BRAND ENERGY & INFRASTRUCTURE SERVICES, INC. et al v. IREX CONTRACTING GROUP et al
Plaintiff: BRAND ENERGY & INFRASTRUCTURE SERVICES, INC. and BRAND ENERGY SERVICES, LLC
Defendant: IREX CONTRACTING GROUP, VERTICAL ACCESS SOLUTIONS, LLC, PRIME INDUSTRIAL ACCESS, LLC, ROBERT RUSSO, ALBERT ROWE, CHRISTOPHER ALTMEYER, JOHN KWIATKOSKI, TERRY SHRIVER, JOSEPH D'ULISSE, DAVID CROW, LESLIE JOHNSON, CATHY WALLS, JEFFREY MAUPIN and DENVER KEENE
Case Number: 5:2016cv02499
Filed: May 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Allentown Office
County: Lancaster
Presiding Judge: LAWRENCE F. STENGEL
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER THAT BY 7/8/2018 IREX SHALL ALLOW BRAND ACCESS TO THE 2,070 EMAILS AND USER-GENERATED FILED IT CONTENDS ARE DUPLICATES OF PREVIOUSLY PROVIDED FILES. ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 6/28/2018. 6/28/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXHIBITS IS GRANTED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 3/2/2018. 3/2/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO BRAND'S FIFTH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 2/7/2018. 2/9/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S JANUARY 2, 2018 ORDER, THE RESPONSE THERETO, AND FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 1/30/18. 1/30/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED. IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS, THE MOTION DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORAL ARGUMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, LEAVE TO SUBMIT AN AFFIDAVIT FROM THEIR ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY CONTRACTOR IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 1/2/18. 1/3/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF ADDITIONAL FINANCIAL INFORMATION (DOC. 256 ) IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MARK THE RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION OF JASON DOOD COMPLETE (DOC. 255 ) IS DENIED. ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 12/21/2017. 12/21/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO QUASH A SUBPOENA, THE RESPONSE AND ROBER RUSSO'S LETER IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 11/3/17. 11/6/17 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 10/2/2017. 10/3/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER THAT THER REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION REAGRDINGS PLAINTIFFS MTOION TO MODIFY/CLARIFY THE PROTECTIVE ORDER (DOC. 129 ) IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE (DOC. 123 ) IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S LETTER REQUEST FOR ORAL AR GUEMENT (DOC. 127 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT. THE DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (DOC. 148 ) ARE OVERRULED. PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS (DOC. 164 ) IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO MODIFY/CLARIF Y THE PROTECTIVE ORDER (DOC. 111 ) IS GRANTED AND PARAGRAPH 16(c) SHALL BE STRICKEN FROM THE PROTECTIVE ORDER. PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (DOC. 189 ) ARE OVERRULED. THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING SEARCH TERMS (DOC. 180 ) IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEAL (DOC. 173 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 7/6/2017. 7/7/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. 72 ) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 3/23/2017. 3/24/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (DOC. 43 ) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 10/31/2016. 11/1/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRAND ENERGY & INFRASTRUCTURE SERVICES, INC. et al v. IREX CONTRACTING GROUP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRAND ENERGY & INFRASTRUCTURE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: CASEY A. COYLE
Represented By: BRIDGET E. MONTGOMERY
Represented By: KATHERINE RIGGLEMAN-THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRAND ENERGY SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: CASEY A. COYLE
Represented By: BRIDGET E. MONTGOMERY
Represented By: KATHERINE RIGGLEMAN-THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IREX CONTRACTING GROUP
Represented By: ALEXANDER L. HARRIS
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HINO
Represented By: SUSAN K. LESSACK
Represented By: SEAN MCDEVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERTICAL ACCESS SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: ALEXANDER L. HARRIS
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HINO
Represented By: SUSAN K. LESSACK
Represented By: SEAN MCDEVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIME INDUSTRIAL ACCESS, LLC
Represented By: ALEXANDER L. HARRIS
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HINO
Represented By: SUSAN K. LESSACK
Represented By: SEAN MCDEVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT RUSSO
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERT ROWE
Represented By: ALEXANDER L. HARRIS
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HINO
Represented By: SUSAN K. LESSACK
Represented By: SEAN MCDEVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER ALTMEYER
Represented By: ALEXANDER L. HARRIS
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HINO
Represented By: SUSAN K. LESSACK
Represented By: SEAN MCDEVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN KWIATKOSKI
Represented By: ALEXANDER L. HARRIS
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HINO
Represented By: SUSAN K. LESSACK
Represented By: SEAN MCDEVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRY SHRIVER
Represented By: ALEXANDER L. HARRIS
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HINO
Represented By: SUSAN K. LESSACK
Represented By: SEAN MCDEVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH D'ULISSE
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HINO
Represented By: KEVAN FRANCIS HIRSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID CROW
Represented By: ALEXANDER L. HARRIS
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HINO
Represented By: SUSAN K. LESSACK
Represented By: SEAN MCDEVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LESLIE JOHNSON
Represented By: ALEXANDER L. HARRIS
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HINO
Represented By: SUSAN K. LESSACK
Represented By: SEAN MCDEVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHY WALLS
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY MAUPIN
Represented By: ALEXANDER L. HARRIS
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HINO
Represented By: SUSAN K. LESSACK
Represented By: SEAN MCDEVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENVER KEENE
Represented By: ALEXANDER L. HARRIS
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HINO
Represented By: SUSAN K. LESSACK
Represented By: SEAN MCDEVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?