, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Defendant: NATCITY INVESTMENTS, INC.
Case Number: 5:2009cv04855
Filed: October 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Allentown Office
County: Lancaster
Presiding Judge: LAWRENCE F. STENGEL
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER THAT DEFT NATCITY INVESTMENTS, INC.'S MOTION IS GRANTED AS TO PLFF'S THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION ASSERTING A CLAIM FOR VIOLATION OF SECTION 1-501 OF THE PENNSYLVANIA SECURITIES ACT. DEFT'S MOTION IS DENIED IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS. PLFF F ULTON BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ITS THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION IS DENIED. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFT & AGAINST PLFF. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 1/19/17. 1/20/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER THAT DEFT NATCITY INVESTMENTS, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT (DOC. NO. 52) IS GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART AS FOLLOWS: THE MOTION IS GRANTED AS TO LAST THREE PARAGRAPHS OF THE REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT OF MARK O. CONNOR. THE MOTION IS ALSO DENIED IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 9/28/16. 9/29/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER THAT DEFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART, ETC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ALL DISCOVERY DUE BY 1/3/2014. TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/13/2013 AT 11:30 A.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 10/15/13. 10/15/13 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FULTON BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. NATCITY INVESTMENTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FULTON FINANCIAL ADVISORS, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: JAMES H. THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATCITY INVESTMENTS, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. UNDERHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?