SHUKER et al v. SMITH & NEPHEW, PLC et al
Plaintiff: WALTER SHUKER and VIVIAN SHUKER
Defendant: SMITH & NEPHEW, PLC and SMITH & NEPHEW, INC.
Case Number: 5:2013cv06158
Filed: October 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Allentown Office
County: Berks
Presiding Judge: JUAN R. SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 102 ), IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MARK THIS CASE CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 9/29/2016. 9/29/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 8/13/2015. 8/13/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 66 ), IS GRANTED. THE PROPOSED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT E TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION SHALL BE DEEMED FILED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERE D THAT DEFENDANT SMITH & NEPHEW, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NO. 59 ), IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. PLAINTIFFS SHALL HAVE UNTIL 4/30/2015 TO FILE A FURTHER AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 3/31/2015. 4/1/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHUKER et al v. SMITH & NEPHEW, PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALTER SHUKER
Represented By: ERIC G. ZAJAC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIVIAN SHUKER
Represented By: ERIC G. ZAJAC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITH & NEPHEW, PLC
Represented By: MICHAEL T. SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITH & NEPHEW, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL T. SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?