TARGET GLOBAL LOGISTICS SERVICES, CO. v. KVG, LLC
Plaintiff: TARGET GLOBAL LOGISTICS SERVICES, CO.
Defendant: KVG, LLC
Case Number: 5:2015cv04960
Filed: September 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Allentown Office
County: Outside the U.S.
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F. LEESON
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF TARGET GLOBAL LOGISTICS SERVICES, CO. AND AGAINST KVG, LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF SEVEN HUNDRED AND FIFTY-FIVE THOUSAND, NINE HUNDRED AND TEN DOLLARS AND THIRTY-EIGHT CENTS ($755,910.38), PLUS APPLICABLE INTEREST. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 11/29/18. 11/29/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, )
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 207 OPINION/ORDER THAT THE RENEWED MOTION FOR SECURITY IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 5/15/18. 5/15/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED. (ky, )
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO AMEND (DKT. NO. 174 ) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 5/2/18. 5/2/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(mas, )
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 OPINION/ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO JOIN TARGET GLOBAL LOGISTICS FZE, JAMSHID, AND MOHAMMAD MIRWAIS IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 11/22/17. 11/22/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(ky, )
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 OPINION/ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 4/12/17. 4/13/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED. (ky, )
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION, ECF NO. 6, IS GRANTED IN PART AS FOLLOWS: 1. PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR CONVERSION IS DISMISSED; 2. NO LATER THAN 12/9/15, PLIANTIFF SHALL FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT THAT SETS FORTH THE CORRECT NAME OF THIS COURT IN THE CAPTION; AND 3. PLAINTIFF'S SERVICE OF PROCESS, ECF NO. 3, IS QUASHED; AND 4. IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS, DEFENDANT'S MOTION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 12/2/15. 12/3/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TARGET GLOBAL LOGISTICS SERVICES, CO. v. KVG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TARGET GLOBAL LOGISTICS SERVICES, CO.
Represented By: FRANK J. SANTOMAURO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVG, LLC
Represented By: FREDERICK W. GUNDLACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?