HAMILTON v. LMM MANAGEMENT, LLC et al
Plaintiff: WANDA HAMILTON
Defendant: CACH, LLC, LMM MANAGEMENT, LLC, MCGUIGAN LAW OFFICE, LLC, SQURARE TWO FINANCIAL CORPORATION and LAWRENCE WEIL
Case Number: 5:2013cv02932
Filed: May 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Allentown Office
County: Lancaster
Presiding Judge: LAWRENCE F STENGEL
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2014 Filing 71 MOTION to Certify Class filed by WANDA HAMILTON(INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED ).Proposed Order, Memorandum in Support, Certificate of Service. RESPONSES DUE BY 11/4/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit "A", #3 Exhibit "B", #4 Exhibit "C", #5 Exhibit "D", #6 Exhibit "E", #7 Exhibit "F", #8 Exhibit "G", #9 Exhibit "H", #10 Exhibit "I", #11 Exhibit "J", #12 Exhibit "K", #13 Exhibit "L", #14 Exhibit "M", #15 Exhibit "N", #16 Exhibit "O", #17 Exhibit "P", #18 Exhibit "Q", #19 Exhibit "R", #20 Exhibit "S", #21 Exhibit "T", #22 Exhibit "U", #23 Exhibit "V", #24 Exhibit "W", #25 Exhibit "X", #26 Exhibit "Y")(FLITTER, CARY)
October 7, 2014 Filing 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CACH, LLC, SQURARE TWO FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Brief, Uncontested Statement of Material Fact. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Summary Judgment, #2 Statement of Uncontested Material Facts, #3 Exhibit "A" Part 1, #4 Exhibit "A" Part 2, #5 Exhibit "B", #6 Exhibit "C" Part 1, #7 Exhibit "C" Part 2, #8 Exhibit "C" Part 3, #9 Exhibit "C" Part 4, #10 Exhibit "C" Part 5, #11 Exhibit "D" Part 1, #12 Exhibit "D" Part 2, #13 Exhibit "D" Part 3, #14 Exhibit "D" Part 4, #15 Exhibit "D" Part 5, #16 Exhibit "D" Part 6, #17 Exhibit "D" Part 7, #18 Exhibit "E" Part 1, #19 Exhibit "E" Part 2, #20 Exhibit "E" Part 3, #21 Exhibit "E" Part 4, #22 Exhibit "E" Part 5, #23 Exhibit "E" Part 6, #24 Exhibit "E" Part 7, #25 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHWARTZ, ANDREW)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS CACH, LLC AND SQUARE TWO FINANCIAL CORPORATION SHALL EACH: (A) PROVIDE WITH FOURTEEN (14) DAYS OF THE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AN AFFIDAVIT FROM A KNOWLEDGEABLE CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE ATTESTING TO (I) THE NUMBER OF INDIVIDUALS WHO COMPRISE CLASS A AND CLASS BAS DEFINED IN THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND THE TOTAL SUMS REMITTED FROM MEMBERS OF PUTATIVE CLASS B DURING THE PERIOD MAY 28, 2009 TO MAY28, 2013 AND HOW THOSE SUMS WERE DIVIDED BY AND BETWEEN EACH OF THE DEFENDANTS IN THIS ACTION ; (II) THE STEPS TAKEN TO COMPILE THE SPREADSHEET (BATE-STAMPED CACH 268-533) IDENTIFYING 11,616 INDIVIDUALS BY ACCOUNT NUMBER BELONGING TO PUTATIVE CLASS A MEMBERS AS DEFINED IN THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; (III) THE STEPS TAKEN TO COMPILE THE SPREADSHEET (BATE-STAMPED CACH 1381-1664) IDENTIFYING 1,663 INDIVIDUALS BY ACCOUNT NUMBER BELONGING TO CLASS B MEMBERS AS DEFINED IN THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, INCLUDING HOW THE TOTAL SUMS COLLECTED, THE TOTAL COMMISSIONS PAID AND/OR RETAINED BY LMM MANAGEMENT LLC, AND THE TOTAL SUMS PAID AND/OR RETAINED BY CACH AND SQUARE TWO FROM WERE DETENNINED; (IV) THE STEPS TAKEN TO COMPILE THE SPREADSHEET (BATE-STAMPED CACH 959-986) IDENTIFYING 1,313 INDIVIDUALS, AND HOW THE TOTAL SUMS COLLECTED, THE TOTAL COMMISSIONS PAID AND/OR RETAINED BY LMM MANAGEMENT LLC, AND THE TOTAL SUMS PAID AND/OR RETAINED BY CACH AND SQUARE TWO WERE DETERMINED; AND (V) PRODUCE THE AFFIANT FOR A TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION IN CONNECTION WITH ANY FOLLOW-UP REGARDING THE AFFIDAVIT TO BE PROVIDED HEREIN; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 9/23/14. 9/23/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mas, )
September 19, 2014 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN: Discovery Hearing held on 9/18/14. A telephonic discovery conference was conducted in this case. This proceeding was placed on the record. Court Reporter: ESR. (mas, )
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO THE INFORMAL MOTION ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 15, 2014. IT IS ALSO ORDERED THAT A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON THURSDAY, SEPTEMBER 18, 2014 AT 3:30 P.M. WITH ALL INVOLVED COUNSEL. THEODORE E. LORENZ, ESQUIRE, IS DIRECTED TO INITIATE THE CALL TO COUNSEL AND THEN CONNECT TO CHAMBERS AT 610-434-3823. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 9/10/14. 9/10/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mas, )
September 8, 2014 Filing 66 Defendant LMM and Weil's ANSWER to #63 Amended Complaint by LMM MANAGEMENT, LLC.(KLINE, ROBERT)
September 8, 2014 Filing 65 Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Third Amended Complaint) to correct Typographical Error in Answer to Paragraph 34 by CACH, LLC, SQURARE TWO FINANCIAL CORPORATION.(SCHWARTZ, ANDREW)
September 8, 2014 Filing 64 ANSWER to #63 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by CACH, LLC, SQURARE TWO FINANCIAL CORPORATION.(SCHWARTZ, ANDREW)
August 20, 2014 Filing 63 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against CACH, LLC, LMM MANAGEMENT, LLC, SQURARE TWO FINANCIAL CORPORATION, LAWRENCE WEIL, filed by WANDA HAMILTON(INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED ).JURY TRIAL DEMANDED, EXHIBITS(kk, )
August 18, 2014 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO.43) IS GRANTED. THE PLAINTIFF MAY FILE HER THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THE FORM ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT "1" TO THE MOTION WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 8/14/2014. 8/18/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (kk, )
August 18, 2014 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 8/14/2014. 8/18/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kk, )
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER THAT THE GENERAL OBJECTIONS ASSERTED BY ALL DEFENDANTS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES AND DOCUMENT REQUESTS ARE STRICKEN, ETC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RELATED TO THE FINANCIAL INFORMATION AND NET WORTH OF DEFENDANTS LMM AND WEIL FOUND AT PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES NUMBERED 12-14 AND PLAINTIFF'S DOCUMENT REQUESTS NUMBERED 29-30 IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR PLAINTIFF TO REFILE A MOTION TO COMPEL AS TOTHESE DISCOVERY REQUESTS AT A LATER TIME IF AN AGREEMENT IS NOT REACHED REGARDING THESE REQUESTS, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 8/8/14.8/11/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
July 28, 2014 Filing 59 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN: Discovery Hearing held on 7/28/14. A telephonic discovery conference was conducted in this case. This proceeding was placed on the record. Court Reporter: ESR. (mas, )
July 18, 2014 Filing 58 RESPONSE in Support re #41 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by WANDA HAMILTON(INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit "D")(FLITTER, CARY)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON MONDAY, JULY 28, 2014 AT 10:00 A.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE HENRY S. PERKIN, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, TO DISCUSS PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND STRIKE OBJECTIONS AND ANY OTHERDISCOVERY CONCERNS OF THE PARTIES. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 7/18/14. 7/18/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
July 16, 2014 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by LAWRENCE J. BARTEL on behalf of CACH, LLC, SQURARE TWO FINANCIAL CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(BARTEL, LAWRENCE)
July 11, 2014 Filing 55 CONSENT ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL 7/18/2014 TO FILE HER REPLY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 7/10/2014. 7/11/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (aeg, )
July 10, 2014 Filing 54 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendnats and to Strike Objections filed by WANDA HAMILTON(INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C")(FLITTER, CARY)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER THAT THE #47 MOTION TO COMPEL IS GRANTED AS UNOPPOSED. IT IS ORDERED THAT PATRYCE MORSE, UPON RECEIPT OF THIS ORDER, SHALL TELEPHONE BETWEEN THE HOURS OF 9 A.M. AND 5 P.M., THE OFFICES OF FLITTER LORENZ, P.C., AT 610-266-7863 OR 888-668-1225, AND SHALL APPEAR WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS OF THIS ORDER AS DIRECTED BY COUNSEL, AT THE OFFICES OF FLITTER LORENZ, P.C., 450 N. NARBERTH AVENUE, SUITE 101, NARBERTH, PA 19072, FOR HER DEPOSITION PURSUANT TO THE SUBPOENA WHICH WAS SERVED UPON HER ON APRIL 9, 2014. IT IS ORDERED THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SHALL SERVE THIS ORDER UPON MS. MORSE. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED THAT FAILURE OF MS. MORSE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 37 AND 45. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 7/2/14. 7/2/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mas, )
June 30, 2014 Filing 52 Memorandum re #41 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by LMM MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KLINE, ROBERT)
June 30, 2014 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by CACH, LLC, SQURARE TWO FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SCHWARTZ, ANDREW)
June 27, 2014 Filing 50 Memorandum re #45 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendnats and to Strike Objections filed by LMM MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KLINE, ROBERT)
June 27, 2014 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM of Law in Opposition re #45 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendnats and to Strike Objections filed by CACH, LLC, SQURARE TWO FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SCHWARTZ, ANDREW) Modified on 6/30/2014 (lisad, ).
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE HENRY S. PERKIN, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR THE PURPOSE OF RESOLVING TWO ONGOING DISCOVERY DISPUTE BETWEEN THE PARTIES CONCERNING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANTS AND TO STRIKE OBJECTIONS (DOC. NO. 45 AND 46) AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PATRYCE MORSE (DOC. NO.47) AND ANY RESPONSES THERETO. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 6/18/2014. Motions referred to HENRY S. PERKIN. 6/19/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kk, )
June 16, 2014 Filing 47 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Patryce Morse filed by WANDA HAMILTON(INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED ).Proposed Order, Memorandum, Certificate of Counsel and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B")(LORENZ, THEODORE)
June 13, 2014 Filing 46 Certificate of Effort to Resolve Discovery Dispute re #45 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendnats and to Strike Objections by WANDA HAMILTON(INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit "D", #5 Exhibit "E", #6 Exhibit "F")(LORENZ, THEODORE) Modified on 6/16/2014 (lisad, ).
June 13, 2014 Filing 45 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendnats and to Strike Objections filed by WANDA HAMILTON(INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED ).Proposed Discovery Order, Memorandum in Support, Certicate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit "D", #5 Exhibit "E", #6 Exhibit "F", #7 Exhibit "G", #8 Exhibit "H", #9 Exhibit "I", #10 Exhibit "J", #11 Exhibit "K", #12 Exhibit "L", #13 Exhibit "M", #14 Exhibit "N", #15 Exhibit "O")(LORENZ, THEODORE)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER THAT THE REQUEST FOR AN ENLARGMENT OF TIME IS GRANTED, THE DEFENDANTS MAY FILE A RESPONSE TO THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 6/30/2014. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 6/5/2014. 6/5/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kk, )
June 3, 2014 Filing 43 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by CACH, LLC, LMM MANAGEMENT, LLC, SQURARE TWO FINANCIAL CORPORATION, LAWRENCE WEIL.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(SCHWARTZ, ANDREW) Modified on 6/4/2014 (lisad, ).
May 23, 2014 Filing 42 Memorandum of Law in Support of re #41 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by WANDA HAMILTON(INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit "D", #5 Exhibit "E")(FLITTER, CARY)
May 23, 2014 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by WANDA HAMILTON(INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED ).Proposed Order, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(FLITTER, CARY)
May 5, 2014 Filing 40 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 8/1/2014. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 10/7/2014. MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION DUE BY 10/7/2014, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 5/5/2014. 5/5/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kk, )
March 19, 2014 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY (DOC. NO.27) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 3/19/2014. 3/20/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (kk, )
March 19, 2014 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 3/19/2014. 3/20/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kk, )
January 29, 2014 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Support re #27 MOTION to Stay re #16 Order, filed by LMM MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KLINE, ROBERT)
January 28, 2014 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW M. SCHWARTZ on behalf of CACH, LLC, SQURARE TWO FINANCIAL CORPORATION with Certificate of Service by ECF(SCHWARTZ, ANDREW)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER THAT PARAGRAPH 2 OF THIS ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF (DOC. NO.34) SHALL BE AMENDED AS FOLLOWS: ALL DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE A JOINT REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION BRIEF ON OR BEFORE 1/29/2014. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 1/27/2014. 1/27/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kk, )
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR LEAVE IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS LMM MANAGEMENT LLC AND LAWRENCE WEIL SHALL FILE A JOINT REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION BRIEF WITHIN 7 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 1/13/2014. 1/15/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kk, )
January 13, 2014 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Stay re #16 Order, filed by WANDA HAMILTON(INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(LORENZ, THEODORE)
January 10, 2014 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL: Status Conference held on 1/10/14. A status conference was held in the above cases. This matter was not placed on the record. (mas, )
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER THAT A THE PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY MANUEL HARRY NEWBURGER FOR CACH, LLC AND SQURARE TWO FINANCIAL CORPORATION IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 1/8/2014. 1/9/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kk, )
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER: A TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/10/2014 03:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL. DISCOVERY DUE BY 6/2/2014. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 8/8/2014., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 1/6/2014. 1/7/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kk, )
January 6, 2014 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL: Conference held on 1/3/2014. (kk, )
January 2, 2014 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by LMM MANAGEMENT, LLC.(KLINE, ROBERT)
December 30, 2013 Filing 27 MOTION to Stay re #16 Order, filed by LMM MANAGEMENT, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(KLINE, ROBERT)
December 10, 2013 Filing 26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by CACH, LLC, SQURARE TWO FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(FEE PAID PPE093066)(KESSLER, RICHARD) Modified on 12/12/2013 (kk, ).
December 2, 2013 Filing 25 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including CA Holding, Inc. with Certificate of Service by SQURARE TWO FINANCIAL CORPORATION.(KESSLER, RICHARD)
December 2, 2013 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including SquareTwo Financial Corporation with Certificate of Service by CACH, LLC.(KESSLER, RICHARD)
November 22, 2013 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LAWRENCE WEIL As To CROSS CLAIM AGAINST CACH, LLC and SQUARE TWO FINANCIAL CORPORATION(KLINE, ROBERT)
November 22, 2013 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LMM MANAGEMENT, LLC As To CROSS CLAIM AGAINST CACH, LLC and SQUARE TWO FINANCIAL CORPORATION(KLINE, ROBERT)
November 22, 2013 Filing 21 NOTICE of Hearing:TELEPHONE RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 1/3/2014 AT 9:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL WILL INITIATE THE CALL IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ATTACHED NOTICE.(pac,) (Main Document 21 replaced on 11/22/2013) (pac, ).
November 20, 2013 Case Ineligible for Arbitration(mima, )
November 18, 2013 Filing 20 Defendants LMM Managment LLC and Lawrence Weil's ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against Square Two Financial Coroporation and against CACH, LLC by LMM MANAGEMENT, LLC, LAWRENCE WEIL.(KLINE, ROBERT) Modified on 11/19/2013 (lisad, ).
November 18, 2013 Filing 19 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint With Affirmative Defenses by CACH, LLC, SQURARE TWO FINANCIAL CORPORATION.(KESSLER, RICHARD)
November 1, 2013 Filing 18 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against CACH, LLC, LMM MANAGEMENT, LLC, SQURARE TWO FINANCIAL CORPORATION, LAWRENCE WEIL, filed by WANDA HAMILTON. JURY TRIAL DEMANDED, EXHIBITS. (kk, )
October 29, 2013 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL: Status Conference held on 10/25/13. A Status Conference was held in the above case. This matter was not placed on the record. (mas, )
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE SHALL BE RETURNED TO THE ACTIVE DOCKET; AND THE PLAINTIFF IS GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO RETURN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE ACTIVE DOCKET. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 10/28/2013. 10/29/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, E-MAILED.(kk, )
October 24, 2013 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT M. KLINE on behalf of LAWRENCE WEIL (KLINE, ROBERT)
October 24, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT M. KLINE on behalf of LMM MANAGEMENT, LLC (KLINE, ROBERT)
October 24, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW M. MILZ on behalf of WANDA HAMILTON (MILZ, ANDREW)
October 24, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD A. KESSLER on behalf of CACH, LLC with Certificate of Service(KESSLER, RICHARD)
October 24, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD A. KESSLER on behalf of SQURARE TWO FINANCIAL CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(KESSLER, RICHARD)
October 4, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing:TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 10/25/2013 AT 11:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL WILL INITIATE THE CALL IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ATTACHED NOTICE.(pac,)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT MARK THIS ACTION CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES AND PLACE THE MATTER IN THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE PENDING THE BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDING OF ONE OF THE DEFENDANTS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 9/30/2013. 9/30/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(kk, )
September 26, 2013 Filing 8 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by MCGUIGAN LAW OFFICE, LLC under of the Bankruptcy Code in the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Pennsylvania, Eastern filed under case number 13-17633 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bankruptcy Docket)(KLINE, ROBERT)
September 19, 2013 Filing 7 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE from Square Two Financial Corporation (LORENZ, THEODORE)
September 19, 2013 Filing 6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE from CACH, LLC Re: accepted summons and complaint for WANDA HAMILTON on 9/16/2013, answer due 10/7/2013. (LORENZ, THEODORE)
September 17, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by THEODORE E. LORENZ on behalf of WANDA HAMILTON (LORENZ, THEODORE)
September 17, 2013 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WANDA HAMILTON re: Scott Segal served Summons and Complaint upon LMM MANAGEMENT, LLC. LMM MANAGEMENT, LLC served on 9/13/2013, answer due 10/4/2013. (LORENZ, THEODORE)
September 17, 2013 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WANDA HAMILTON re: Scott Segal served Summons and Complaint upon LAWRENCE WEIL. LAWRENCE WEIL served on 9/13/2013, answer due 10/4/2013. (LORENZ, THEODORE)
August 23, 2013 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 8/26/2013 (kk, )
August 23, 2013 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CACH, LLC, LMM MANAGEMENT, LLC, MCGUIGAN LAW OFFICE, LLC, LAWRENCE WEIL, SQURARE TWO FINANCIAL CORPORATION, filed by WANDA HAMILTON. JURY TRIAL DEMANDED, EXHIBITS(kk )
May 28, 2013 Case Eligible for Arbitration(rt)
May 28, 2013 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by WANDA HAMILTON. (rt)
May 28, 2013 Summons Issued as to CACH, LLC, LMM MANAGEMENT, LLC, MCGUIGAN LAW OFFICE, LLC, LAWRENCE WEIL. Four Given To: Counsel on May 29, 2013 (rt)
May 28, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CACH, LLC, LMM MANAGEMENT, LLC, MCGUIGAN LAW OFFICE, LLC, LAWRENCE WEIL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 082539.), filed by WANDA HAMILTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAMILTON v. LMM MANAGEMENT, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WANDA HAMILTON
Represented By: CARY L. FLITTER
Represented By: THEODORE E. LORENZ
Represented By: ANDREW M. MILZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CACH, LLC
Represented By: RICHARD A. KESSLER
Represented By: LAWRENCE J. BARTEL
Represented By: MANUEL HARRY NEWBURGER
Represented By: ANDREW M. SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LMM MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: ROBERT M. KLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCGUIGAN LAW OFFICE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SQURARE TWO FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Represented By: RICHARD A. KESSLER
Represented By: LAWRENCE J. BARTEL
Represented By: MANUEL HARRY NEWBURGER
Represented By: ANDREW M. SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCE WEIL
Represented By: ROBERT M. KLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?