JARZYNA v. HOME PROPERTIES, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: |
MARIUSZ G. JARZYNA |
Defendant: |
HOME PROPERTIES, L.P. and FAIR COLLECTIONS AND OUTSOURCING, INC. |
Cross_claimant: |
FAIR COLLECTIONS AND OUTSOURCING, INC. |
Cross_defendant: |
HOME PROPERTIES, L.P. |
Case Number: |
5:2010cv04191 |
Filed: |
August 19, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Allentown Office |
County: |
Berks |
Presiding Judge: |
EDUARDO C. ROBRENO |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Fraud |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 28, 2018 |
Filing
427
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF/COUNTERDEFENDANT JARZYNA'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS 404] IS DENIED. ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF/COUNTERDEFENDANT JARZYNA'S MOTION IN LIMINE 405 IS DENIED. DEFENDANT/COUNTERCLAIMANT HOME'S MOTION IN LIMINE 409 IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 08/27/2018. 08/28/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
|
May 15, 2017 |
Filing
371
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASSS 287 IS DENIED. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ALLOW 362 IS DENIED, ETC. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL 353 IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 05/15/2017. 05/15/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
|
August 19, 2016 |
Filing
300
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/18/16. 8/19/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
|
July 17, 2015 |
Filing
252
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. 225), DEFENDANTS HOME'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. 234) AND DEFENDANT FAIR COLLECTION & OUTSOURCING'S CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. 233) ARE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEADLINE PER THE FOURTH SCHEDULING ORDER (DOC. 227) BY WHICH DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (DOC. 222) IS CONTINUED PENDING A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WHICH THE COURT WILL SCHEDULE SEPARATELY.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/17/15. 7/17/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO SPECIAL MASTER BLAIR, EMAILED.(rf, )
|
February 7, 2011 |
Filing
53
MEMORANDUN AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT FAIR COLLECTIONS AND OUTSOURCING INCS MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. 33) IS GRANTED AS TO COUNT V AND DENIED AS TO COUNTS I-IV. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT HOME PROPERTIES, L.P'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. 37) IS GRANTED AS TO COUNTS II & V, AND DENIED AS TO COUNTS I, III, AND IV. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY PENDING DECISIONS ON THE PARTIES MOTIONS TO DISMISS (DOC. 44) IS DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT COURTS ORDER ISSUED ORALLY FROM THE BENCH TO STAY DISCOVERY PENDING THE ADJUDICATION OF THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS IS VACATED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/7/11. 2/7/11 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?