WRIGHT v. LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK et al
Plaintiff: JONI WRIGHT
Defendant: LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST and LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL
Case Number: 5:2010cv00431
Filed: January 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Allentown Office
County: Northampton
Presiding Judge: ARNOLD C RAPOPORT
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER THAT THE COURT IS DIRECTED TO MARK THIS ACTION CLOSED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 9/21/12. 9/24/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH AND GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 7/17/12. 7/17/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
July 17, 2012 Filing 151 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT: a Telephone Settlement Conference held on 7/16/12. Court Reporter: None. (er, )
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER THAT CLASS COUNSEL SHALL SUBMIT TO THE COURT, IN CAMERA IF THEY SO CHOOSE, A COMPLETE COPY OF THE BILLING ENTRIES FOR WRIGHT I, WRIGHT II AND WRIGHT III BY JULY 26, 2012; AND 2) THE FINAL APPROVAL HEARING IN THIS MATTER WHICH IS PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR JULY 19, 2012, IS RESCHEDULED TO AUGUST23, 2012, AT 10:00 A.M., COURTROOM C, EDWARD N. CAHN UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 504 WEST HAMILTON STREET, ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 7/12/12. 7/13/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mas, )
July 9, 2012 Filing 149 MOTION for Approval of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by JONI WRIGHT.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit 1-4)(MURPHY, MICHAEL)
July 9, 2012 Filing 148 Final MOTION for Approval of the Settlement Agreement filed by JONI WRIGHT.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit 1-4)(MURPHY, MICHAEL)
May 24, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: MISCELLANEOUS HEARING SET FOR 7/19/2012 10:00 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT. (er, )
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 147 PRELIMINARY APPROVAL ORDER. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 5/24/12. 5/25/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
May 18, 2012 Filing 146 Joint MOTION for Approval of Settlement filed by JONI WRIGHT.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Joint Stipulation of Settlement and Release, #2 Exhibit A-E of Joint Stipulation of Settlement and Release, #3 Certificate of Counsel)(MURPHY, MICHAEL)
May 11, 2012 Filing 145 CONSENT AND ORDER TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THAT CASE IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT TO CONDUCT ALL PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER THE ENTRY OF A FINAL JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH 28 U.S.C. 636(c) AND FRCP 73. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 5/11/12. 5/14/12 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
May 10, 2012 Filing 144 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by JONI WRIGHT.. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2012 Filing 143 MOTION to Compel Depositions of Opt-in Plaintiffs filed by LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Brief, #2 Exhibit A - H, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CREASY, DARREN)
April 5, 2012 Filing 142 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff's Motion for Spoliation Sanctions filed by JONI WRIGHT.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit 1-19, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MURPHY, MICHAEL)
March 13, 2012 Filing 141 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT: a Non-Final Pretrial Conference held on 3/13/12. Court Reporter: ESR. (er, )
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONEDCASE WILL BE HELD ON TUESDAY, MARCH 13, 2012 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE THE HONORABLE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 3/1/12. 3/1/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED BY COURTROOM DEPUTY; AND E-MAILED.(er, )
February 24, 2012 Filing 139 RESPONSE in Opposition re #138 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Written Discovery and to Compel Certain Depositions filed by LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 and 2)(CREASY, DARREN)
February 10, 2012 Filing 138 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Written Discovery and to Compel Certain Depositions filed by JONI WRIGHT.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A-L)(MURPHY, MICHAEL)
February 2, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/17/2012 10:00 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT. (er, )
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER THAT AN IN PERSON SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON TUESDAY, APRIL 17, 2012 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE THE HONORABLE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, IN SUITE 3401, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE AND FEDERAL BUILDING, 504 WEST HAMILTON STREET, ALLENTOWN, PA. THIS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO BE HELD IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE HONORABLE EDWARD D. REIBMAN RELATING TO LEHIGH COUNTY NO. 2010-C-2555 AND LEHIGH COUNTY NO. 2011-C-127 SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 2/1/12. 02/02/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, ) Modified on 2/6/2012 (er, ).
January 13, 2012 Filing 136 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT: a TelephoneDiscovery Conference held on 1/13/12. Court Reporter: esr. (er, )
January 13, 2012 Filing 135 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT: a Telephonic Settlement Conference held on 1/13/12. Court Reporter: None. (er, )
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT/STATUS CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON FRIDAY, JANUARY 13, 2012 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE THE HONORABLE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 12/19/11. 12/19/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED . (er, ) Modified on 12/20/2011 (afm, ).
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER THAT THE DEADLINES IN THIS MATTER ARE AMENDED AS FOLLOWS: ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 12, 2011, ETC. ALL DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY MARCH 12, 2012. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 10/11/11. 10/11/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
October 11, 2011 Filing 132 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT: a Telephone Settlement Conference held on 10/11/11. Court Reporter: none. (er, )
October 11, 2011 Filing 131 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT: Non-Final Pretrial Conference held on 10/11/11. Court Reporter: None. (er, )
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT/STATUS CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON TUESDAY, OCTOBER 11, 2011 AT 11:30 AM BEFORE THE HONORABLE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 9/29/11. 9/29/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY COURTROOM DEPUTY.(er, )
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER THAT OPT-IN MEMBER LINDA HEIDIG REQUESTS DISMISSAL HER CLAIM(S) UNDERTHE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT AGAINST DEFENDANTS, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 8/9/11. 8/9/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (er, )
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER THAT OPT-IN MEMBERS DORIS ENGISCH, JOANN GIRANDA, SUSAN HERMAN, LISA CINTROLA, MARY FROST, AND JOANNE RISSMILLER REQUEST DISMISSAL THEIR CLAIM(S) UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT AGAINST DEFENDANTS, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 8/9/11. 8/9/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
August 8, 2011 Filing 127 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JONI WRIGHT As To Opt-In Member Linda Heidig(MURPHY, MICHAEL)
July 21, 2011 Filing 126 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JONI WRIGHT As To Opt-In Members Doris Engisch, Joann Giranda, Susan Herman, Lisa Cintrola, Mary Frost, and Joann Rissmiller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MURPHY, MICHAEL)
June 29, 2011 Filing 125 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT: Non-Final Pretrial Conference held on 6/29/11. Court Reporter: None. (er, )
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONEDCASE WILL BE HELD ON WEDNESDAY, JUNE 29, 2011 AT 11:00 AM, BEFORE THE HONORABLE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 6/27/11. 6/27/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY COURTROOM DEPUTY.(er, )
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER THAT THE #117 MOTION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 6/23/11. 6/24/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
June 23, 2011 Filing 122 MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 6/23/11. 6/24/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
June 21, 2011 Filing 121 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by JONI WRIGHT. (lbs, )
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FILE THE REPLY BRIEF, ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT B TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 6/21/2011.6/21/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(lbs, )
June 17, 2011 Filing 119 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Defendants' Brief in Opposition to PLaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by JONI WRIGHT.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MURPHY, MICHAEL)
June 10, 2011 Filing 118 RESPONSE in Opposition re #117 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK with Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(SPRAGUE, JONATHAN) Modified on 6/14/2011 (lbc, ).
May 24, 2011 Filing 117 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by JONI WRIGHT.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MURPHY, MICHAEL)
May 20, 2011 Filing 116 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT: Non-Final Pretrial Conference held on 5/20/11. Court Reporter: none. (er, )
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON THURSDAY, MAY 19, 2011 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE THE HONORABLE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 5/12/11. 5/12/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY COURTROOM DEPUTY.(er, ) (Main Document 115 replaced on 5/18/2011) (er, ).
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO RULE 41(A)(2) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, THE PLAINTIFF HEREBY PROVIDES NOTICE THAT OPT-IN MEMBER LENIA REXRODE REQUESTS DISMISSAL HER CLAIM(S) UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT AGAINST DEFENDANTS, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 5/11/11. 5/11/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 5/11/11. 5/11/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(er, )
May 3, 2011 Filing 113 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JONI WRIGHT As To Opt-In Member Lenia Rexrode(MURPHY, MICHAEL)
April 12, 2011 DISCOVERY DUE BY 10/12/2011. MOTIONS DUE BY 1/12/2012. (er, )
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER THAT ALL FACT DISCOVERY IN THIS MATTER SHALL BE COMPLETED ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 12, 2011; PLAINTIFF SHALL PROVIDE DEFENDANTS WITH ALL EXPERT REPORTS BY NOVEMBER 14, 2011; DEFENDANTS SHALL PROVIDE PLAINTIFF WITH ALL EXPERTS REPORTS BY DECEMBER 12, 2011; ALL EXPERT DEPOSITIONS SHALL BE COMPLETED BY JANUARY 12, 2012; DEFENDANTS MAY FILE A MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE CLASS NO LATER THAN NOVEMBER 14, 2011; AND ALL DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY JANUARY 12, 2012. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 4/12/11. 4/12/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 111 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT: Non-Final Pretrial Conference held on 4/12/11 Court Reporter: NONE. (er, )
April 6, 2011 Filing 110 ANSWER to #97 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK.(CREASY, DARREN)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON TUESDAY, APRIL 12, 2011 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE THE HONORABLE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT. THE COURT DIRECTS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO INITIATE THE CALL TO ALL PARTIES INVOLVED. COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO BE AVAILABLE BY TELEPHONE ON THE TIME STATED ABOVE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 4/4/11. 4/4/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY COURTROOM DEPUTY.(er, )
April 1, 2011 Filing 108 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Dawn Schwenke by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
March 31, 2011 Filing 107 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Isley Moore by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
March 31, 2011 Filing 106 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Michele McKeown by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
March 31, 2011 Filing 105 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Ryan Culver by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
March 31, 2011 Filing 104 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Elizabeth Holubowski by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
March 29, 2011 Filing 103 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Donald Jones by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
March 29, 2011 Filing 102 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Susan Herman by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
March 29, 2011 Filing 101 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of JoAnn Giranda by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
March 23, 2011 Filing 100 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Ellen Saunders by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
March 23, 2011 Filing 99 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Keisha Sewell by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
March 23, 2011 Filing 98 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Jennifer Matton by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
March 22, 2011 Filing 97 AMENDED COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT against LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK, filed by JONI WRIGHT., JURY TRIAL DEMAND., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(rf, )
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFT'S. LEHIGH VALLEY HEALTH NETWORK, ET AL. HEREBY CONSENT TO THE FILING OF PLAINTIFF JONI WRIGHT'S PROPOSED AMENDED COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 3/22/11. 3/22/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.er, ) Modified on 3/22/2011 (er, ).
March 17, 2011 Filing 95 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Debra Bronson by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
March 17, 2011 Filing 94 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Stephanie Miller by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
March 16, 2011 Filing 93 STIPULATION of the Parties Regarding Plaintiff Joni Wrights Amended Collective Action Complaint by LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK, JONI WRIGHT. (CREASY, DARREN) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO CLERK/JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 3/17/2011 (nd, ).
March 11, 2011 Filing 92 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Joseph J. Makara Jr. by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
March 11, 2011 Filing 91 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Lenia Rexrode by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
March 10, 2011 Filing 90 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Tatyana Likhova by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
March 10, 2011 Filing 89 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Amanda Estrada by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
March 8, 2011 Filing 88 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Melanie Ondik by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
March 8, 2011 Filing 87 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Colleen Cook by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
March 7, 2011 Filing 86 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Doris Engisch by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
March 7, 2011 Filing 85 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Lisa Larkin by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
March 2, 2011 Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by JONI WRIGHT.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.Motions referred to ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A-B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/3/2011 Per Judge's Chambers) (nd, ). Modified on 3/3/2011 (nd).
February 28, 2011 Filing 83 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Mary Angeli by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
February 28, 2011 Filing 82 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Jeff Dobrowolski by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
February 28, 2011 Filing 81 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Matthew Palka by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
February 28, 2011 Filing 80 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Kelly Rackham by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
February 28, 2011 Filing 79 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Jeanine Albert by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
February 25, 2011 Filing 78 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Mary Frost by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
February 25, 2011 Filing 77 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Sandra Calhoun Kassner by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
February 23, 2011 Filing 76 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Joanne Rissmiller by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
February 23, 2011 Filing 75 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Susan Torchen by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
February 23, 2011 Filing 74 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Melinda Gladstone by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
February 23, 2011 Filing 73 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Shafrana Shakur by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
February 23, 2011 Filing 72 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Colleen Yob by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
February 23, 2011 Filing 71 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Kimberly Riggs by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL PRODUCE TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WITHIN SEVEN (7) DAYS OF ANY REQUEST BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL ALLTELEPHONE NUMBERS IN THE POSSESSION OF DEFENDANTS FOR ANY NON EXEMPT REGISTERED NURSE EMPLOYED BY DEFENDANTS IN THE PATIENT CARE SERVICES DIVISION WITHIN THE LAST THREE (3) YEARS WHO IS OR WAS REQUIRED TO ATTEND REPORT AS PART OF HIS OR HER JOB DUTIES, AND WHOSE FLSA NOTICE IS RETURNED BY THE POST OFFICE MARKED AS UNDELIVERABLE, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 2/11/11. 2/11/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(er, )
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF THE PARTIES REGARDING DISSEMINATION OF NOTICE/OPT-IN PACKETS PENDING FINAL DISPOSITION OF OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 2/10/11. 2/11/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ky, )
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS #64 MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PARAGRAPH 3 OF THIS COURTS JANUARY 20, 2011 ORDER SHOULD READ AS FOLLOWS: THOSE PERSONS ELIGIBLE TO BE OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS IN THISCOLLECTIVE ACTION ARE: ALL NON-EXEMPT REGISTERED NURSES EMPLOYED BY DEFENDANTS IN THEIR PATIENT CARE SERVICES DIVISION WITHIN THE PAST THREE YEARS WHO ARE OR WERE REQUIRED TO ATTEND REPORT AS PART OF THEIR JOB DUTIES. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 2/10/11.2/10/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(mas, )
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE RAPOPORTS MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ARE OVERRULED, AND COURT AFFIRMS AND ADOPTS IN ITS ENTIRETY JUDGE RAPOPORTS 1/20/11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 2/9/11. 2/9/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
February 8, 2011 Filing 66 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Objections to Magistrate Judge Arnold C. Rapoport's January 20, 2011 Order re #63 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, by JONI WRIGHT, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (MURPHY, MICHAEL) Modified on 2/9/2011 (nd, ).
February 4, 2011 Filing 65 STIPULATION of the Parties Regarding Dissemination of Notice/Opt-in Packets Pending Final Disposition of Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order by LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK, JONI WRIGHT. (CREASY, DARREN) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO CLERK/JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 2/7/2011 (nd, ).
February 2, 2011 Filing 64 MOTION for Clarification , Reconsideration, and/or Protective Order Regarding Dissemination of Opt-in Consent Forms filed by LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK.Brief, Certificate of Service.Motions referred to ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CREASY, DARREN)
February 2, 2011 Filing 63 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK re #59 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion) (Attachments: #1 Supporting Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CREASY, DARREN)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY PENDING DISPOSITION OF OBJECTIONS IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 2/1/11. 2/2/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PETERS, E-MAILED.(rf, )
January 31, 2011 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re #60 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Disposition of Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order filed by JONI WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1)(MURPHY, MICHAEL)
January 26, 2011 Filing 60 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Disposition of Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order filed by LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK.Brief in Support, Certificate of Service.Motions referred to ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CREASY, DARREN)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER THE MOTION TO PROCEED AS A COLLECTIVE ACTION IS GRANTED. THIS CASE IS DESIGNATED AS A SECTION 216(b) COLLECTIVE ACTION. THOSE PERSONS ELIGIBLE TO BE OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS IN THIS COLLECTIVE ACTION ARE: ALL NON-EXEMPT REGISTERED NURSES EMPLOYED BY DEFENDANTS IN THEIR PATIENT CARE SERVICES DIVISION WITHIN THE PAST THREE YEARS AND WHO WERE NOT COMPENSATED FOR WORK REQUIRED TO BE PERFORMED BEFORE AND AFTER THEIR SCHEDULED SHIFTS. WITHIN TEN DAYS OF THIS ORDER, DEFENDANTS SHALL PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF A COMPUTER-READABLE DATA FILE CONTAINING THE NAME AND ADDRESS OF ALL POTENTIAL OPT-IN MEMBERS SO THAT NOTICE MAY BE IMPLEMENTED, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 1/20/11. 1/20/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(er, ) Modified on 1/20/2011 (er, ).
January 20, 2011 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 1/20/11. 1/20/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED. (er, ) Modified on 1/20/2011 (er, ).
December 22, 2010 Filing 57 Reply Brief in Further Support of Plaintiff's 2nd Motion for Conditional Certification by JONI WRIGHT. (er, )
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FILE THE REPLY BRIEF, ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT B TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 12/21/10. 12/22/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (er, )
December 7, 2010 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief filed by JONI WRIGHT.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Reply Brief)(MURPHY, MICHAEL)
December 1, 2010 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Second Motion to Proceed as a Collective Action and Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Second Motion to Proceed as a Collective Action and Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(CREASY, DARREN)
November 29, 2010 Filing 53 Plaintiff's Supplemental Exhibit in Support of #45 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Proceed as a Collective Action and Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) by JONI WRIGHT, Certificate of Service. (MURPHY, MICHAEL) Modified on 11/30/2010 (fh)
November 29, 2010 Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT: Telephone conference on Discovery was held on 11/29/2010. (lbs, )
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON MONDAY, NOVEMBER 29, 2010 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE THE HONORABLE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 11/24/10. 11/24/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY COURTROOM DEPUTY.(er, )
November 24, 2010 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT: Non-Final Pretrial Conference held on 11/24/10 Court Reporter: None. (er, )
November 16, 2010 Filing 49 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT: Non-Final Pretrial Conference held on 11/16/2010. (afm, )
November 16, 2010 Filing 48 Declaration re #45 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Second Motion to Proceed as a Collective Action and Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Second Motion to Proceed as a Collective Action and Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) by JONI WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration 1, #2 Declaration 2)(MURPHY, MICHAEL)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON WEDNESDAY, NOVEMBER 24, 2010 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE THE HONORABLE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 11/16/10. 11/16/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY COURTROOM DEPUTY.(er, )
November 9, 2010 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. SOBOL on behalf of JONI WRIGHT with Certificate of Service, Jury Demand. (SOBOL, DANIEL) Modified on 11/10/2010 (lisad, ).
November 4, 2010 Filing 45 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Second Motion to Proceed as a Collective Action and Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by JONI WRIGHT.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT. RESPONSES DUE BY 11/22/2010. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit 1-13, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MURPHY, MICHAEL)
November 4, 2010 Filing 44 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Linda Heidig by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON TUESDAY, NOVEMBER 16, 2010 AT 11:45 AM BEFORE THE HONORABLE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 11/3/10, ETC. 11/3/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY COURTROOM DEPUTY.(er, )
November 2, 2010 Filing 42 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Lisa Citrola by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
November 2, 2010 Filing 41 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Joi E. Meeker by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
October 5, 2010 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT re: A Telephonic Non-Final Pretrial Conference was held on 10/5/10 and was not placed on the record. (ky, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT: a Telephone Settlement Conference held on 9/28/10. Court Reporter: None. (er, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT: Non-Final Pretrial Conference held on 9/28/10. Court Reporter: esr. (er, )
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON TUESDAY, OCTOBER 5, 2010 AT 9:30 AM BEFORE THE HONORABLE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 9/28/10. 9/28/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY COURTROOM DEPUTY.(er, )
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON TUESDAY, SEPTEMBER 28, 2010 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE THE HONORABLE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT ON 9/15/10. 9/15/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY COURTROOM DEPUTY.(er, )
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER THAT CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARNOLD C. RAPOPORT FOR PRE-TRIAL CASE MANAGEMENT/SETTLEMENT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 9/14/10. 9/15/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
August 24, 2010 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO PROCEED AS A COLLECTIVE ACTION (DOC. 18) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER (DOC. 30) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 8/24/10. 8/24/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
August 24, 2010 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINIONSIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 8/24/10. 8/24/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE LATE HONORABLE THOMAS M. GOLDEN TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY MICHAEL E. KUNZ ON 8/10/10. 8/12/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
July 8, 2010 Filing 31 Memorandum in Opposition re #30 MOTION for Protective Order filed by JONI WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MURPHY, MICHAEL)
June 21, 2010 Filing 30 MOTION for Protective Order filed by LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK.Supporting Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CREASY, DARREN)
May 26, 2010 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JUDGE THOMAS M. GOLDEN: Status Conference held on 5/25/10. Court Reporter: None. (er, ) Modified on 6/1/2010 (afm, ).
May 24, 2010 Filing 28 NOTICE of AMENDED STATUS CONFERENCE: AMENDED STATUS TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/25/2010 AT 01:30 PM BEFORE HONORABLE THOMAS M. GOLDEN. COURT DIRECTS PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO INITIATE THE CALL TO ALL PARTIES AND TO CHAMBERS.(mls, )
May 20, 2010 Filing 27 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/26/2010 AT 10:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE THOMAS M. GOLDEN.(tl, )
April 12, 2010 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed as a Collective Action and Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed as a Collective Action and Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(CREASY, DARREN)
April 9, 2010 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, together with Affirmative Defenses by LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK.(CREASY, DARREN)
March 30, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed as a Collective Action and Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed as a Collective Action and Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b). RESPONSES DUE BY 4/12/2010. (er, )
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER THAT EMERGENCY MOTION TO ENLARGE THE TIME PERIOD WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED AS COLLECTIVE ACTION AND FACILITATE NOTICE PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. 216(b) BY 14 DAYS IS GRANTED. DEFTS. RESPONE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IS DUE ON 4/12/10. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS M. GOLDEN ON 3/29/10. 3/30/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(er, )
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS DEMAND FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (DOC. NO. 19) IS GRANTED AS UNOPPOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS M. GOLDEN ON 3/25/10. 3/26/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(er, )
March 26, 2010 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE THOMAS M. GOLDEN: Status Conference held on 3/25/10. (la, )
March 17, 2010 Filing 21 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' re #20 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed as a Collective Action and Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's MoEmergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed as a Collective Action and Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's MoEmergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed as a Collective Action and Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Mo filed by JONI WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MURPHY, MICHAEL)
March 16, 2010 Filing 20 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed as a Collective Action and Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed as a Collective Action and Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CREASY, DARREN)
March 16, 2010 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss the Demand for Injunctive Relief filed by LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SPRAGUE, JONATHAN)
March 10, 2010 Filing 18 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed as a Collective Action and Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by JONI WRIGHT. Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1-9)(MURPHY, MICHAEL) Modified on 3/11/2010 (lisad, ).
March 2, 2010 ***Update Answer Deadline (ky, )
March 2, 2010 Filing 17 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL HAVE UNTIL 3/16/10 TO ANSWER, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE MOVE IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7.4(B)(2). SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS M. GOLDEN ON 3/1/10. 3/2/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ky, )
February 22, 2010 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN B. SPRAGUE on behalf of LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK with Certificate of Service(SPRAGUE, JONATHAN)
February 18, 2010 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN M. PETERS on behalf of LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST (jl, )
February 18, 2010 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE MOVE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7.4(B)(2) by JONI WRIGHT, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST. (CREASY, DARREN) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO CLERK/JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 2/18/2010 (nd).
February 18, 2010 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST.(CREASY, DARREN)
February 12, 2010 Filing 12 Declaration Opt-In Consent Form of Joni Wright by JONI WRIGHT. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
February 11, 2010 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by GLENN GUANOWSKY on behalf of LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST with Certificate of Service(GUANOWSKY, GLENN)
February 11, 2010 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by DARREN MICHAEL CREASY on behalf of LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST with Certificate of Service(CREASY, DARREN)
February 11, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW W. ALLISON on behalf of LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST with Certificate of Service(ALLISON, ANDREW)
February 11, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by A. JAMES JOHNSTON on behalf of LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST with Certificate of Service(JOHNSTON, A.)
February 4, 2010 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JONI WRIGHT re: LARRY JACOBS served Summons and Complaint upon LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL by 2/3/09. LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL served on 2/3/2010, answer due 2/24/2010. (rf, )
February 4, 2010 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JONI WRIGHT re: LARRY JACOBS served Summons and Complaint upon LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK by PERSONAL SERVICE. LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK served on 2/3/2010, answer due 2/24/2010. (rf, )
February 4, 2010 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JONI WRIGHT re: LARRY JACOBS served Summons and Complaint upon LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST by PERSONAL SERVICE. LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST served on 2/3/2010, answer due 2/24/2010. (rf, )
February 4, 2010 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JONI WRIGHT re: LARRY JACOBS served Summons and Complaint upon LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET by PERSONAL SERVICE. LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET served on 2/3/2010, answer due 2/24/2010. (rf, )
February 4, 2010 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JONI WRIGHT re: LARRY JACOBS served Summons and Complaint upon LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG by PERSONAL SERVICE. LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG served on 2/3/2010, answer due 2/24/2010. (rf, )
February 3, 2010 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by MARTIN J. SOBOL on behalf of JONI WRIGHT (SOBOL, MARTIN)
January 29, 2010 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JONI WRIGHT. (jeb, )
January 29, 2010 Summons Issued as to LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST. 5 Forwarded To: Counsel on 2/1/10 (jeb, )
January 29, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET, LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number PPE016826.), filed by JONI WRIGHT.(jeb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WRIGHT v. LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH NETWORK
Represented By: JONATHAN B. SPRAGUE
Represented By: BRIAN M. PETERS
Represented By: ANDREW W. ALLISON
Represented By: A. JAMES JOHNSTON
Represented By: GLENN GUANOWSKY
Represented By: DARREN MICHAEL CREASY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - MUHLENBERG
Represented By: JONATHAN B. SPRAGUE
Represented By: BRIAN M. PETERS
Represented By: ANDREW W. ALLISON
Represented By: A. JAMES JOHNSTON
Represented By: GLENN GUANOWSKY
Represented By: DARREN MICHAEL CREASY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - 17TH STREET
Represented By: JONATHAN B. SPRAGUE
Represented By: BRIAN M. PETERS
Represented By: ANDREW W. ALLISON
Represented By: A. JAMES JOHNSTON
Represented By: GLENN GUANOWSKY
Represented By: DARREN MICHAEL CREASY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL - CEDAR CREST
Represented By: JONATHAN B. SPRAGUE
Represented By: BRIAN M. PETERS
Represented By: ANDREW W. ALLISON
Represented By: A. JAMES JOHNSTON
Represented By: GLENN GUANOWSKY
Represented By: DARREN MICHAEL CREASY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEHIGH VALLEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: JONATHAN B. SPRAGUE
Represented By: BRIAN M. PETERS
Represented By: ANDREW W. ALLISON
Represented By: A. JAMES JOHNSTON
Represented By: GLENN GUANOWSKY
Represented By: DARREN MICHAEL CREASY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONI WRIGHT
Represented By: MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR.
Represented By: DANIEL J. SOBOL
Represented By: MARTIN J. SOBOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?