ABELL v. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: ABELL, THOMAS ABELL, KATHARINE ADAMS-LOVE, JOHN P. AELLEN, III, CLYDE WILLARD ALLEN, JOSEPH ALLEY, THOMAS PAUL ALLISON, RICHARD G. ALTIERI, ANDREW ALAN ANDERSON, CARL ANGELL, LINDA A. ANULARE, BRUCE WILLIAM ASHLEY, RICHARD AURAND, MAXINE BACHICHA, HAROLD BAKER, ROBERT G. BARZELAY, GARY L. BAUMGARDNER, JAMES A. BEARD, DEBORAH BECKER, RICHARD C. BENNETT, COLIN BENT, VERNON BENTLEY, HAROLD D. BERNSTEIN, MONTELL BERRY, WALLACE BERRY, LINDA BEUCHER, STANLEY R. BINDER, ANDREW BLANCHETTE, CRAIG A. BOCK, GARY L. BOCK, DAVID P. BOHAN, ROLAND BOISIS, JANICE BOND, DWIGHT CHARLES BONDY, ROBERT F. BORTELL, JR., DANIEL BOSSIO, JAMES L. BRACHFELD, ROBERTA L. BRACHFELD, EUGENE BRANDON, MICHAEL J. BRANTMEIER, JAY BROKER, NEAL SWANK BROOKS, FAYE D. BROWN, RICHARD A. BROWN, LESTER BROWN, SR., WILLIAM L. BROWN, JR., RICHARD A. BROWNSON, CHARLES R. BURNS, III, THOMAS C. BUSHEY, DAVE BUSSELL, GARY CALLAWAY, GEORGIANA CALLAWAY, ALBERT J. CANNIZZARO, LAWRENCE J. CAPOUCH, RICHARD CARTER, VICTOR M. CATARISANO, PORTIA M. CHAMBLISS, MARK CHASE, AMY CHERRNAY, JIMMY C. CHIN, DON C. CHRISTENSEN, JAMES CIRILLO, BRUCE W. CLOTFELTER, IRA CLOUD, MILTON COBB, MARK C. COLLIER, WANDA COLLINS-SMITH, JOSEPH P. CONBOY, RICHARD F. COOK, JANET COOLEY, JAMES CORNETT, CHARLES E. CORRY, BRUCE R. CRALLEY, JACK J. CRAPARO, JR., JAY CRYSTAL, LONNIE MICHAEL CURTIS, BRENT L. DANNER, JOHN DARWISH, HAROLD E. DASKAM, JOHN DAVENPORT, LESLIE K. DAVIDSON, ZACHARIAH M. DAVIDSON, III, MICHAEL L. DAVIS, MARGARET DEAN, STEPHEN W. DELLAPINA, ERNEST JACK DEMONTE, JAMES DEPIZZO, JOHN ANTHONY DEVITO, GAIL DICKMAN, MARK L. DIVINCENZO, MICHAEL DOHENY, JEFFREY M. DOMBECK, TERRANCE DONOGHUE, VALERY DORSHIMER, JOYCE DOUGLAS, RUFUS C. DOWELL, SUSAN DRAPEAU, RICHARD DROE, GEORGE F. DRUMMOND, WALTER J. DUBIEL, THOMAS R. DURAN, DENNIS R. DYKE, LARRY R. DYKSTRA, RICHARD MORRISON EARL, JR., RONALD F. EATON, MICHAEL ECONOMOS, RONALD R. EDWARDS, RICHARD EIRICH, ROSLYN EISENSTARK, BRUCE ENGERT, JANE ESCHRICH-WALSH, WILLIAM F. ESTES, STEVEN EVANS, SANDY K. FABRICATORE, JOSEPH FALCONI, III, CHRISTIAN FARLEY, SHEILA FARMER, CURTIS FARRAR, RALPH V. FAULK, PHILIP D. FEISAL, CARL FIELDER, DORIS FIELDS, LARRY D. FINLEY, WILLIAM FLOOD, GERALD L. FLORES, ERIC A. FORD, JOHN R. FORREST, ALLEN F. FOSTER, ROBERT FRANZ, BOSS ROBERT FRIES, III, JODENE GARDNER, ROBERT E. GARY, LARRY O. GENTRY, SAMUEL E. GILLETTE, GARY GOELZ, EUGENIA ANNINO STEGER, RANDOLPH GOODWIN, JR., JAMES A. GRADY, WILLIAM D. GREENE, SANDRA GUTHRIE, GERALD GUTZEIT, FRANKLIN P. HALL, BRENDA C. HAMMOND, LORETTA CAUSEY HANNON, FRANCIS HANRATTY, JAN HANSON, CHRIS HARDESTY, RONALD C. HARRISON, JR, JOHN W. HEASLEY, CONI HEIDLE, DARLENE HEINEN, GERALD HEINEN, ROBERT HELSEL, JAMES LOUIS HEMPHILL, GAIL ROGERS HIBBLER, LARRY W. HICE, DANNY HIGDON, PATRICIA A. HILL, RICHARD D. HILL, JAMES HILLAN, LEANNE HINKLE, JOHN HLOHINEC, JIMMY D. HOCK, CHARMAIN A. HORVATH, DAN P. HOURIHANE, STEVE HOWELL, GEORGE HUYE, JOHN IAPOCE, SANDRA INMAN, CHARLES S. JACKSON, RICK JAHNS, ROBERT JAYSON, LELAND JELINEK, CHARLES JOHNSON, REECE JOHNSON, LARRY JONES, RONALD R. JONES, KAREN JUNEMAN, DAVID N. KAPEC, KATHLEEN KENNEY, ROBERT KILLEEN, ROBERT E. KIMBLE, THOMAS KROHNER, MARIA KRUMM, AMOS KUYKENDOLL, WILLIAM LANDMARK, GREGORY LANE, BRUCE LARRABEE, JENNIFER LATHAM, CAROL E. LEBLANC, JOSEPH LEE, SHARON E. LIBBRA, TERRY GENE LIBBRA, JANET LINDSAY, JAMES W. LONGMAN, JOHN LUCAS, JAMES E. LYNCH, MICHAEL MACISCO, JOHN MALEK, STEVEN MALLORY, JOHN MALLOY, PATRICIA MARAZO, NICHOLAS S. MARINOS, EUGENE MARONEY, JOHN MARSH, RICHARD MASI, GLEN MASON, SCOTT A. MATTINGLY, THOMAS W. MATYJASIK, THOMAS MCCALL, RUDOLPH MCCLINON, JR., CASEY MCCOY, SHERRY MCDONALD, THOMAS MCEVANS, III, JAMES P. MCGUIRE, JOHN F. MCKENZIE, ANTHONY MCMURRAY, PETER S. MCVITTIE, JERREL L. MEAD, MARY MENDOZA, ORTON W. MESSENGER, SUSAN E. MESSINA, PHILLIP N. METCALFE, RONALD METZGER, PAMELA MEYER, ARTHUR R. MILES, JR., JAMES T. MILLER, FRANK E. MILLER, JR., JEAN MINAL, FRIEDA MINGA, BARBARA ANN MINK, ROBERT MINTON, JOE MONTANARO, RICHARD MOORE, STAFFORD W. MOORE, DINAH MORGAN, SYLVIA E. MOSLEY, D. CRAIG MULLEN, KELLY PATRICK MULLIGAN, DARRELL NAMIE, HERBERT A. NEWMAN, CHESTER NOWAK, RICHARD PAUL NYDEGGER, THOMAS A. O'DELL, WALTER ORR, JIM OVERMILLER, BARBARA OXNER, MARTHA PARRY, FRANK M. PATTERSON, TERRY PAULK, DANIEL T. PERRY, KEN PHILBRICK, FRANK L. PHILLIPS, STEPHEN WAYNE PIGG, CLIFFORD L. PINCKNEY, RITA E. PINO, RONALD M. PINSONEAULT, JOHNNY A. PLEMONS, ROBERT POLLOCK, DENNIS H. PORTER, DENNIS POWERS, BLAIR QUASNITSCHKA, PAUL QUATTRONE, MARZIANO P. RAGNONE, JAMES RAUEN, DONALD P. REIMER, MARIA G. RESNICK, LINDA REYNOLDS, STAN RICKS, DICK ROBERTS, THOMAS ROBY, DAVID ROMAN, LLOYD T. ROSENSTEEL, RICHARD K. ROSKOWE, RICHARD ROSSELL, RONALD J. RUBIN, ROBERT RUSSO, KAREN RYAN-WHITE, EDWARD M. SAAD, JOHN J. SANCHEZ, JACK SANDERS, MICHAEL L. SANDERS, SHEILA SANDERS, GAIL C. SANTALUCIA-DALY, PHILIP J. SARCONE, RICHARD SAULLE, MARCOS E. SAYAGO, GERALD H. SCHIELE, DOUGLAS SCHIFFMILLER, TIMOTHY L. SCHWARTZ, DAVID L. SEIDEL, ROGER SEROLA, LEONARD SHAW, ROBERT G. SHEA, JR., SHELDON F. SHEFF, WOODROW SHELTON, JR., DARRYL SHERMAN, MIKE SHOBE, LAWRENCE J. SIMMS, DOUGLAS A. SIMS, ERIC B. SIMS, CHINESTA SKIPPER SMITH, MARIE SMITH, DENNIS Z. SMITH, RONALD W. SMITH, ARMANDO D. SOLER, DEBORAH SORRELL-ULRICH, DAVID ST. JOHN, SARAH ST. JOHN, THOMAS STEIN, MICHAEL M. STERN, CAROL STEVENS, JOHN STOUT, DONALD STRIPLIN, CELESTE M. SULLIVAN, KURT A. SUMMERS, STANLEY SUWALA, PAUL SVABEK, EDWARD SWANSON, MARILYN SWANSON, MICHELLE TABLER, RUSSELL A. TAPIE, WANDA TATUM, CHARLES TAYLOR, WRIGHT B. TAYLOR, III, ROBERT W. TELKINS, STEPHEN THOENNES, GARY THOMAS, MONTAGUE A. THOMAS, III, JEFFREY TOBIN, JOSEPH TOMEC, MARY TURLEY, ALBERT TURNER, DAVID J. TUSKEY, GEORGE TWOHIG, CORNELL G. VANDERGRIFT, MILFORD T. VAUGHT, JR., LOUIS VEAL, DALE A. VILLEMAIN, CLETA VINING, JOSEPH J. VIOLA, SR., RONALD WANEK, BRIAN J. WANLESS, ARTHUR WASHINGTON, TIMOTHY JACKSON WATWOOD, MARK E. WENGER, FINDLEY WEST, NEIL WHICKER, CHARLES L. WILLIAMS, WALKER WILLIAMS, RODNEY W. WILLIAMS, SR., BARRY WILSON, ROBIN WILSON, FRANCES WISNIEWSKI, JAMES MICHAEL WOOD, LINDA WOSHNER, ROBERT A WRIGHT, JR., BARBARA D. WRIGHT, LEONARD YARBROUGH, DONALD YOUNG, JAMES M. ZAHNER, RONALD D. ZARBAUGH, ROSE ZUMWINKLE, MANUEL ZUNIGA, CHARLES DENNIS ZYBURO and DANIEL ANULARE
Defendant: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION, AGENTS PENSION PLAN, ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE and EDWARD M. LIDDY
Case Number: 5:2015cv01049
Filed: February 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Allentown Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL REMOVE THIS MATTER FROM THE CIVIL SUSPENSE DOCKET AND MARK IT CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL AND ALL OTHER PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/21/2018. 9/21/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
February 20, 2018 Filing 36 Minute Entry for Settlement Conference held on 2/13/18, before Judge Heffley. (fdc, ) Modified on 2/20/2018 (lisad, ).
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO SUBSTITUTE (ECF DOC. NOS. 1089,1090,1091,1092,1093,1094) ARE GRANTED WITHOUT OBJECTION SUBJECT TO THE DEFENDANTS' ABILITY TO CHALLENGE SPECIFIC RELIEF IN THE INDIVIDUAL CASES WHICH, UNDER VARIOUS STATE LAWS, MAY NOT SURVIVE THE DEATH OF THE ORIGINAL PLAINTIFF. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/18/2017. 4/18/2017 ENTERED E-MAILED. (sg, )
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS CONSOLIDATED INTO ROMERO V. ALLSTATE INSURANCE, ET. AL. C.A. 01-3894 UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE THIS CASE ON THE COURT'S CIVIL SUSPENSE DOCKET UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 5/2/2016. 5/2/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (sg,)
April 29, 2016 Filing 33 Minute Entry for MOTION HEARING held on 4/28/2016, before Judge MARILYN HEFFLEY. Court Reporter/Transcriber ESR. (sg, )
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF SALLIE G. SMYLIE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/29/2016. 4/29/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF HARIKLIA KARIS IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/29/2016. 4/29/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. ECF APP MAILED.(sg, )
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF DONALD R. LIVINGSTON IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/29/2016. 4/29/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF RICHARD C. GODFREY IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/29/2016. 4/29/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF PETER A. BELLACOSA IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/29/2016. 4/29/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
April 28, 2016 Filing 27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Hariklia Karis, P.C. filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION.Affidavit, Certificate of Service.(KATCHEN, KATHERINE) $40.00 FEE PAID, RECEIPT No.: 139472. Modified on 4/29/2016 (sg, ).
April 28, 2016 Filing 26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Richard C. Godfrey, P.C. filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION.Affidavit, Certificate of Service.(KATCHEN, KATHERINE) $40.00 FEE PAID, RECEIPT No.: 139472. Modified on 4/29/2016 (sg, ).
April 28, 2016 Filing 25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Sallie G. Smylie, P.C. filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION.Affidavit, Certificate of Service.(KATCHEN, KATHERINE) $40.00 FEE PAID, RECEIPT No.: 139472. Modified on 4/29/2016 (sg, ).
April 28, 2016 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Peter A. Bellacosa filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION.Affidavit, Certificate of Service.(KATCHEN, KATHERINE) $40.00 FEE PAID, RECEIPT No.: 139472. Modified on 4/29/2016 (sg, ).
April 28, 2016 Filing 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Donald R. Livingston filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.Affidavit, Certificate of Service.(KATCHEN, KATHERINE) $40.00 FEE PAID, RECEIPT No.: 139472. Modified on 4/29/2016 (sg, ).
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER THAT ALL COUNSEL SHALL FILE ONE BRIEF NO EXCEEDING TEN (10) PAGES ON OR BEFORE 4/27/2016, ETC. REFERRAL OF ALL DISCOVERY ISSUES AND REGULAR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/18/2016. 4/19/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT MATTERS ARE CONSOLIDATED FOR ADMINISTRATIVE PURPOSES. CLERK SHALL DOCKET ALL FILINGS ON THESE CONSOLIDATED MATTERS UNDER CIVIL ACTION NUMBER 01-3894. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/18/2016. 4/18/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(sg, )
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT THIS COURTS 3/15/2016 ORDER IS VACATED AND PLAINTIFF SHALL ANSWER THE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS NO LATER THAN 5/4/2016 AND DEFENDANT MAY FILE THE REPLY NO LATER THAN 5/11/2016 AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/18/2016. 4/18/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
April 15, 2016 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE, AGENTS PENSION PLAN, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(KATCHEN, KATHERINE)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT A RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/28/2016 04:00 PM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/15/2016. 4/15/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 4/11/2016. 4/12/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(ahf)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT THE COURT'S ORDER DOCKETED IN 15-2602,ECF 28 IS HEREBY VACATED. IN ADDITION THE AMENDED COMPLAINT DOCKETED IN 01-3894, ECF NO.832 AND 15-2602 IS STRICKEN; ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/31/16. 3/31/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND EMAILED.(sg, )
March 16, 2016 Filing 15 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE, AGENTS PENSION PLAN, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION, filed by ROBERT RUSSO, JAMES CIRILLO, JERREL L. MEAD, DWIGHT CHARLES BONDY, JOHN J. SANCHEZ, JIMMY D. HOCK, LINDA BEUCHER, SANDY K. FABRICATORE, JOHN F. MCKENZIE, JEAN MINAL, JOHN R. FORREST, STANLEY R. BINDER, RITA E. PINO, PHILLIP N. METCALFE, HAROLD E. DASKAM, JAMES W. LONGMAN, FAYE D. BROWN, MARIE SMITH, STEPHEN W. DELLAPINA, HAROLD BAKER, GARY L. BAUMGARDNER, JOSEPH ALLEY, RICK JAHNS, TIMOTHY JACKSON WATWOOD, FRANK L. PHILLIPS, JEFFREY TOBIN, LESTER BROWN, SR, JAMES HILLAN, MAXINE BACHICHA, GEORGE TWOHIG, BRENDA C. HAMMOND, SUSAN DRAPEAU, CASEY MCCOY, RUSSELL A. TAPIE, LARRY R. DYKSTRA, JAY CRYSTAL, RICHARD G. ALTIERI, DENNIS POWERS, SHERRY MCDONALD, RONALD WANEK, STEVE HOWELL, PATRICIA MARAZO, THOMAS C. BUSHEY, ROBERT F. BORTELL, JR, ROBERT HELSEL, SHEILA SANDERS, ROLAND BOISIS, CURTIS FARRAR, JOSEPH P. CONBOY, CHESTER NOWAK, SHARON E. LIBBRA, BRUCE W. CLOTFELTER, TIMOTHY L. SCHWARTZ, JAMES M. ZAHNER, LEANNE HINKLE, WALTER ORR, SAMUEL E. GILLETTE, JOE MONTANARO, FRIEDA MINGA, KAREN JUNEMAN, DORIS FIELDS, MARK C. COLLIER, JAMES CORNETT, HAROLD D. BERNSTEIN(AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF SANDI BERNSTEIN), SANDRA GUTHRIE, MICHAEL M. STERN, IRA CLOUD, JOHN ANTHONY DEVITO, CAROL E. LEBLANC, DARLENE HEINEN, JAMES MICHAEL WOOD, LINDA A. ANULARE, CHARLES TAYLOR, REECE JOHNSON, RICHARD K. ROSKOWE, SYLVIA E. MOSLEY, BRENT L. DANNER, KEN PHILBRICK, MICHAEL L. SANDERS, RICHARD ROSSELL, LOUIS VEAL, HAROLD D. BERNSTEIN, ROBERT KILLEEN, DEBORAH SORRELL-ULRICH, DAN P. HOURIHANE, JAMES A. BEARD, COLIN BENT, DARRELL NAMIE, JOYCE DOUGLAS, KATHARINE ADAMS-LOVE, TERRY GENE LIBBRA, CLETA VINING, DAVID ST. JOHN, MILFORD T. VAUGHT, JR, ROBERT POLLOCK, VALERY DORSHIMER, MARK CHASE, LEONARD YARBROUGH, JOHNNY A. PLEMONS, RONALD METZGER, KURT A. SUMMERS, THOMAS MCEVANS, III, LELAND JELINEK, MICHELLE TABLER, SHELDON F. SHEFF, CRAIG A. BOCK, DANIEL ANULARE, CHRIS HARDESTY, VICTOR M. CATARISANO, WILLIAM LANDMARK, ORTON W. MESSENGER, DAVE BUSSELL, RICHARD DROE, GREGORY LANE, THOMAS W. MATYJASIK, JOHN MARSH, ROBERT A WRIGHT, JR, RICHARD CARTER, JEFFREY M. DOMBECK, MARCOS E. SAYAGO, FRANCIS HANRATTY, RICHARD A. BROWN, JOHN IAPOCE, GEORGIANA CALLAWAY, JAMES RAUEN, NEIL WHICKER, BARBARA ANN MINK, NEAL SWANK BROOKS, D. CRAIG MULLEN, JAMES L. BRACHFELD, DALE A. VILLEMAIN, LINDA REYNOLDS, RICHARD EIRICH, EDWARD M. SAAD, DEBORAH BECKER, RICHARD A. BROWNSON, ROSE ZUMWINKLE, RICHARD MASI, RICHARD C. BENNETT, ROBERT W. TELKINS, VERNON BENTLEY, WILLIAM F. ESTES, DANIEL T. PERRY, STEVEN MALLORY, GAIL C. SANTALUCIA-DALY, CHRISTIAN FARLEY, ARTHUR WASHINGTON, DAVID J. TUSKEY, FRANK M. PATTERSON, GERALD HEINEN, ROBERT G. SHEA, JR, GAIL ROGERS HIBBLER, JACK SANDERS, THOMAS ABELL, PAUL SVABEK, BRUCE WILLIAM ASHLEY, GARY THOMAS, MICHAEL J. BRANTMEIER, BRUCE LARRABEE, CONI HEIDLE, GERALD H. SCHIELE, SARAH ST. JOHN, ERNEST JACK DEMONTE, DOUGLAS A. SIMS, MARIA KRUMM, MICHAEL ECONOMOS, SHEILA FARMER, ERIC B. SIMS, JANET COOLEY, JAMES A. GRADY, ROBERT E. GARY, WALTER J. DUBIEL, DAVID N. KAPEC, JAMES E. LYNCH, JOSEPH FALCONI, III, RONALD C. HARRISON, JR, MANUEL ZUNIGA, JIM OVERMILLER, GAIL DICKMAN, RICHARD MORRISON EARL, JR, MONTELL BERRY, ANTHONY MCMURRAY, LARRY W. HICE, BOSS ROBERT FRIES, III, ROBIN WILSON, NICHOLAS S. MARINOS, ZACHARIAH M. DAVIDSON, III, WALKER WILLIAMS, THOMAS A. O'DELL, MICHAEL L. DAVIS, DONALD P. REIMER, JOHN MALLOY, MARY MENDOZA, DON C. CHRISTENSEN, JOHN HLOHINEC, DARRYL SHERMAN, DENNIS H. PORTER, CHINESTA SKIPPER SMITH, DAVID L. SEIDEL, JOSEPH TOMEC, RICHARD AURAND, JOHN DARWISH, WILLIAM L. BROWN, JR, MIKE SHOBE, JAMES LOUIS HEMPHILL, ALBERT J. CANNIZZARO, STEVEN EVANS, RALPH V. FAULK, DONALD STRIPLIN, LLOYD T. ROSENSTEEL, BLAIR QUASNITSCHKA, JACK J. CRAPARO, JR, RONALD J. RUBIN, SANDRA INMAN, MARK E. WENGER, GERALD GUTZEIT, PETER S. MCVITTIE, STAFFORD W. MOORE, JOHN LUCAS, EUGENE MARONEY, ROBERT JAYSON, RODNEY W. WILLIAMS, SR, LONNIE MICHAEL CURTIS, GARY GOELZ, DAVID P. BOHAN, CLIFFORD L. PINCKNEY, RUFUS C. DOWELL, GEORGE F. DRUMMOND, ALLEN F. FOSTER, EUGENE BRANDON, WANDA COLLINS-SMITH, BRIAN J. WANLESS, PATRICIA A. HILL, JAMES T. MILLER, CARL FIELDER, THOMAS KROHNER, RONALD M. PINSONEAULT, JOHN DAVENPORT, FRANKLIN P. HALL, RONALD D. ZARBAUGH, ANDREW ALAN ANDERSON, JAMES P. MCGUIRE, MICHAEL MACISCO, RUDOLPH MCCLINON, JR, CORNELL G. VANDERGRIFT, CHARLES E. CORRY, CHARMAIN A. HORVATH, GEORGE HUYE, RICHARD D. HILL, PAUL QUATTRONE, JANICE BOND, CHARLES S. JACKSON, DICK ROBERTS, TERRANCE DONOGHUE, DANNY HIGDON, MICHAEL DOHENY, CHARLES DENNIS ZYBURO, ROSLYN EISENSTARK, BARBARA D. WRIGHT, DENNIS Z. SMITH, MARY TURLEY, ARMANDO D. SOLER, AMY CHERRNAY, ROBERTA L. BRACHFELD, STANLEY SUWALA, HERBERT A. NEWMAN, LARRY D. FINLEY, RICHARD SAULLE, ROBERT E. KIMBLE, WILLIAM FLOOD, KAREN RYAN-WHITE, WANDA TATUM, RANDOLPH GOODWIN, JR, DENNIS R. DYKE, CAROL STEVENS, KELLY PATRICK MULLIGAN, LARRY JONES, PORTIA M. CHAMBLISS, EDWARD SWANSON, ROBERT G. BARZELAY, GARY L. BOCK, JOHN P. AELLEN, III, PAMELA MEYER, JANE ESCHRICH-WALSH, CHARLES R. BURNS, III, ARTHUR R. MILES, JR, JAMES DEPIZZO, JENNIFER LATHAM, GERALD L. FLORES, JAN HANSON, FRANCES WISNIEWSKI, MARZIANO P. RAGNONE, RONALD R. JONES, EUGENIA ANNINO STEGER, LINDA WOSHNER, DINAH MORGAN, ALBERT TURNER, BRUCE ENGERT, THOMAS R. DURAN, ROBERT FRANZ, LESLIE K. DAVIDSON, TERRY PAULK, GLEN MASON, DONALD YOUNG, MONTAGUE A. THOMAS, III, MILTON COBB, STEPHEN WAYNE PIGG, THOMAS STEIN, RONALD W. SMITH, BRUCE R. CRALLEY, JIMMY C. CHIN, JOHN STOUT, THOMAS ROBY, MARGARET DEAN, JANET LINDSAY, BARBARA OXNER, CARL ANGELL, SUSAN E. MESSINA, LORETTA CAUSEY HANNON, KATHLEEN KENNEY, DAVID ROMAN, STEPHEN THOENNES, MARILYN SWANSON, ROBERT MINTON, CELESTE M. SULLIVAN, CHARLES JOHNSON, PHILIP J. SARCONE, AMOS KUYKENDOLL, RICHARD F. COOK, BARRY WILSON, JOHN MALEK, DANIEL BOSSIO, WILLIAM D. GREENE, ROGER SEROLA, JOHN W. HEASLEY, WRIGHT B. TAYLOR, III, ANDREW BLANCHETTE, SCOTT A. MATTINGLY, FINDLEY WEST, RONALD F. EATON, MARTHA PARRY, JOSEPH J. VIOLA, SR, LARRY O. GENTRY, JAY CRYSTAL(AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF DIANE CRYSTAL), WALLACE BERRY, JOSEPH LEE, PHILIP D. FEISAL, CHARLES L. WILLIAMS, STAN RICKS, JODENE GARDNER, RICHARD PAUL NYDEGGER, RONALD R. EDWARDS, FRANK E. MILLER, JR, DOUGLAS SCHIFFMILLER, THOMAS PAUL ALLISON, ERIC A. FORD, GARY CALLAWAY, RICHARD MOORE, JAY BROKER, MARK L. DIVINCENZO, WOODROW SHELTON, JR, CLYDE WILLARD ALLEN, LAWRENCE J. CAPOUCH, THOMAS MCCALL, LEONARD SHAW, MARIA G. RESNICK, LAWRENCE J. SIMMS.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(sg, )
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF MAY AMEND THEIR COMPLAINT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/15/2016. 3/15/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(sg, ) VACATED AS PER DOC. #20 . Modified on 4/18/2016 (sg, ).
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DEADLINE FOR ALL DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER, PLEAD, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SHALL BE AND IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO 3/23/2016. ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/3/2016. 3/3/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
March 2, 2016 Filing 12 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION.(KATCHEN, KATHERINE)
March 2, 2016 Filing 11 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.(KATCHEN, KATHERINE)
March 2, 2016 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #2 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, EDWARD M. LIDDY, THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION. (KATCHEN, KATHERINE) Modified on 3/3/2016 (afm, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY, FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
February 25, 2016 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ROBERT RUSSO, JAMES CIRILLO, JERREL L. MEAD, DWIGHT CHARLES BONDY, JOHN J. SANCHEZ, JIMMY D. HOCK, LINDA BEUCHER, SANDY K. FABRICATORE, JOHN F. MCKENZIE, JEAN MINAL, JOHN R. FORREST, STANLEY R. BINDER, RITA E. PINO, PHILLIP N. METCALFE, HAROLD E. DASKAM, JAMES W. LONGMAN, FAYE D. BROWN, MARIE SMITH, STEPHEN W. DELLAPINA, HAROLD BAKER, GARY L. BAUMGARDNER, JOSEPH ALLEY, RICK JAHNS, TIMOTHY JACKSON WATWOOD, FRANK L. PHILLIPS, JEFFREY TOBIN, LESTER BROWN, SR, JAMES HILLAN, MAXINE BACHICHA, GEORGE TWOHIG, BRENDA C. HAMMOND, SUSAN DRAPEAU, CASEY MCCOY, RUSSELL A. TAPIE, LARRY R. DYKSTRA, JAY CRYSTAL, RICHARD G. ALTIERI, DENNIS POWERS, SHERRY MCDONALD, RONALD WANEK, STEVE HOWELL, PATRICIA MARAZO, THOMAS C. BUSHEY, ROBERT F. BORTELL, JR, ROBERT HELSEL, SHEILA SANDERS, ROLAND BOISIS, CURTIS FARRAR, JOSEPH P. CONBOY, CHESTER NOWAK, SHARON E. LIBBRA, BRUCE W. CLOTFELTER, TIMOTHY L. SCHWARTZ, JAMES M. ZAHNER, LEANNE HINKLE, WALTER ORR, SAMUEL E. GILLETTE, JOE MONTANARO, FRIEDA MINGA, KAREN JUNEMAN, DORIS FIELDS, MARK C. COLLIER, JAMES CORNETT, HAROLD D. BERNSTEIN(AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF SANDI BERNSTEIN), SANDRA GUTHRIE, MICHAEL M. STERN, IRA CLOUD, JOHN ANTHONY DEVITO, CAROL E. LEBLANC, DARLENE HEINEN, JAMES MICHAEL WOOD, LINDA A. ANULARE, CHARLES TAYLOR, REECE JOHNSON, RICHARD K. ROSKOWE, SYLVIA E. MOSLEY, BRENT L. DANNER, KEN PHILBRICK, MICHAEL L. SANDERS, RICHARD ROSSELL, LOUIS VEAL, HAROLD D. BERNSTEIN, ROBERT KILLEEN, DEBORAH SORRELL-ULRICH, DAN P. HOURIHANE, JAMES A. BEARD, COLIN BENT, DARRELL NAMIE, JOYCE DOUGLAS, KATHARINE ADAMS-LOVE, TERRY GENE LIBBRA, CLETA VINING, DAVID ST. JOHN, MILFORD T. VAUGHT, JR, ROBERT POLLOCK, VALERY DORSHIMER, MARK CHASE, LEONARD YARBROUGH, JOHNNY A. PLEMONS, RONALD METZGER, KURT A. SUMMERS, THOMAS MCEVANS, III, LELAND JELINEK, MICHELLE TABLER, SHELDON F. SHEFF, CRAIG A. BOCK, DANIEL ANULARE, CHRIS HARDESTY, VICTOR M. CATARISANO, WILLIAM LANDMARK, ORTON W. MESSENGER, DAVE BUSSELL, RICHARD DROE, GREGORY LANE, THOMAS W. MATYJASIK, JOHN MARSH, ROBERT A WRIGHT, JR, RICHARD CARTER, JEFFREY M. DOMBECK, MARCOS E. SAYAGO, FRANCIS HANRATTY, RICHARD A. BROWN, JOHN IAPOCE, GEORGIANA CALLAWAY, JAMES RAUEN, NEIL WHICKER, BARBARA ANN MINK, NEAL SWANK BROOKS, D. CRAIG MULLEN, JAMES L. BRACHFELD, DALE A. VILLEMAIN, LINDA REYNOLDS, RICHARD EIRICH, EDWARD M. SAAD, DEBORAH BECKER, RICHARD A. BROWNSON, ROSE ZUMWINKLE, RICHARD MASI, RICHARD C. BENNETT, ROBERT W. TELKINS, VERNON BENTLEY, WILLIAM F. ESTES, DANIEL T. PERRY, STEVEN MALLORY, GAIL C. SANTALUCIA-DALY, CHRISTIAN FARLEY, ARTHUR WASHINGTON, DAVID J. TUSKEY, FRANK M. PATTERSON, GERALD HEINEN, ROBERT G. SHEA, JR, GAIL ROGERS HIBBLER, JACK SANDERS, THOMAS ABELL, PAUL SVABEK, BRUCE WILLIAM ASHLEY, GARY THOMAS, MICHAEL J. BRANTMEIER, BRUCE LARRABEE, CONI HEIDLE, GERALD H. SCHIELE, SARAH ST. JOHN, ERNEST JACK DEMONTE, DOUGLAS A. SIMS, MARIA KRUMM, MICHAEL ECONOMOS, SHEILA FARMER, ERIC B. SIMS, JANET COOLEY, JAMES A. GRADY, ROBERT E. GARY, WALTER J. DUBIEL, DAVID N. KAPEC, JAMES E. LYNCH, JOSEPH FALCONI, III, RONALD C. HARRISON, JR, MANUEL ZUNIGA, JIM OVERMILLER, GAIL DICKMAN, RICHARD MORRISON EARL, JR, MONTELL BERRY, ANTHONY MCMURRAY, LARRY W. HICE, BOSS ROBERT FRIES, III, ROBIN WILSON, NICHOLAS S. MARINOS, ZACHARIAH M. DAVIDSON, III, WALKER WILLIAMS, THOMAS A. O'DELL, MICHAEL L. DAVIS, DONALD P. REIMER, JOHN MALLOY, MARY MENDOZA, DON C. CHRISTENSEN, JOHN HLOHINEC, DARRYL SHERMAN, DENNIS H. PORTER, CHINESTA SKIPPER SMITH, DAVID L. SEIDEL, JOSEPH TOMEC, RICHARD AURAND, JOHN DARWISH, WILLIAM L. BROWN, JR, MIKE SHOBE, JAMES LOUIS HEMPHILL, ALBERT J. CANNIZZARO, STEVEN EVANS, RALPH V. FAULK, DONALD STRIPLIN, LLOYD T. ROSENSTEEL, BLAIR QUASNITSCHKA, JACK J. CRAPARO, JR, RONALD J. RUBIN, SANDRA INMAN, MARK E. WENGER, GERALD GUTZEIT, PETER S. MCVITTIE, STAFFORD W. MOORE, JOHN LUCAS, EUGENE MARONEY, ROBERT JAYSON, RODNEY W. WILLIAMS, SR, LONNIE MICHAEL CURTIS, GARY GOELZ, DAVID P. BOHAN, CLIFFORD L. PINCKNEY, RUFUS C. DOWELL, GEORGE F. DRUMMOND, ALLEN F. FOSTER, EUGENE BRANDON, WANDA COLLINS-SMITH, BRIAN J. WANLESS, PATRICIA A. HILL, JAMES T. MILLER, CARL FIELDER, THOMAS KROHNER, RONALD M. PINSONEAULT, JOHN DAVENPORT, FRANKLIN P. HALL, RONALD D. ZARBAUGH, ANDREW ALAN ANDERSON, JAMES P. MCGUIRE, MICHAEL MACISCO, RUDOLPH MCCLINON, JR, CORNELL G. VANDERGRIFT, CHARLES E. CORRY, CHARMAIN A. HORVATH, GEORGE HUYE, RICHARD D. HILL, PAUL QUATTRONE, JANICE BOND, CHARLES S. JACKSON, DICK ROBERTS, TERRANCE DONOGHUE, DANNY HIGDON, MICHAEL DOHENY, CHARLES DENNIS ZYBURO, ROSLYN EISENSTARK, BARBARA D. WRIGHT, DENNIS Z. SMITH, MARY TURLEY, ARMANDO D. SOLER, AMY CHERRNAY, ROBERTA L. BRACHFELD, STANLEY SUWALA, HERBERT A. NEWMAN, LARRY D. FINLEY, RICHARD SAULLE, ROBERT E. KIMBLE, WILLIAM FLOOD, KAREN RYAN-WHITE, WANDA TATUM, RANDOLPH GOODWIN, JR, DENNIS R. DYKE, CAROL STEVENS, KELLY PATRICK MULLIGAN, LARRY JONES, PORTIA M. CHAMBLISS, EDWARD SWANSON, ROBERT G. BARZELAY, GARY L. BOCK, JOHN P. AELLEN, III, PAMELA MEYER, JANE ESCHRICH-WALSH, CHARLES R. BURNS, III, ARTHUR R. MILES, JR, JAMES DEPIZZO, JENNIFER LATHAM, GERALD L. FLORES, JAN HANSON, FRANCES WISNIEWSKI, MARZIANO P. RAGNONE, RONALD R. JONES, EUGENIA ANNINO STEGER, LINDA WOSHNER, DINAH MORGAN, ALBERT TURNER, BRUCE ENGERT, THOMAS R. DURAN, ROBERT FRANZ, LESLIE K. DAVIDSON, TERRY PAULK, GLEN MASON, DONALD YOUNG, MONTAGUE A. THOMAS, III, MILTON COBB, STEPHEN WAYNE PIGG, THOMAS STEIN, RONALD W. SMITH, BRUCE R. CRALLEY, JIMMY C. CHIN, JOHN STOUT, THOMAS ROBY, MARGARET DEAN, JANET LINDSAY, BARBARA OXNER, CARL ANGELL, SUSAN E. MESSINA, LORETTA CAUSEY HANNON, KATHLEEN KENNEY, DAVID ROMAN, STEPHEN THOENNES, MARILYN SWANSON, ROBERT MINTON, CELESTE M. SULLIVAN, CHARLES JOHNSON, PHILIP J. SARCONE, AMOS KUYKENDOLL, RICHARD F. COOK, BARRY WILSON, JOHN MALEK, DANIEL BOSSIO, WILLIAM D. GREENE, ROGER SEROLA, JOHN W. HEASLEY, WRIGHT B. TAYLOR, III, ANDREW BLANCHETTE, SCOTT A. MATTINGLY, FINDLEY WEST, RONALD F. EATON, MARTHA PARRY, JOSEPH J. VIOLA, SR, LARRY O. GENTRY, JAY CRYSTAL(AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF DIANE CRYSTAL), WALLACE BERRY, JOSEPH LEE, PHILIP D. FEISAL, CHARLES L. WILLIAMS, STAN RICKS, JODENE GARDNER, RICHARD PAUL NYDEGGER, RONALD R. EDWARDS, FRANK E. MILLER, JR, DOUGLAS SCHIFFMILLER, THOMAS PAUL ALLISON, ERIC A. FORD, GARY CALLAWAY, RICHARD MOORE, JAY BROKER, MARK L. DIVINCENZO, WOODROW SHELTON, JR, CLYDE WILLARD ALLEN, LAWRENCE J. CAPOUCH, THOMAS MCCALL, LEONARD SHAW, MARIA G. RESNICK, LAWRENCE J. SIMMS re: NICHOLAS W. MINGOL served Summons and Complaint upon EDWARD M. LIDDY by C.O JOHN B. LANGEL. BALLARD SPAHR LLP. EDWARD M. LIDDY served on 2/23/2016, answer due 3/15/2016. (sg, )
February 25, 2016 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ROBERT RUSSO, JAMES CIRILLO, JERREL L. MEAD, DWIGHT CHARLES BONDY, JOHN J. SANCHEZ, JIMMY D. HOCK, LINDA BEUCHER, SANDY K. FABRICATORE, JOHN F. MCKENZIE, JEAN MINAL, JOHN R. FORREST, STANLEY R. BINDER, RITA E. PINO, PHILLIP N. METCALFE, HAROLD E. DASKAM, JAMES W. LONGMAN, FAYE D. BROWN, MARIE SMITH, STEPHEN W. DELLAPINA, HAROLD BAKER, GARY L. BAUMGARDNER, JOSEPH ALLEY, RICK JAHNS, TIMOTHY JACKSON WATWOOD, FRANK L. PHILLIPS, JEFFREY TOBIN, LESTER BROWN, SR, JAMES HILLAN, MAXINE BACHICHA, GEORGE TWOHIG, BRENDA C. HAMMOND, SUSAN DRAPEAU, CASEY MCCOY, RUSSELL A. TAPIE, LARRY R. DYKSTRA, JAY CRYSTAL, RICHARD G. ALTIERI, DENNIS POWERS, SHERRY MCDONALD, RONALD WANEK, STEVE HOWELL, PATRICIA MARAZO, THOMAS C. BUSHEY, ROBERT F. BORTELL, JR, ROBERT HELSEL, SHEILA SANDERS, ROLAND BOISIS, CURTIS FARRAR, JOSEPH P. CONBOY, CHESTER NOWAK, SHARON E. LIBBRA, BRUCE W. CLOTFELTER, TIMOTHY L. SCHWARTZ, JAMES M. ZAHNER, LEANNE HINKLE, WALTER ORR, SAMUEL E. GILLETTE, JOE MONTANARO, FRIEDA MINGA, KAREN JUNEMAN, DORIS FIELDS, MARK C. COLLIER, JAMES CORNETT, HAROLD D. BERNSTEIN(AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF SANDI BERNSTEIN), SANDRA GUTHRIE, MICHAEL M. STERN, IRA CLOUD, JOHN ANTHONY DEVITO, CAROL E. LEBLANC, DARLENE HEINEN, JAMES MICHAEL WOOD, LINDA A. ANULARE, CHARLES TAYLOR, REECE JOHNSON, RICHARD K. ROSKOWE, SYLVIA E. MOSLEY, BRENT L. DANNER, KEN PHILBRICK, MICHAEL L. SANDERS, RICHARD ROSSELL, LOUIS VEAL, HAROLD D. BERNSTEIN, ROBERT KILLEEN, DEBORAH SORRELL-ULRICH, DAN P. HOURIHANE, JAMES A. BEARD, COLIN BENT, DARRELL NAMIE, JOYCE DOUGLAS, KATHARINE ADAMS-LOVE, TERRY GENE LIBBRA, CLETA VINING, DAVID ST. JOHN, MILFORD T. VAUGHT, JR, ROBERT POLLOCK, VALERY DORSHIMER, MARK CHASE, LEONARD YARBROUGH, JOHNNY A. PLEMONS, RONALD METZGER, KURT A. SUMMERS, THOMAS MCEVANS, III, LELAND JELINEK, MICHELLE TABLER, SHELDON F. SHEFF, CRAIG A. BOCK, DANIEL ANULARE, CHRIS HARDESTY, VICTOR M. CATARISANO, WILLIAM LANDMARK, ORTON W. MESSENGER, DAVE BUSSELL, RICHARD DROE, GREGORY LANE, THOMAS W. MATYJASIK, JOHN MARSH, ROBERT A WRIGHT, JR, RICHARD CARTER, JEFFREY M. DOMBECK, MARCOS E. SAYAGO, FRANCIS HANRATTY, RICHARD A. BROWN, JOHN IAPOCE, GEORGIANA CALLAWAY, JAMES RAUEN, NEIL WHICKER, BARBARA ANN MINK, NEAL SWANK BROOKS, D. CRAIG MULLEN, JAMES L. BRACHFELD, DALE A. VILLEMAIN, LINDA REYNOLDS, RICHARD EIRICH, EDWARD M. SAAD, DEBORAH BECKER, RICHARD A. BROWNSON, ROSE ZUMWINKLE, RICHARD MASI, RICHARD C. BENNETT, ROBERT W. TELKINS, VERNON BENTLEY, WILLIAM F. ESTES, DANIEL T. PERRY, STEVEN MALLORY, GAIL C. SANTALUCIA-DALY, CHRISTIAN FARLEY, ARTHUR WASHINGTON, DAVID J. TUSKEY, FRANK M. PATTERSON, GERALD HEINEN, ROBERT G. SHEA, JR, GAIL ROGERS HIBBLER, JACK SANDERS, THOMAS ABELL, PAUL SVABEK, BRUCE WILLIAM ASHLEY, GARY THOMAS, MICHAEL J. BRANTMEIER, BRUCE LARRABEE, CONI HEIDLE, GERALD H. SCHIELE, SARAH ST. JOHN, ERNEST JACK DEMONTE, DOUGLAS A. SIMS, MARIA KRUMM, MICHAEL ECONOMOS, SHEILA FARMER, ERIC B. SIMS, JANET COOLEY, JAMES A. GRADY, ROBERT E. GARY, WALTER J. DUBIEL, DAVID N. KAPEC, JAMES E. LYNCH, JOSEPH FALCONI, III, RONALD C. HARRISON, JR, MANUEL ZUNIGA, JIM OVERMILLER, GAIL DICKMAN, RICHARD MORRISON EARL, JR, MONTELL BERRY, ANTHONY MCMURRAY, LARRY W. HICE, BOSS ROBERT FRIES, III, ROBIN WILSON, NICHOLAS S. MARINOS, ZACHARIAH M. DAVIDSON, III, WALKER WILLIAMS, THOMAS A. O'DELL, MICHAEL L. DAVIS, DONALD P. REIMER, JOHN MALLOY, MARY MENDOZA, DON C. CHRISTENSEN, JOHN HLOHINEC, DARRYL SHERMAN, DENNIS H. PORTER, CHINESTA SKIPPER SMITH, DAVID L. SEIDEL, JOSEPH TOMEC, RICHARD AURAND, JOHN DARWISH, WILLIAM L. BROWN, JR, MIKE SHOBE, JAMES LOUIS HEMPHILL, ALBERT J. CANNIZZARO, STEVEN EVANS, RALPH V. FAULK, DONALD STRIPLIN, LLOYD T. ROSENSTEEL, BLAIR QUASNITSCHKA, JACK J. CRAPARO, JR, RONALD J. RUBIN, SANDRA INMAN, MARK E. WENGER, GERALD GUTZEIT, PETER S. MCVITTIE, STAFFORD W. MOORE, JOHN LUCAS, EUGENE MARONEY, ROBERT JAYSON, RODNEY W. WILLIAMS, SR, LONNIE MICHAEL CURTIS, GARY GOELZ, DAVID P. BOHAN, CLIFFORD L. PINCKNEY, RUFUS C. DOWELL, GEORGE F. DRUMMOND, ALLEN F. FOSTER, EUGENE BRANDON, WANDA COLLINS-SMITH, BRIAN J. WANLESS, PATRICIA A. HILL, JAMES T. MILLER, CARL FIELDER, THOMAS KROHNER, RONALD M. PINSONEAULT, JOHN DAVENPORT, FRANKLIN P. HALL, RONALD D. ZARBAUGH, ANDREW ALAN ANDERSON, JAMES P. MCGUIRE, MICHAEL MACISCO, RUDOLPH MCCLINON, JR, CORNELL G. VANDERGRIFT, CHARLES E. CORRY, CHARMAIN A. HORVATH, GEORGE HUYE, RICHARD D. HILL, PAUL QUATTRONE, JANICE BOND, CHARLES S. JACKSON, DICK ROBERTS, TERRANCE DONOGHUE, DANNY HIGDON, MICHAEL DOHENY, CHARLES DENNIS ZYBURO, ROSLYN EISENSTARK, BARBARA D. WRIGHT, DENNIS Z. SMITH, MARY TURLEY, ARMANDO D. SOLER, AMY CHERRNAY, ROBERTA L. BRACHFELD, STANLEY SUWALA, HERBERT A. NEWMAN, LARRY D. FINLEY, RICHARD SAULLE, ROBERT E. KIMBLE, WILLIAM FLOOD, KAREN RYAN-WHITE, WANDA TATUM, RANDOLPH GOODWIN, JR, DENNIS R. DYKE, CAROL STEVENS, KELLY PATRICK MULLIGAN, LARRY JONES, PORTIA M. CHAMBLISS, EDWARD SWANSON, ROBERT G. BARZELAY, GARY L. BOCK, JOHN P. AELLEN, III, PAMELA MEYER, JANE ESCHRICH-WALSH, CHARLES R. BURNS, III, ARTHUR R. MILES, JR, JAMES DEPIZZO, JENNIFER LATHAM, GERALD L. FLORES, JAN HANSON, FRANCES WISNIEWSKI, MARZIANO P. RAGNONE, RONALD R. JONES, EUGENIA ANNINO STEGER, LINDA WOSHNER, DINAH MORGAN, ALBERT TURNER, BRUCE ENGERT, THOMAS R. DURAN, ROBERT FRANZ, LESLIE K. DAVIDSON, TERRY PAULK, GLEN MASON, DONALD YOUNG, MONTAGUE A. THOMAS, III, MILTON COBB, STEPHEN WAYNE PIGG, THOMAS STEIN, RONALD W. SMITH, BRUCE R. CRALLEY, JIMMY C. CHIN, JOHN STOUT, THOMAS ROBY, MARGARET DEAN, JANET LINDSAY, BARBARA OXNER, CARL ANGELL, SUSAN E. MESSINA, LORETTA CAUSEY HANNON, KATHLEEN KENNEY, DAVID ROMAN, STEPHEN THOENNES, MARILYN SWANSON, ROBERT MINTON, CELESTE M. SULLIVAN, CHARLES JOHNSON, PHILIP J. SARCONE, AMOS KUYKENDOLL, RICHARD F. COOK, BARRY WILSON, JOHN MALEK, DANIEL BOSSIO, WILLIAM D. GREENE, ROGER SEROLA, JOHN W. HEASLEY, WRIGHT B. TAYLOR, III, ANDREW BLANCHETTE, SCOTT A. MATTINGLY, FINDLEY WEST, RONALD F. EATON, MARTHA PARRY, JOSEPH J. VIOLA, SR, LARRY O. GENTRY, JAY CRYSTAL(AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF DIANE CRYSTAL), WALLACE BERRY, JOSEPH LEE, PHILIP D. FEISAL, CHARLES L. WILLIAMS, STAN RICKS, JODENE GARDNER, RICHARD PAUL NYDEGGER, RONALD R. EDWARDS, FRANK E. MILLER, JR, DOUGLAS SCHIFFMILLER, THOMAS PAUL ALLISON, ERIC A. FORD, GARY CALLAWAY, RICHARD MOORE, JAY BROKER, MARK L. DIVINCENZO, WOODROW SHELTON, JR, CLYDE WILLARD ALLEN, LAWRENCE J. CAPOUCH, THOMAS MCCALL, LEONARD SHAW, MARIA G. RESNICK, LAWRENCE J. SIMMS re: HEDY BERROCAL served Summons and Complaint upon ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE, AGENTS PENSION PLAN by CANDACE RICE, PARALEGAL ACCEPTED SERVICE ON BEHALF. ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE served on 2/19/2016, answer due 3/11/2016; AGENTS PENSION PLAN served on 2/19/2016, answer due 3/11/2016. (sg, )
February 16, 2016 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ROBERT RUSSO, JAMES CIRILLO, JERREL L. MEAD, DWIGHT CHARLES BONDY, JOHN J. SANCHEZ, JIMMY D. HOCK, LINDA BEUCHER, SANDY K. FABRICATORE, JOHN F. MCKENZIE, JEAN MINAL, JOHN R. FORREST, STANLEY R. BINDER, RITA E. PINO, PHILLIP N. METCALFE, HAROLD E. DASKAM, JAMES W. LONGMAN, FAYE D. BROWN, MARIE SMITH, STEPHEN W. DELLAPINA, HAROLD BAKER, GARY L. BAUMGARDNER, JOSEPH ALLEY, RICK JAHNS, TIMOTHY JACKSON WATWOOD, FRANK L. PHILLIPS, JEFFREY TOBIN, LESTER BROWN, SR, JAMES HILLAN, MAXINE BACHICHA, GEORGE TWOHIG, BRENDA C. HAMMOND, SUSAN DRAPEAU, CASEY MCCOY, RUSSELL A. TAPIE, LARRY R. DYKSTRA, JAY CRYSTAL, RICHARD G. ALTIERI, DENNIS POWERS, SHERRY MCDONALD, RONALD WANEK, STEVE HOWELL, PATRICIA MARAZO, THOMAS C. BUSHEY, ROBERT F. BORTELL, JR, ROBERT HELSEL, SHEILA SANDERS, ROLAND BOISIS, CURTIS FARRAR, JOSEPH P. CONBOY, CHESTER NOWAK, SHARON E. LIBBRA, BRUCE W. CLOTFELTER, TIMOTHY L. SCHWARTZ, JAMES M. ZAHNER, LEANNE HINKLE, WALTER ORR, SAMUEL E. GILLETTE, JOE MONTANARO, FRIEDA MINGA, KAREN JUNEMAN, DORIS FIELDS, MARK C. COLLIER, JAMES CORNETT, HAROLD D. BERNSTEIN(AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF SANDI BERNSTEIN), SANDRA GUTHRIE, MICHAEL M. STERN, IRA CLOUD, JOHN ANTHONY DEVITO, CAROL E. LEBLANC, DARLENE HEINEN, JAMES MICHAEL WOOD, LINDA A. ANULARE, CHARLES TAYLOR, REECE JOHNSON, RICHARD K. ROSKOWE, SYLVIA E. MOSLEY, BRENT L. DANNER, KEN PHILBRICK, MICHAEL L. SANDERS, RICHARD ROSSELL, LOUIS VEAL, HAROLD D. BERNSTEIN, ROBERT KILLEEN, DEBORAH SORRELL-ULRICH, DAN P. HOURIHANE, JAMES A. BEARD, COLIN BENT, DARRELL NAMIE, JOYCE DOUGLAS, KATHARINE ADAMS-LOVE, TERRY GENE LIBBRA, CLETA VINING, DAVID ST. JOHN, MILFORD T. VAUGHT, JR, ROBERT POLLOCK, VALERY DORSHIMER, MARK CHASE, LEONARD YARBROUGH, JOHNNY A. PLEMONS, RONALD METZGER, KURT A. SUMMERS, THOMAS MCEVANS, III, LELAND JELINEK, MICHELLE TABLER, SHELDON F. SHEFF, CRAIG A. BOCK, DANIEL ANULARE, CHRIS HARDESTY, VICTOR M. CATARISANO, WILLIAM LANDMARK, ORTON W. MESSENGER, DAVE BUSSELL, RICHARD DROE, GREGORY LANE, THOMAS W. MATYJASIK, JOHN MARSH, ROBERT A WRIGHT, JR, RICHARD CARTER, JEFFREY M. DOMBECK, MARCOS E. SAYAGO, FRANCIS HANRATTY, RICHARD A. BROWN, JOHN IAPOCE, GEORGIANA CALLAWAY, JAMES RAUEN, NEIL WHICKER, BARBARA ANN MINK, NEAL SWANK BROOKS, D. CRAIG MULLEN, JAMES L. BRACHFELD, DALE A. VILLEMAIN, LINDA REYNOLDS, RICHARD EIRICH, EDWARD M. SAAD, DEBORAH BECKER, RICHARD A. BROWNSON, ROSE ZUMWINKLE, RICHARD MASI, RICHARD C. BENNETT, ROBERT W. TELKINS, VERNON BENTLEY, WILLIAM F. ESTES, DANIEL T. PERRY, STEVEN MALLORY, GAIL C. SANTALUCIA-DALY, CHRISTIAN FARLEY, ARTHUR WASHINGTON, DAVID J. TUSKEY, FRANK M. PATTERSON, GERALD HEINEN, ROBERT G. SHEA, JR, GAIL ROGERS HIBBLER, JACK SANDERS, THOMAS ABELL, PAUL SVABEK, BRUCE WILLIAM ASHLEY, GARY THOMAS, MICHAEL J. BRANTMEIER, BRUCE LARRABEE, CONI HEIDLE, GERALD H. SCHIELE, SARAH ST. JOHN, ERNEST JACK DEMONTE, DOUGLAS A. SIMS, MARIA KRUMM, MICHAEL ECONOMOS, SHEILA FARMER, ERIC B. SIMS, JANET COOLEY, JAMES A. GRADY, ROBERT E. GARY, WALTER J. DUBIEL, DAVID N. KAPEC, JAMES E. LYNCH, JOSEPH FALCONI, III, RONALD C. HARRISON, JR, MANUEL ZUNIGA, JIM OVERMILLER, GAIL DICKMAN, RICHARD MORRISON EARL, JR, MONTELL BERRY, ANTHONY MCMURRAY, LARRY W. HICE, BOSS ROBERT FRIES, III, ROBIN WILSON, NICHOLAS S. MARINOS, ZACHARIAH M. DAVIDSON, III, WALKER WILLIAMS, THOMAS A. O'DELL, MICHAEL L. DAVIS, DONALD P. REIMER, JOHN MALLOY, MARY MENDOZA, DON C. CHRISTENSEN, JOHN HLOHINEC, DARRYL SHERMAN, DENNIS H. PORTER, CHINESTA SKIPPER SMITH, DAVID L. SEIDEL, JOSEPH TOMEC, RICHARD AURAND, JOHN DARWISH, WILLIAM L. BROWN, JR, MIKE SHOBE, JAMES LOUIS HEMPHILL, ALBERT J. CANNIZZARO, STEVEN EVANS, RALPH V. FAULK, DONALD STRIPLIN, LLOYD T. ROSENSTEEL, BLAIR QUASNITSCHKA, JACK J. CRAPARO, JR, RONALD J. RUBIN, SANDRA INMAN, MARK E. WENGER, GERALD GUTZEIT, PETER S. MCVITTIE, STAFFORD W. MOORE, JOHN LUCAS, EUGENE MARONEY, ROBERT JAYSON, RODNEY W. WILLIAMS, SR, LONNIE MICHAEL CURTIS, GARY GOELZ, DAVID P. BOHAN, CLIFFORD L. PINCKNEY, RUFUS C. DOWELL, GEORGE F. DRUMMOND, ALLEN F. FOSTER, EUGENE BRANDON, WANDA COLLINS-SMITH, BRIAN J. WANLESS, PATRICIA A. HILL, JAMES T. MILLER, CARL FIELDER, THOMAS KROHNER, RONALD M. PINSONEAULT, JOHN DAVENPORT, FRANKLIN P. HALL, RONALD D. ZARBAUGH, ANDREW ALAN ANDERSON, JAMES P. MCGUIRE, MICHAEL MACISCO, RUDOLPH MCCLINON, JR, CORNELL G. VANDERGRIFT, CHARLES E. CORRY, CHARMAIN A. HORVATH, GEORGE HUYE, RICHARD D. HILL, PAUL QUATTRONE, JANICE BOND, CHARLES S. JACKSON, DICK ROBERTS, TERRANCE DONOGHUE, DANNY HIGDON, MICHAEL DOHENY, CHARLES DENNIS ZYBURO, ROSLYN EISENSTARK, BARBARA D. WRIGHT, DENNIS Z. SMITH, MARY TURLEY, ARMANDO D. SOLER, AMY CHERRNAY, ROBERTA L. BRACHFELD, STANLEY SUWALA, HERBERT A. NEWMAN, LARRY D. FINLEY, RICHARD SAULLE, ROBERT E. KIMBLE, WILLIAM FLOOD, KAREN RYAN-WHITE, WANDA TATUM, RANDOLPH GOODWIN, JR, DENNIS R. DYKE, CAROL STEVENS, KELLY PATRICK MULLIGAN, LARRY JONES, PORTIA M. CHAMBLISS, EDWARD SWANSON, ROBERT G. BARZELAY, GARY L. BOCK, JOHN P. AELLEN, III, PAMELA MEYER, JANE ESCHRICH-WALSH, CHARLES R. BURNS, III, ARTHUR R. MILES, JR, JAMES DEPIZZO, JENNIFER LATHAM, GERALD L. FLORES, JAN HANSON, FRANCES WISNIEWSKI, MARZIANO P. RAGNONE, RONALD R. JONES, EUGENIA ANNINO STEGER, LINDA WOSHNER, DINAH MORGAN, ALBERT TURNER, BRUCE ENGERT, THOMAS R. DURAN, ROBERT FRANZ, LESLIE K. DAVIDSON, TERRY PAULK, GLEN MASON, DONALD YOUNG, MONTAGUE A. THOMAS, III, MILTON COBB, STEPHEN WAYNE PIGG, THOMAS STEIN, RONALD W. SMITH, BRUCE R. CRALLEY, JIMMY C. CHIN, JOHN STOUT, THOMAS ROBY, MARGARET DEAN, JANET LINDSAY, BARBARA OXNER, CARL ANGELL, SUSAN E. MESSINA, LORETTA CAUSEY HANNON, KATHLEEN KENNEY, DAVID ROMAN, STEPHEN THOENNES, MARILYN SWANSON, ROBERT MINTON, CELESTE M. SULLIVAN, CHARLES JOHNSON, PHILIP J. SARCONE, AMOS KUYKENDOLL, RICHARD F. COOK, BARRY WILSON, JOHN MALEK, DANIEL BOSSIO, WILLIAM D. GREENE, ROGER SEROLA, JOHN W. HEASLEY, WRIGHT B. TAYLOR, III, ANDREW BLANCHETTE, SCOTT A. MATTINGLY, FINDLEY WEST, RONALD F. EATON, MARTHA PARRY, JOSEPH J. VIOLA, SR, LARRY O. GENTRY, JAY CRYSTAL(AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF DIANE CRYSTAL), WALLACE BERRY, JOSEPH LEE, PHILIP D. FEISAL, CHARLES L. WILLIAMS, STAN RICKS, JODENE GARDNER, RICHARD PAUL NYDEGGER, RONALD R. EDWARDS, FRANK E. MILLER, JR, DOUGLAS SCHIFFMILLER, THOMAS PAUL ALLISON, ERIC A. FORD, GARY CALLAWAY, RICHARD MOORE, JAY BROKER, MARK L. DIVINCENZO, WOODROW SHELTON, JR, CLYDE WILLARD ALLEN, LAWRENCE J. CAPOUCH, THOMAS MCCALL, LEONARD SHAW, MARIA G. RESNICK, LAWRENCE J. SIMMS re: JASON DALESSIO & BRIAN JOHNSON served Summons and Complaint upon ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION by AMY MCLAREN AND CATHIE DIPINTO ACCEPTED SERVICE ON BEHALF. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY served on 2/11/2016, answer due 3/3/2016; THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION served on 2/11/2016, answer due 3/3/2016. (sg, )
February 9, 2016 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO RE-ISSUE SUMMONSES, by THOMAS ABELL, KATHARINE ADAMS-LOVE, JOHN P. AELLEN, III, CLYDE WILLARD ALLEN, JOSEPH ALLEY, THOMAS PAUL ALLISON, RICHARD G. ALTIERI, ANDREW ALAN ANDERSON, CARL ANGELL, EUGENIA ANNINO STEGER, DANIEL ANULARE, LINDA A. ANULARE, BRUCE WILLIAM ASHLEY, RICHARD AURAND, MAXINE BACHICHA, HAROLD BAKER, ROBERT G. BARZELAY, GARY L. BAUMGARDNER, JAMES A. BEARD, DEBORAH BECKER, RICHARD C. BENNETT, COLIN BENT, VERNON BENTLEY, HAROLD D. BERNSTEIN(AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF SANDI BERNSTEIN), HAROLD D. BERNSTEIN, MONTELL BERRY, WALLACE BERRY, LINDA BEUCHER, STANLEY R. BINDER, ANDREW BLANCHETTE, CRAIG A. BOCK, GARY L. BOCK, DAVID P. BOHAN, ROLAND BOISIS, JANICE BOND, DWIGHT CHARLES BONDY, ROBERT F. BORTELL, JR, DANIEL BOSSIO, JAMES L. BRACHFELD, ROBERTA L. BRACHFELD, EUGENE BRANDON, MICHAEL J. BRANTMEIER, JAY BROKER, NEAL SWANK BROOKS, FAYE D. BROWN, LESTER BROWN, SR, RICHARD A. BROWN, WILLIAM L. BROWN, JR, RICHARD A. BROWNSON, CHARLES R. BURNS, III, THOMAS C. BUSHEY, DAVE BUSSELL, GARY CALLAWAY, GEORGIANA CALLAWAY, ALBERT J. CANNIZZARO, LAWRENCE J. CAPOUCH, RICHARD CARTER, VICTOR M. CATARISANO, PORTIA M. CHAMBLISS, MARK CHASE, AMY CHERRNAY, JIMMY C. CHIN, DON C. CHRISTENSEN, JAMES CIRILLO, BRUCE W. CLOTFELTER, IRA CLOUD, MILTON COBB, MARK C. COLLIER, WANDA COLLINS-SMITH, JOSEPH P. CONBOY, RICHARD F. COOK, JANET COOLEY, JAMES CORNETT, CHARLES E. CORRY, BRUCE R. CRALLEY, JACK J. CRAPARO, JR, JAY CRYSTAL, JAY CRYSTAL(AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF DIANE CRYSTAL), LONNIE MICHAEL CURTIS, BRENT L. DANNER, JOHN DARWISH, HAROLD E. DASKAM, JOHN DAVENPORT, LESLIE K. DAVIDSON, ZACHARIAH M. DAVIDSON, III, MICHAEL L. DAVIS, MARGARET DEAN, STEPHEN W. DELLAPINA, ERNEST JACK DEMONTE, JAMES DEPIZZO, JOHN ANTHONY DEVITO, GAIL DICKMAN, MARK L. DIVINCENZO, MICHAEL DOHENY, JEFFREY M. DOMBECK, TERRANCE DONOGHUE, VALERY DORSHIMER, JOYCE DOUGLAS, RUFUS C. DOWELL, SUSAN DRAPEAU, RICHARD DROE, GEORGE F. DRUMMOND, WALTER J. DUBIEL, THOMAS R. DURAN, DENNIS R. DYKE, LARRY R. DYKSTRA, RICHARD MORRISON EARL, JR, RONALD F. EATON, MICHAEL ECONOMOS, RONALD R. EDWARDS, RICHARD EIRICH, ROSLYN EISENSTARK, BRUCE ENGERT, JANE ESCHRICH-WALSH, WILLIAM F. ESTES, STEVEN EVANS, SANDY K. FABRICATORE, JOSEPH FALCONI, III, CHRISTIAN FARLEY, SHEILA FARMER, CURTIS FARRAR, RALPH V. FAULK, PHILIP D. FEISAL, CARL FIELDER, DORIS FIELDS, LARRY D. FINLEY, WILLIAM FLOOD, GERALD L. FLORES, ERIC A. FORD, JOHN R. FORREST, ALLEN F. FOSTER, ROBERT FRANZ, BOSS ROBERT FRIES, III, JODENE GARDNER, ROBERT E. GARY, LARRY O. GENTRY, SAMUEL E. GILLETTE, GARY GOELZ, RANDOLPH GOODWIN, JR, JAMES A. GRADY, WILLIAM D. GREENE, SANDRA GUTHRIE, GERALD GUTZEIT, FRANKLIN P. HALL, BRENDA C. HAMMOND, LORETTA CAUSEY HANNON, FRANCIS HANRATTY, JAN HANSON, CHRIS HARDESTY, RONALD C. HARRISON, JR, JOHN W. HEASLEY, CONI HEIDLE, DARLENE HEINEN, GERALD HEINEN, ROBERT HELSEL, JAMES LOUIS HEMPHILL, GAIL ROGERS HIBBLER, LARRY W. HICE, DANNY HIGDON, PATRICIA A. HILL, RICHARD D. HILL, JAMES HILLAN, LEANNE HINKLE, JOHN HLOHINEC, JIMMY D. HOCK, CHARMAIN A. HORVATH, DAN P. HOURIHANE, STEVE HOWELL, GEORGE HUYE, JOHN IAPOCE, SANDRA INMAN, CHARLES S. JACKSON, RICK JAHNS, ROBERT JAYSON, LELAND JELINEK, CHARLES JOHNSON, REECE JOHNSON, LARRY JONES, RONALD R. JONES, KAREN JUNEMAN, DAVID N. KAPEC, KATHLEEN KENNEY, ROBERT KILLEEN, ROBERT E. KIMBLE, THOMAS KROHNER, MARIA KRUMM, AMOS KUYKENDOLL, WILLIAM LANDMARK, GREGORY LANE, BRUCE LARRABEE, JENNIFER LATHAM, CAROL E. LEBLANC, JOSEPH LEE, SHARON E. LIBBRA, TERRY GENE LIBBRA, JANET LINDSAY, JAMES W. LONGMAN, JOHN LUCAS, JAMES E. LYNCH, MICHAEL MACISCO, JOHN MALEK, STEVEN MALLORY, JOHN MALLOY, PATRICIA MARAZO, NICHOLAS S. MARINOS, EUGENE MARONEY, JOHN MARSH, RICHARD MASI, GLEN MASON, SCOTT A. MATTINGLY, THOMAS W. MATYJASIK, THOMAS MCCALL, RUDOLPH MCCLINON, JR, CASEY MCCOY, SHERRY MCDONALD, THOMAS MCEVANS, III, JAMES P. MCGUIRE, JOHN F. MCKENZIE, ANTHONY MCMURRAY, PETER S. MCVITTIE, JERREL L. MEAD, MARY MENDOZA, ORTON W. MESSENGER, SUSAN E. MESSINA, PHILLIP N. METCALFE, RONALD METZGER, PAMELA MEYER, ARTHUR R. MILES, JR, FRANK E. MILLER, JR, JAMES T. MILLER, JEAN MINAL, FRIEDA MINGA, BARBARA ANN MINK, ROBERT MINTON, JOE MONTANARO, RICHARD MOORE, STAFFORD W. MOORE, DINAH MORGAN, SYLVIA E. MOSLEY, D. CRAIG MULLEN, KELLY PATRICK MULLIGAN, DARRELL NAMIE, HERBERT A. NEWMAN, CHESTER NOWAK, RICHARD PAUL NYDEGGER, THOMAS A. O'DELL, WALTER ORR, JIM OVERMILLER, BARBARA OXNER, MARTHA PARRY, FRANK M. PATTERSON, TERRY PAULK, DANIEL T. PERRY, KEN PHILBRICK, FRANK L. PHILLIPS, STEPHEN WAYNE PIGG, CLIFFORD L. PINCKNEY, RITA E. PINO, RONALD M. PINSONEAULT, JOHNNY A. PLEMONS, ROBERT POLLOCK, DENNIS H. PORTER, DENNIS POWERS, BLAIR QUASNITSCHKA, PAUL QUATTRONE, MARZIANO P. RAGNONE, JAMES RAUEN, DONALD P. REIMER, MARIA G. RESNICK, LINDA REYNOLDS, STAN RICKS, DICK ROBERTS, THOMAS ROBY, DAVID ROMAN, LLOYD T. ROSENSTEEL, RICHARD K. ROSKOWE, RICHARD ROSSELL, RONALD J. RUBIN, ROBERT RUSSO, KAREN RYAN-WHITE, EDWARD M. SAAD, JOHN J. SANCHEZ, JACK SANDERS, MICHAEL L. SANDERS, SHEILA SANDERS, GAIL C. SANTALUCIA-DALY, PHILIP J. SARCONE, RICHARD SAULLE, MARCOS E. SAYAGO, GERALD H. SCHIELE, DOUGLAS SCHIFFMILLER, TIMOTHY L. SCHWARTZ, DAVID L. SEIDEL, ROGER SEROLA, LEONARD SHAW, ROBERT G. SHEA, JR, SHELDON F. SHEFF, WOODROW SHELTON, JR, DARRYL SHERMAN, MIKE SHOBE, LAWRENCE J. SIMMS, DOUGLAS A. SIMS, ERIC B. SIMS, CHINESTA SKIPPER SMITH, DENNIS Z. SMITH, MARIE SMITH, RONALD W. SMITH, ARMANDO D. SOLER, DEBORAH SORRELL-ULRICH, DAVID ST. JOHN, SARAH ST. JOHN, THOMAS STEIN, MICHAEL M. STERN, CAROL STEVENS, JOHN STOUT, DONALD STRIPLIN, CELESTE M. SULLIVAN, KURT A. SUMMERS, STANLEY SUWALA, PAUL SVABEK, EDWARD SWANSON, MARILYN SWANSON, MICHELLE TABLER, RUSSELL A. TAPIE, WANDA TATUM, CHARLES TAYLOR, WRIGHT B. TAYLOR, III, ROBERT W. TELKINS, STEPHEN THOENNES, GARY THOMAS, MONTAGUE A. THOMAS, III, JEFFREY TOBIN, JOSEPH TOMEC, MARY TURLEY, ALBERT TURNER, DAVID J. TUSKEY, GEORGE TWOHIG, CORNELL G. VANDERGRIFT, MILFORD T. VAUGHT, JR, LOUIS VEAL, DALE A. VILLEMAIN, CLETA VINING, JOSEPH J. VIOLA, SR, RONALD WANEK, BRIAN J. WANLESS, ARTHUR WASHINGTON, TIMOTHY JACKSON WATWOOD, MARK E. WENGER, FINDLEY WEST, NEIL WHICKER, CHARLES L. WILLIAMS, RODNEY W. WILLIAMS, SR, WALKER WILLIAMS, BARRY WILSON, ROBIN WILSON, FRANCES WISNIEWSKI, JAMES MICHAEL WOOD, LINDA WOSHNER, BARBARA D. WRIGHT, ROBERT A WRIGHT, JR, LEONARD YARBROUGH, DONALD YOUNG, JAMES M. ZAHNER, RONALD D. ZARBAUGH, ROSE ZUMWINKLE, MANUEL ZUNIGA, CHARLES DENNIS ZYBURO. (sg, )
February 9, 2016 Alias Summons Issued as to ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE, AGENTS PENSION PLAN, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, EDWARD M. LIDDY, THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION. FORWARDED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL. (sg, )
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER TO HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY MICHAEL E. KUNZ, CLERK OF COURT ON 2/1/2016. 2/1/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER VACATING ORDER DATED 1/25/16; FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASES ARE RESTORED TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER. SIGNED BY MICHAEL E. KUNZ, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/26/16. 1/26/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) Modified on 1/26/2016 (jaa, ). Modified on 1/26/2016 (jaa, ).
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER TO HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY MICHAEL E. KUNZ, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/25/16. 1/25/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED UNREPS, E-MAILED.(jl, ) Modified on 1/26/2016 (afm, ). (VACATED PER ORDER #4 )
March 6, 2015 Filing 2 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE, AGENTS PENSION PLAN, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, EDWARD M. LIDDY, THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION, filed by ROBERT RUSSO, JAMES CIRILLO, JERREL L. MEAD, DWIGHT CHARLES BONDY, JOHN J. SANCHEZ, JIMMY D. HOCK, LINDA BEUCHER, SANDY K. FABRICATORE, JOHN F. MCKENZIE, JEAN MINAL, JOHN R. FORREST, STANLEY R. BINDER, RITA E. PINO, PHILLIP N. METCALFE, HAROLD E. DASKAM, JAMES W. LONGMAN, FAYE D. BROWN, MARIE SMITH, STEPHEN W. DELLAPINA, HAROLD BAKER, GARY L. BAUMGARDNER, JOSEPH ALLEY, RICK JAHNS, TIMOTHY JACKSON WATWOOD, FRANK L. PHILLIPS, JEFFREY TOBIN, LESTER BROWN, SR, JAMES HILLAN, MAXINE BACHICHA, GEORGE TWOHIG, BRENDA C. HAMMOND, SUSAN DRAPEAU, CASEY MCCOY, RUSSELL A. TAPIE, LARRY R. DYKSTRA, JAY CRYSTAL, RICHARD G. ALTIERI, DENNIS POWERS, SHERRY MCDONALD, RONALD WANEK, STEVE HOWELL, PATRICIA MARAZO, THOMAS C. BUSHEY, ROBERT F. BORTELL, JR, ROBERT HELSEL, SHEILA SANDERS, ROLAND BOISIS, CURTIS FARRAR, JOSEPH P. CONBOY, CHESTER NOWAK, SHARON E. LIBBRA, BRUCE W. CLOTFELTER, TIMOTHY L. SCHWARTZ, JAMES M. ZAHNER, LEANNE HINKLE, WALTER ORR, SAMUEL E. GILLETTE, JOE MONTANARO, FRIEDA MINGA, KAREN JUNEMAN, DORIS FIELDS, MARK C. COLLIER, JAMES CORNETT, HAROLD D. BERNSTEIN(AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF SANDI BERNSTEIN), SANDRA GUTHRIE, MICHAEL M. STERN, IRA CLOUD, JOHN ANTHONY DEVITO, CAROL E. LEBLANC, DARLENE HEINEN, JAMES MICHAEL WOOD, LINDA A. ANULARE, CHARLES TAYLOR, REECE JOHNSON, RICHARD K. ROSKOWE, SYLVIA E. MOSLEY, BRENT L. DANNER, KEN PHILBRICK, MICHAEL L. SANDERS, RICHARD ROSSELL, LOUIS VEAL, HAROLD D. BERNSTEIN, ROBERT KILLEEN, DEBORAH SORRELL-ULRICH, DAN P. HOURIHANE, JAMES A. BEARD, COLIN BENT, DARRELL NAMIE, JOYCE DOUGLAS, KATHARINE ADAMS-LOVE, TERRY GENE LIBBRA, CLETA VINING, DAVID ST. JOHN, MILFORD T. VAUGHT, JR, ROBERT POLLOCK, VALERY DORSHIMER, MARK CHASE, LEONARD YARBROUGH, JOHNNY A. PLEMONS, RONALD METZGER, KURT A. SUMMERS, THOMAS MCEVANS, III, LELAND JELINEK, MICHELLE TABLER, SHELDON F. SHEFF, CRAIG A. BOCK, CHRIS HARDESTY, VICTOR M. CATARISANO, WILLIAM LANDMARK, ORTON W. MESSENGER, DAVE BUSSELL, RICHARD DROE, GREGORY LANE, THOMAS W. MATYJASIK, JOHN MARSH, ROBERT A WRIGHT, JR, RICHARD CARTER, JEFFREY M. DOMBECK, MARCOS E. SAYAGO, FRANCIS HANRATTY, RICHARD A. BROWN, JOHN IAPOCE, GEORGIANA CALLAWAY, JAMES RAUEN, NEIL WHICKER, BARBARA ANN MINK, NEAL SWANK BROOKS, D. CRAIG MULLEN, JAMES L. BRACHFELD, DALE A. VILLEMAIN, LINDA REYNOLDS, RICHARD EIRICH, EDWARD M. SAAD, DEBORAH BECKER, RICHARD A. BROWNSON, ROSE ZUMWINKLE, RICHARD MASI, RICHARD C. BENNETT, ROBERT W. TELKINS, VERNON BENTLEY, WILLIAM F. ESTES, DANIEL T. PERRY, STEVEN MALLORY, GAIL C. SANTALUCIA-DALY, CHRISTIAN FARLEY, ARTHUR WASHINGTON, DAVID J. TUSKEY, FRANK M. PATTERSON, GERALD HEINEN, ROBERT G. SHEA, JR, GAIL ROGERS HIBBLER, JACK SANDERS, THOMAS ABELL, PAUL SVABEK, BRUCE WILLIAM ASHLEY, GARY THOMAS, MICHAEL J. BRANTMEIER, BRUCE LARRABEE, CONI HEIDLE, GERALD H. SCHIELE, SARAH ST. JOHN, ERNEST JACK DEMONTE, DOUGLAS A. SIMS, MARIA KRUMM, MICHAEL ECONOMOS, SHEILA FARMER, ERIC B. SIMS, JANET COOLEY, JAMES A. GRADY, ROBERT E. GARY, WALTER J. DUBIEL, DAVID N. KAPEC, JAMES E. LYNCH, JOSEPH FALCONI, III, RONALD C. HARRISON, JR, MANUEL ZUNIGA, JIM OVERMILLER, GAIL DICKMAN, RICHARD MORRISON EARL, JR, MONTELL BERRY, ANTHONY MCMURRAY, LARRY W. HICE, BOSS ROBERT FRIES, III, ROBIN WILSON, NICHOLAS S. MARINOS, ZACHARIAH M. DAVIDSON, III, WALKER WILLIAMS, THOMAS A. O'DELL, MICHAEL L. DAVIS, DONALD P. REIMER, JOHN MALLOY, MARY MENDOZA, DON C. CHRISTENSEN, JOHN HLOHINEC, DARRYL SHERMAN, DENNIS H. PORTER, CHINESTA SKIPPER SMITH, DAVID L. SEIDEL, JOSEPH TOMEC, RICHARD AURAND, JOHN DARWISH, WILLIAM L. BROWN, JR, MIKE SHOBE, JAMES LOUIS HEMPHILL, ALBERT J. CANNIZZARO, STEVEN EVANS, RALPH V. FAULK, DONALD STRIPLIN, LLOYD T. ROSENSTEEL, BLAIR QUASNITSCHKA, JACK J. CRAPARO, JR, RONALD J. RUBIN, SANDRA INMAN, MARK E. WENGER, GERALD GUTZEIT, PETER S. MCVITTIE, STAFFORD W. MOORE, JOHN LUCAS, EUGENE MARONEY, ROBERT JAYSON, RODNEY W. WILLIAMS, SR, LONNIE MICHAEL CURTIS, GARY GOELZ, DAVID P. BOHAN, CLIFFORD L. PINCKNEY, RUFUS C. DOWELL, GEORGE F. DRUMMOND, ALLEN F. FOSTER, EUGENE BRANDON, WANDA COLLINS-SMITH, BRIAN J. WANLESS, PATRICIA A. HILL, JAMES T. MILLER, CARL FIELDER, THOMAS KROHNER, RONALD M. PINSONEAULT, JOHN DAVENPORT, FRANKLIN P. HALL, RONALD D. ZARBAUGH, ANDREW ALAN ANDERSON, JAMES P. MCGUIRE, MICHAEL MACISCO, RUDOLPH MCCLINON, JR, CORNELL G. VANDERGRIFT, CHARLES E. CORRY, CHARMAIN A. HORVATH, GEORGE HUYE, RICHARD D. HILL, PAUL QUATTRONE, JANICE BOND, CHARLES S. JACKSON, DICK ROBERTS, TERRANCE DONOGHUE, DANNY HIGDON, MICHAEL DOHENY, CHARLES DENNIS ZYBURO, ROSLYN EISENSTARK, BARBARA D. WRIGHT, DENNIS Z. SMITH, MARY TURLEY, ARMANDO D. SOLER, AMY CHERRNAY, ROBERTA L. BRACHFELD, STANLEY SUWALA, HERBERT A. NEWMAN, LARRY D. FINLEY, RICHARD SAULLE, ROBERT E. KIMBLE, WILLIAM FLOOD, KAREN RYAN-WHITE, WANDA TATUM, RANDOLPH GOODWIN, JR, DENNIS R. DYKE, CAROL STEVENS, KELLY PATRICK MULLIGAN, LARRY JONES, PORTIA M. CHAMBLISS, EDWARD SWANSON, ROBERT G. BARZELAY, GARY L. BOCK, JOHN P. AELLEN, III, PAMELA MEYER, JANE ESCHRICH-WALSH, CHARLES R. BURNS, III, ARTHUR R. MILES, JR, JAMES DEPIZZO, JENNIFER LATHAM, GERALD L. FLORES, JAN HANSON, FRANCES WISNIEWSKI, MARZIANO P. RAGNONE, RONALD R. JONES, EUGENIA ANNINO STEGER, LINDA WOSHNER, DINAH MORGAN, ALBERT TURNER, BRUCE ENGERT, THOMAS R. DURAN, ROBERT FRANZ, LESLIE K. DAVIDSON, TERRY PAULK, GLEN MASON, DONALD YOUNG, MONTAGUE A. THOMAS, III, MILTON COBB, STEPHEN WAYNE PIGG, THOMAS STEIN, RONALD W. SMITH, BRUCE R. CRALLEY, JIMMY C. CHIN, JOHN STOUT, THOMAS ROBY, MARGARET DEAN, JANET LINDSAY, BARBARA OXNER, CARL ANGELL, SUSAN E. MESSINA, LORETTA CAUSEY HANNON, KATHLEEN KENNEY, DAVID ROMAN, STEPHEN THOENNES, MARILYN SWANSON, ROBERT MINTON, CELESTE M. SULLIVAN, CHARLES JOHNSON, PHILIP J. SARCONE, AMOS KUYKENDOLL, RICHARD F. COOK, BARRY WILSON, JOHN MALEK, DANIEL BOSSIO, WILLIAM D. GREENE, ROGER SEROLA, JOHN W. HEASLEY, WRIGHT B. TAYLOR, III, ANDREW BLANCHETTE, SCOTT A. MATTINGLY, FINDLEY WEST, RONALD F. EATON, MARTHA PARRY, JOSEPH J. VIOLA, SR, LARRY O. GENTRY, JAY CRYSTAL(AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF DIANE CRYSTAL), WALLACE BERRY, JOSEPH LEE, PHILIP D. FEISAL, CHARLES L. WILLIAMS, STAN RICKS, JODENE GARDNER, RICHARD PAUL NYDEGGER, RONALD R. EDWARDS, FRANK E. MILLER, JR, DOUGLAS SCHIFFMILLER, THOMAS PAUL ALLISON, ERIC A. FORD, GARY CALLAWAY, RICHARD MOORE, JAY BROKER, MARK L. DIVINCENZO, WOODROW SHELTON, JR, CLYDE WILLARD ALLEN, LAWRENCE J. CAPOUCH, THOMAS MCCALL, LEONARD SHAW, MARIA G. RESNICK, LAWRENCE J. SIMMS, DANIEL ANULARE.(sg, )
March 6, 2015 Summons Issued as to ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE, AGENTS PENSION PLAN, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, EDWARD M. LIDDY, THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 3/9/2015 (sg, )
February 27, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE, AGENTS PENSION PLAN, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, EDWARD M. LIDDY, THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 116890.), filed by ROBERT RUSSO, JAMES CIRILLO, JERREL L. MEAD, DWIGHT CHARLES BONDY, JOHN J. SANCHEZ, JIMMY D. HOCK, LINDA BEUCHER, SANDY K. FABRICATORE, JOHN F. MCKENZIE, JEAN MINAL, JOHN R. FORREST, STANLEY R. BINDER, RITA E. PINO, PHILLIP N. METCALFE, HAROLD E. DASKAM, JAMES W. LONGMAN, FAYE D. BROWN, MARIE SMITH, STEPHEN W. DELLAPINA, HAROLD BAKER, GARY L. BAUMGARDNER, JOSEPH ALLEY, RICK JAHNS, TIMOTHY JACKSON WATWOOD, FRANK L. PHILLIPS, JEFFREY TOBIN, LESTER BROWN, SR, JAMES HILLAN, MAXINE BACHICHA, GEORGE TWOHIG, BRENDA C. HAMMOND, SUSAN DRAPEAU, CASEY MCCOY, RUSSELL A. TAPIE, LARRY R. DYKSTRA, JAY CRYSTAL, RICHARD G. ALTIERI, DENNIS POWERS, SHERRY MCDONALD, RONALD WANEK, STEVE HOWELL, PATRICIA MARAZO, THOMAS C. BUSHEY, ROBERT F. BORTELL, JR, ROBERT HELSEL, SHEILA SANDERS, ROLAND BOISIS, CURTIS FARRAR, JOSEPH P. CONBOY, CHESTER NOWAK, SHARON E. LIBBRA, BRUCE W. CLOTFELTER, TIMOTHY L. SCHWARTZ, JAMES M. ZAHNER, LEANNE HINKLE, WALTER ORR, SAMUEL E. GILLETTE, JOE MONTANARO, FRIEDA MINGA, KAREN JUNEMAN, DORIS FIELDS, MARK C. COLLIER, JAMES CORNETT, HAROLD D. BERNSTEIN(AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF SANDI BERNSTEIN), SANDRA GUTHRIE, MICHAEL M. STERN, IRA CLOUD, JOHN ANTHONY DEVITO, CAROL E. LEBLANC, DARLENE HEINEN, JAMES MICHAEL WOOD, LINDA A. ANULARE, CHARLES TAYLOR, REECE JOHNSON, RICHARD K. ROSKOWE, SYLVIA E. MOSLEY, BRENT L. DANNER, KEN PHILBRICK, MICHAEL L. SANDERS, RICHARD ROSSELL, LOUIS VEAL, HAROLD D. BERNSTEIN, ROBERT KILLEEN, DEBORAH SORRELL-ULRICH, DAN P. HOURIHANE, JAMES A. BEARD, COLIN BENT, DARRELL NAMIE, JOYCE DOUGLAS, KATHERINE ADAMS-LOVE, TERRY GENE LIBBRA, CLETA VINING, DAVID ST. JOHN, MILFORD T. VAUGHT, JR, ROBERT POLLOCK, VALERY DORSHIMER, MARK CHASE, LEONARD YARBROUGH, JOHNNY A. PLEMONS, RONALD METZGER, KURT A. SUMMERS, THOMAS MCEVANS, III, LELAND JELINEK, MICHELLE TABLER, SHELDON F. SHEFF, CRAIG A. BOCK, CHRIS HARDESTY, VICTOR M. CATARISANO, WILLIAM LANDMARK, ORTON W. MESSENGER, DAVE BUSSELL, RICHARD DROE, GREGORY LANE, THOMAS W. MATYJASIK, JOHN MARSH, ROBERT A WRIGHT, JR, RICHARD CARTER, JEFFREY M. DOMBECK, MARCOS E. SAYAGO, FRANCIS HANRATTY, RICHARD A. BROWN, JOHN IAPOCE, GEORGIANA CALLAWAY, JAMES RAUEN, NEIL WHICKER, BARBARA ANN MINK, NEAL SWANK BROOKS, D. CRAIG MULLEN, JAMES L. BRACHFELD, DALE A. VILLEMAIN, LINDA REYNOLDS, RICHARD EIRICH, EDWARD M. SAAD, DEBORAH BECKER, RICHARD A. BROWNSON, ROSE ZUMWINKLE, RICHARD MASI, RICHARD C. BENNETT, ROBERT W. TELKINS, VERNON BENTLEY, WILLIAM F. ESTES, DANIEL T. PERRY, STEVEN MALLORY, GAIL C. SANTALUCIA-DALY, CHRISTIAN FARLEY, ARTHUR WASHINGTON, DAVID J. TUSKEY, FRANK M. PATTERSON, GERALD HEINEN, ROBERT G. SHEA, JR, GAIL ROGERS HIBBLER, JACK SANDERS, THOMAS ABELL, PAUL SVABEK, BRUCE WILLIAM ASHLEY, GARY THOMAS, MICHAEL J. BRANTMEIER, BRUCE LARRABEE, CONI HEIDLE, GERALD H. SCHIELE, SARAH ST. JOHN, ERNEST JACK DEMONTE, DOUGLAS A. SIMS, MARIA KRUMM, MICHAEL ECONOMOS, SHEILA FARMER, ERIC B. SIMS, JANET COOLEY, JAMES A. GRADY, ROBERT E. GARY, WALTER J. DUBIEL, DAVID N. KAPEC, JAMES E. LYNCH, JOSEPH FALCONI, III, RONALD C. HARRISON, JR, MANUEL ZUNIGA, JIM OVERMILLER, GAIL DICKMAN, RICHARD MORRISON EARL, JR, MONTELL BERRY, ANTHONY MCMURRAY, LARRY W. HICE, BOSS ROBERT FRIES, III, ROBIN WILSON, NICHOLAS S. MARINOS, ZACHARIAH M. DAVIDSON, III, WALKER WILLIAMS, THOMAS A. O'DELL, MICHAEL L. DAVIS, DONALD P. REIMER, JOHN MALLOY, MARY MENDOZA, DON C. CHRISTENSEN, JOHN HLOHINEC, DARRYL SHERMAN, DENNIS H. PORTER, CHINESTA SKIPPER SMITH, DAVID L. SEIDEL, JOSEPH TOMEC, RICHARD AURAND, JOHN DARWISH, WILLIAM L. BROWN, JR, MIKE SHOBE, JAMES LOUIS HEMPHILL, ALBERT J. CANNIZZARO, STEVEN EVANS, RALPH V. FAULK, DONALD STRIPLIN, LLOYD T. ROSENSTEEL, BLAIR QUASNITSCHKA, JACK J. CRAPARO, JR, RONALD J. RUBIN, SANDRA INMAN, MARK E. WENGER, GERALD GUTZEIT, PETER S. MCVITTIE, STAFFORD W. MOORE, JOHN LUCAS, EUGENE MARONEY, ROBERT JAYSON, RODNEY W. WILLIAMS, SR, LONNIE MICHAEL CURTIS, GARY GOELZ, DAVID P. BOHAN, CLIFFORD L. PINCKNEY, RUFUS C. DOWELL, GEORGE F. DRUMMOND, ALLEN F. FOSTER, EUGENE BRANDON, WANDA COLLINS-SMITH, BRIAN J. WANLESS, PATRICIA A. HILL, JAMES T. MILLER, CARL FIELDER, THOMAS KROHNER, RONALD M. PINSONEAULT, JOHN DAVENPORT, FRANKLIN P. HALL, RONALD D. ZARBAUGH, ANDREW ALAN ANDERSON, JAMES P. MCGUIRE, MICHAEL MACISCO, RUDOLPH MCCLINON, JR, CORNELL G. VANDERGRIFT, CHARLES E. CORRY, CHARMAIN A. HORVATH, GEORGE HUYE, RICHARD D. HILL, PAUL QUATTRONE, JANICE BOND, CHARLES S. JACKSON, DICK ROBERTS, TERRANCE DONOGHUE, DANNY HIGDON, MICHAEL DOHENY, CHARLES DENNIS ZYBURO, ROSLYN EISENSTARK, BARBARA D. WRIGHT, DENNIS Z. SMITH, MARY TURLEY, ARMANDO D. SOLER, AMY CHERRNAY, ROBERTA L. BRACHFELD, STANLEY SUWALA, HERBERT A. NEWMAN, LARRY D. FINLEY, RICHARD SAULLE, ROBERT E. KIMBLE, WILLIAM FLOOD, KAREN RYAN-WHITE, WANDA TATUM, RANDOLPH GOODWIN, JR, DENNIS R. DYKE, CAROL STEVENS, KELLY PATRICK MULLIGAN, LARRY JONES, PORTIA M. CHAMBLISS, EDWARD SWANSON, ROBERT G. BARZELAY, GARY L. BOCK, JOHN P. AELLEN, III, PAMELA MEYER, JANE ESCHRICH-WALSH, CHARLES R. BURNS, III, ARTHUR R. MILES, JR, JAMES DEPIZZO, JENNIFER LATHAM, GERALD L. FLORES, JAN HANSON, FRANCES WISNIEWSKI, MARZIANO P. RAGNONE, RONALD R. JONES, EUGENIA ANNINO STEGER, LINDA WOSHNER, DINAH MORGAN, ALBERT TURNER, BRUCE ENGERT, THOMAS R. DURAN, ROBERT FRANZ, LESLIE K. DAVIDSON, TERRY PAULK, GLEN MASON, DONALD YOUNG, MONTAGUE A. THOMAS, III, MILTON COBB, STEPHEN WAYNE PIGG, THOMAS STEIN, RONALD W. SMITH, BRUCE R. CRALLEY, JIMMY C. CHIN, JOHN STOUT, THOMAS ROBY, MARGARET DEAN, JANET LINDSAY, BARBARA OXNER, CARL ANGELL, SUSAN E. MESSINA, LORETTA CAUSEY HANNON, KATHLEEN KENNEY, DAVID ROMAN, STEPHEN THOENNES, MARILYN SWANSON, ROBERT MINTON, CELESTE M. SULLIVAN, CHARLES JOHNSON, PHILIP J. SARCONE, AMOS KUYKENDOLL, RICHARD F. COOK, BARRY WILSON, JOHN MALEK, DANIEL BOSSIO, WILLIAM D. GREENE, ROGER SEROLA, JOHN W. HEASLEY, WRIGHT B. TAYLOR, III, ANDREW BLANCHETTE, SCOTT A. MATTINGLY, FINDLEY WEST, RONALD F. EATON, MARTHA PARRY, JOSEPH J. VIOLA, SR, LARRY O. GENTRY, JAY CRYSTAL(AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF DIANE CRYSTAL), WALLACE BERRY, JOSEPH LEE, PHILIP D. FEISAL, CHARLES L. WILLIAMS, STAN RICKS, JODENE GARDNER, RICHARD PAUL NYDEGGER, RONALD R. EDWARDS, FRANK E. MILLER, JR, DOUGLAS SCHIFFMILLER, THOMAS PAUL ALLISON, ERIC A. FORD, GARY CALLAWAY, RICHARD MOORE, JAY BROKER, MARK L. DIVINCENZO, WOODROW SHELTON, JR, CLYDE WILLARD ALLEN, LAWRENCE J. CAPOUCH, THOMAS MCCALL, LEONARD SHAW, MARIA G. RESNICK, LAWRENCE J. SIMMS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(pod, )
February 27, 2015 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by THOMAS ABELL, KATHERINE ADAMS-LOVE, JOHN P. AELLEN, III, CLYDE WILLARD ALLEN, JOSEPH ALLEY, THOMAS PAUL ALLISON, RICHARD G. ALTIERI, ANDREW ALAN ANDERSON, CARL ANGELL, EUGENIA ANNINO STEGER, LINDA A. ANULARE, BRUCE WILLIAM ASHLEY, RICHARD AURAND, MAXINE BACHICHA, HAROLD BAKER, ROBERT G. BARZELAY, GARY L. BAUMGARDNER, JAMES A. BEARD, DEBORAH BECKER, RICHARD C. BENNETT, COLIN BENT, VERNON BENTLEY, HAROLD D. BERNSTEIN(AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF SANDI BERNSTEIN), HAROLD D. BERNSTEIN, MONTELL BERRY, WALLACE BERRY, LINDA BEUCHER, STANLEY R. BINDER, ANDREW BLANCHETTE, CRAIG A. BOCK, GARY L. BOCK, DAVID P. BOHAN, ROLAND BOISIS, JANICE BOND, DWIGHT CHARLES BONDY, ROBERT F. BORTELL, JR, DANIEL BOSSIO, JAMES L. BRACHFELD, ROBERTA L. BRACHFELD, EUGENE BRANDON, MICHAEL J. BRANTMEIER, JAY BROKER, NEAL SWANK BROOKS, FAYE D. BROWN, LESTER BROWN, SR, RICHARD A. BROWN, WILLIAM L. BROWN, JR, RICHARD A. BROWNSON, CHARLES R. BURNS, III, THOMAS C. BUSHEY, DAVE BUSSELL, GARY CALLAWAY, GEORGIANA CALLAWAY, ALBERT J. CANNIZZARO, LAWRENCE J. CAPOUCH, RICHARD CARTER, VICTOR M. CATARISANO, PORTIA M. CHAMBLISS, MARK CHASE, AMY CHERRNAY, JIMMY C. CHIN, DON C. CHRISTENSEN, JAMES CIRILLO, BRUCE W. CLOTFELTER, IRA CLOUD, MILTON COBB, MARK C. COLLIER, WANDA COLLINS-SMITH, JOSEPH P. CONBOY, RICHARD F. COOK, JANET COOLEY, JAMES CORNETT, CHARLES E. CORRY, BRUCE R. CRALLEY, JACK J. CRAPARO, JR, JAY CRYSTAL, JAY CRYSTAL(AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF DIANE CRYSTAL), LONNIE MICHAEL CURTIS, BRENT L. DANNER, JOHN DARWISH, HAROLD E. DASKAM, JOHN DAVENPORT, LESLIE K. DAVIDSON, ZACHARIAH M. DAVIDSON, III, MICHAEL L. DAVIS, MARGARET DEAN, STEPHEN W. DELLAPINA, ERNEST JACK DEMONTE, JAMES DEPIZZO, JOHN ANTHONY DEVITO, GAIL DICKMAN, MARK L. DIVINCENZO, MICHAEL DOHENY, JEFFREY M. DOMBECK, TERRANCE DONOGHUE, VALERY DORSHIMER, JOYCE DOUGLAS, RUFUS C. DOWELL, SUSAN DRAPEAU, RICHARD DROE, GEORGE F. DRUMMOND, WALTER J. DUBIEL, THOMAS R. DURAN, DENNIS R. DYKE, LARRY R. DYKSTRA, RICHARD MORRISON EARL, JR, RONALD F. EATON, MICHAEL ECONOMOS, RONALD R. EDWARDS, RICHARD EIRICH, ROSLYN EISENSTARK, BRUCE ENGERT, JANE ESCHRICH-WALSH, WILLIAM F. ESTES, STEVEN EVANS, SANDY K. FABRICATORE, JOSEPH FALCONI, III, CHRISTIAN FARLEY, SHEILA FARMER, CURTIS FARRAR, RALPH V. FAULK, PHILIP D. FEISAL, CARL FIELDER, DORIS FIELDS, LARRY D. FINLEY, WILLIAM FLOOD, GERALD L. FLORES, ERIC A. FORD, JOHN R. FORREST, ALLEN F. FOSTER, ROBERT FRANZ, BOSS ROBERT FRIES, III, JODENE GARDNER, ROBERT E. GARY, LARRY O. GENTRY, SAMUEL E. GILLETTE, GARY GOELZ, RANDOLPH GOODWIN, JR, JAMES A. GRADY, WILLIAM D. GREENE, SANDRA GUTHRIE, GERALD GUTZEIT, FRANKLIN P. HALL, BRENDA C. HAMMOND, LORETTA CAUSEY HANNON, FRANCIS HANRATTY, JAN HANSON, CHRIS HARDESTY, RONALD C. HARRISON, JR, JOHN W. HEASLEY, CONI HEIDLE, DARLENE HEINEN, GERALD HEINEN, ROBERT HELSEL, JAMES LOUIS HEMPHILL, GAIL ROGERS HIBBLER, LARRY W. HICE, DANNY HIGDON, PATRICIA A. HILL, RICHARD D. HILL, JAMES HILLAN, LEANNE HINKLE, JOHN HLOHINEC, JIMMY D. HOCK, CHARMAIN A. HORVATH, DAN P. HOURIHANE, STEVE HOWELL, GEORGE HUYE, JOHN IAPOCE, SANDRA INMAN, CHARLES S. JACKSON, RICK JAHNS, ROBERT JAYSON, LELAND JELINEK, CHARLES JOHNSON, REECE JOHNSON, LARRY JONES, RONALD R. JONES, KAREN JUNEMAN, DAVID N. KAPEC, KATHLEEN KENNEY, ROBERT KILLEEN, ROBERT E. KIMBLE, THOMAS KROHNER, MARIA KRUMM, AMOS KUYKENDOLL, WILLIAM LANDMARK, GREGORY LANE, BRUCE LARRABEE, JENNIFER LATHAM, CAROL E. LEBLANC, JOSEPH LEE, SHARON E. LIBBRA, TERRY GENE LIBBRA, JANET LINDSAY, JAMES W. LONGMAN, JOHN LUCAS, JAMES E. LYNCH, MICHAEL MACISCO, JOHN MALEK, STEVEN MALLORY, JOHN MALLOY, PATRICIA MARAZO, NICHOLAS S. MARINOS, EUGENE MARONEY, JOHN MARSH, RICHARD MASI, GLEN MASON, SCOTT A. MATTINGLY, THOMAS W. MATYJASIK, THOMAS MCCALL, RUDOLPH MCCLINON, JR, CASEY MCCOY, SHERRY MCDONALD, THOMAS MCEVANS, III, JAMES P. MCGUIRE, JOHN F. MCKENZIE, ANTHONY MCMURRAY, PETER S. MCVITTIE, JERREL L. MEAD, MARY MENDOZA, ORTON W. MESSENGER, SUSAN E. MESSINA, PHILLIP N. METCALFE, RONALD METZGER, PAMELA MEYER, ARTHUR R. MILES, JR, FRANK E. MILLER, JR, JAMES T. MILLER, JEAN MINAL, FRIEDA MINGA, BARBARA ANN MINK, ROBERT MINTON, JOE MONTANARO, RICHARD MOORE, STAFFORD W. MOORE, DINAH MORGAN, SYLVIA E. MOSLEY, D. CRAIG MULLEN, KELLY PATRICK MULLIGAN, DARRELL NAMIE, HERBERT A. NEWMAN, CHESTER NOWAK, RICHARD PAUL NYDEGGER, THOMAS A. O'DELL, WALTER ORR, JIM OVERMILLER, BARBARA OXNER, MARTHA PARRY, FRANK M. PATTERSON, TERRY PAULK, DANIEL T. PERRY, KEN PHILBRICK, FRANK L. PHILLIPS, STEPHEN WAYNE PIGG, CLIFFORD L. PINCKNEY, RITA E. PINO, RONALD M. PINSONEAULT, JOHNNY A. PLEMONS, ROBERT POLLOCK, DENNIS H. PORTER, DENNIS POWERS, BLAIR QUASNITSCHKA, PAUL QUATTRONE, MARZIANO P. RAGNONE, JAMES RAUEN, DONALD P. REIMER, MARIA G. RESNICK, LINDA REYNOLDS, STAN RICKS, DICK ROBERTS, THOMAS ROBY, DAVID ROMAN, LLOYD T. ROSENSTEEL, RICHARD K. ROSKOWE, RICHARD ROSSELL, RONALD J. RUBIN, ROBERT RUSSO, KAREN RYAN-WHITE, EDWARD M. SAAD, JOHN J. SANCHEZ, JACK SANDERS, MICHAEL L. SANDERS, SHEILA SANDERS, GAIL C. SANTALUCIA-DALY, PHILIP J. SARCONE, RICHARD SAULLE, MARCOS E. SAYAGO, GERALD H. SCHIELE, DOUGLAS SCHIFFMILLER, TIMOTHY L. SCHWARTZ, DAVID L. SEIDEL, ROGER SEROLA, LEONARD SHAW, ROBERT G. SHEA, JR, SHELDON F. SHEFF, WOODROW SHELTON, JR, DARRYL SHERMAN, MIKE SHOBE, LAWRENCE J. SIMMS, DOUGLAS A. SIMS, ERIC B. SIMS, CHINESTA SKIPPER SMITH, DENNIS Z. SMITH, MARIE SMITH, RONALD W. SMITH, ARMANDO D. SOLER, DEBORAH SORRELL-ULRICH, DAVID ST. JOHN, SARAH ST. JOHN, THOMAS STEIN, MICHAEL M. STERN, CAROL STEVENS, JOHN STOUT, DONALD STRIPLIN, CELESTE M. SULLIVAN, KURT A. SUMMERS, STANLEY SUWALA, PAUL SVABEK, EDWARD SWANSON, MARILYN SWANSON, MICHELLE TABLER, RUSSELL A. TAPIE, WANDA TATUM, CHARLES TAYLOR, WRIGHT B. TAYLOR, III, ROBERT W. TELKINS, STEPHEN THOENNES, GARY THOMAS, MONTAGUE A. THOMAS, III, JEFFREY TOBIN, JOSEPH TOMEC, MARY TURLEY, ALBERT TURNER, DAVID J. TUSKEY, GEORGE TWOHIG, CORNELL G. VANDERGRIFT, MILFORD T. VAUGHT, JR, LOUIS VEAL, DALE A. VILLEMAIN, CLETA VINING, JOSEPH J. VIOLA, SR, RONALD WANEK, BRIAN J. WANLESS, ARTHUR WASHINGTON, TIMOTHY JACKSON WATWOOD, MARK E. WENGER, FINDLEY WEST, NEIL WHICKER, CHARLES L. WILLIAMS, RODNEY W. WILLIAMS, SR, WALKER WILLIAMS, BARRY WILSON, ROBIN WILSON, FRANCES WISNIEWSKI, JAMES MICHAEL WOOD, LINDA WOSHNER, BARBARA D. WRIGHT, ROBERT A WRIGHT, JR, LEONARD YARBROUGH, DONALD YOUNG, JAMES M. ZAHNER, RONALD D. ZARBAUGH, ROSE ZUMWINKLE, MANUEL ZUNIGA, CHARLES DENNIS ZYBURO. (pod, )
February 27, 2015 Summons Issued as to ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE, AGENTS PENSION PLAN, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, EDWARD M. LIDDY, THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION. Five given To: Counsel on 3/2/15 (pod, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABELL v. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS ABELL
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHARINE ADAMS-LOVE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN P. AELLEN, III
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLYDE WILLARD ALLEN
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH ALLEY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS PAUL ALLISON
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD G. ALTIERI
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW ALAN ANDERSON
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL ANGELL
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA A. ANULARE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE WILLIAM ASHLEY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD AURAND
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAXINE BACHICHA
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD BAKER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT G. BARZELAY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY L. BAUMGARDNER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES A. BEARD
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH BECKER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD C. BENNETT
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLIN BENT
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERNON BENTLEY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD D. BERNSTEIN
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTELL BERRY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALLACE BERRY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA BEUCHER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANLEY R. BINDER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW BLANCHETTE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG A. BOCK
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY L. BOCK
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID P. BOHAN
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROLAND BOISIS
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANICE BOND
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DWIGHT CHARLES BONDY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT F. BORTELL, JR.
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL BOSSIO
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES L. BRACHFELD
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERTA L. BRACHFELD
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EUGENE BRANDON
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL J. BRANTMEIER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAY BROKER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEAL SWANK BROOKS
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAYE D. BROWN
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD A. BROWN
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESTER BROWN, SR.
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM L. BROWN, JR.
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD A. BROWNSON
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES R. BURNS, III
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS C. BUSHEY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVE BUSSELL
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY CALLAWAY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGIANA CALLAWAY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERT J. CANNIZZARO
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE J. CAPOUCH
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD CARTER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTOR M. CATARISANO
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PORTIA M. CHAMBLISS
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK CHASE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY CHERRNAY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIMMY C. CHIN
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DON C. CHRISTENSEN
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES CIRILLO
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE W. CLOTFELTER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRA CLOUD
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILTON COBB
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK C. COLLIER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WANDA COLLINS-SMITH
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH P. CONBOY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD F. COOK
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET COOLEY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES CORNETT
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES E. CORRY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE R. CRALLEY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACK J. CRAPARO, JR.
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAY CRYSTAL
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LONNIE MICHAEL CURTIS
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENT L. DANNER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DARWISH
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD E. DASKAM
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DAVENPORT
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESLIE K. DAVIDSON
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZACHARIAH M. DAVIDSON, III
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL L. DAVIS
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET DEAN
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN W. DELLAPINA
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNEST JACK DEMONTE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES DEPIZZO
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN ANTHONY DEVITO
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAIL DICKMAN
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK L. DIVINCENZO
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DOHENY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY M. DOMBECK
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRANCE DONOGHUE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALERY DORSHIMER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOYCE DOUGLAS
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUFUS C. DOWELL
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN DRAPEAU
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD DROE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE F. DRUMMOND
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALTER J. DUBIEL
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS R. DURAN
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS R. DYKE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY R. DYKSTRA
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD MORRISON EARL, JR.
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD F. EATON
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ECONOMOS
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD R. EDWARDS
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD EIRICH
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSLYN EISENSTARK
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE ENGERT
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE ESCHRICH-WALSH
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM F. ESTES
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN EVANS
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDY K. FABRICATORE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH FALCONI, III
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTIAN FARLEY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEILA FARMER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS FARRAR
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RALPH V. FAULK
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIP D. FEISAL
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL FIELDER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DORIS FIELDS
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY D. FINLEY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM FLOOD
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD L. FLORES
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC A. FORD
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN R. FORREST
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEN F. FOSTER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT FRANZ
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOSS ROBERT FRIES, III
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JODENE GARDNER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT E. GARY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY O. GENTRY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL E. GILLETTE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY GOELZ
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EUGENIA ANNINO STEGER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDOLPH GOODWIN, JR.
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES A. GRADY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM D. GREENE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA GUTHRIE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD GUTZEIT
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANKLIN P. HALL
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA C. HAMMOND
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORETTA CAUSEY HANNON
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCIS HANRATTY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAN HANSON
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRIS HARDESTY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD C. HARRISON, JR
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN W. HEASLEY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONI HEIDLE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARLENE HEINEN
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD HEINEN
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT HELSEL
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES LOUIS HEMPHILL
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAIL ROGERS HIBBLER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY W. HICE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANNY HIGDON
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA A. HILL
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD D. HILL
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES HILLAN
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEANNE HINKLE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN HLOHINEC
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIMMY D. HOCK
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARMAIN A. HORVATH
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAN P. HOURIHANE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVE HOWELL
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE HUYE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN IAPOCE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA INMAN
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES S. JACKSON
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICK JAHNS
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT JAYSON
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LELAND JELINEK
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES JOHNSON
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REECE JOHNSON
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY JONES
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD R. JONES
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN JUNEMAN
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID N. KAPEC
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN KENNEY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT KILLEEN
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT E. KIMBLE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS KROHNER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA KRUMM
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMOS KUYKENDOLL
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM LANDMARK
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY LANE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE LARRABEE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER LATHAM
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL E. LEBLANC
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH LEE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON E. LIBBRA
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRY GENE LIBBRA
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET LINDSAY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES W. LONGMAN
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN LUCAS
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES E. LYNCH
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MACISCO
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MALEK
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN MALLORY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MALLOY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA MARAZO
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS S. MARINOS
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EUGENE MARONEY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MARSH
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD MASI
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLEN MASON
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT A. MATTINGLY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS W. MATYJASIK
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS MCCALL
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUDOLPH MCCLINON, JR.
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASEY MCCOY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRY MCDONALD
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS MCEVANS, III
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES P. MCGUIRE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN F. MCKENZIE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY MCMURRAY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER S. MCVITTIE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERREL L. MEAD
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY MENDOZA
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORTON W. MESSENGER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN E. MESSINA
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILLIP N. METCALFE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD METZGER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA MEYER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTHUR R. MILES, JR.
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES T. MILLER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK E. MILLER, JR.
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEAN MINAL
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRIEDA MINGA
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA ANN MINK
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT MINTON
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE MONTANARO
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD MOORE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STAFFORD W. MOORE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DINAH MORGAN
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYLVIA E. MOSLEY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. CRAIG MULLEN
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLY PATRICK MULLIGAN
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARRELL NAMIE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERBERT A. NEWMAN
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHESTER NOWAK
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD PAUL NYDEGGER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS A. O'DELL
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALTER ORR
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIM OVERMILLER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA OXNER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTHA PARRY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK M. PATTERSON
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRY PAULK
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL T. PERRY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEN PHILBRICK
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK L. PHILLIPS
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN WAYNE PIGG
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLIFFORD L. PINCKNEY
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RITA E. PINO
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD M. PINSONEAULT
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNNY A. PLEMONS
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT POLLOCK
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS H. PORTER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS POWERS
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLAIR QUASNITSCHKA
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL QUATTRONE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARZIANO P. RAGNONE
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES RAUEN
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD P. REIMER
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA G. RESNICK
Represented By: COLEEN M. MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]