HAWK VALLEY, INC. v. TAYLOR et al
Plaintiff: |
HAWK VALLEY, INC. |
Defendant: |
ELAINE G. TAYLOR, ENVIRONMENTAL PROCESS SYSTEMS, INC. and JOHN DOES 1-10 |
Case Number: |
5:2010cv00804 |
Filed: |
February 24, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Allentown Office |
County: |
Outside the State of PA. |
Presiding Judge: |
JAMES KNOLL GARDNER |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
47 U.S.C. § 227 (b)(3) Telephone Consumer Protection Act of 1991 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 31, 2014 |
Filing
142
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION IS GRANTED, ETC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, PURSUANT TO RULE 23(G) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, THAT ALAN C. MILSTEIN, ESQUIRE, BRIAN J. WANCA, ESQUIRE, AND PHILIP A. BOCK, ESQUIRE ARE EACH APPOINTED CLASS COUNSEL. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF HAWK VALLEY, INC. IS APPROVED AS CLASS REPRESENTATIVE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT A THIRD RULE 16 CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE CONFERENCE CALL IS SCHEDULED ON MAY 23, 2014, AT 8:30 O'CLOCK A.M. WITH THE UNDERSIGNED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL REMOVE THIS CASE FROM THE CIVIL SUSPENSE DOCKET. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAMES KNOLL GARDNER ON 3/31/14. 4/1/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
|
February 28, 2011 |
Filing
35
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL APRIL 1, 2011 TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF PLEADING THE GROUNDS UPON WHICH THIS COURT'S JURISDICTION DEPENDS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT FAILURE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT BY APR IL 1, 2011 MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS ELAINE G. TAYLOR AND ENVIRONMENTAL PROCESS SYSTEMS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO RE-FILE IT IF APPROPRIATE IN THE EVENT THAT PLAINTIFF FILES AN AMENDED COMPLAINT BY APRIL 1, 2011 ESTABLISHING SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAMES KNOLL GARDNER ON 2/25/2011. 2/28/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(lbs, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?