KRANTZ v. PEERLESS INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: DAVID A. KRANTZ
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP, OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY and PEERLESS INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2018cv03450
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Allentown Office
County: Lancaster
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Bad Faith Claim and Strike References to Unfair Insurance Practices Act filed by PEERLESS INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (ALFORD, BRIGID)
September 5, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Bad Faith Claim and Strike References to Unfair Insurance Practices Act filed by DAVID A. KRANTZ. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)(FLOYD, THOMAS)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND JOINT STIPULATION THAT OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AND LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP ARE HEREBY DISMISSED AS DEFENDANTS FROM THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WITH PREJUDICE. PARAGRAPHS 3 AND 4 ARE HEREBY STRICKEN. THE CASE CAPTION IS HEREBY AMENDED, DELETING THE NAMES OF OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY t/d/b/a LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE AND LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP AS DEFENDANTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 8/23/18. 8/23/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ky, )
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Bad Faith Claim and Strike References to Unfair Insurance Practices Act filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP, OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PEERLESS INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY.Brief in Support, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Brief)(ALFORD, BRIGID)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation of the Parties to Dismiss Two Named Defendants and to Strike Paragraphs 3 and 4 from Complaint by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP, OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PEERLESS INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ALFORD, BRIGID) Modified on 8/27/2018 (lvj, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARD TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER THAT GOVERNS THE CASE AND CONTAINS RULES OF PRACTICE THAT MUST BE FOLLOWED IN ADDITION TO THIS DISTRICT'S LOCAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 8/17/18. 8/17/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ky, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP INC., Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent LMHC MASSACHUSETTS HOLDINGS INC., Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL AGENCY CORPORATION, Corporate Parent LIBERTY-USA CORPORATION, Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL HOLDING COMPANY INC., Corporate Parent PEERLESS INSURANCE COMPANY for PEERLESS INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, by PEERLESS INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY.(amas)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH AFFIDAVIT AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP, OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PEERLESS INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY from LANCASTER COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, case number CI-17-05202. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 183165) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KRANTZ v. PEERLESS INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP
Represented By: BRIGID QUINN ALFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: BRIGID QUINN ALFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEERLESS INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: BRIGID QUINN ALFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID A. KRANTZ
Represented By: THOMAS J. FLOYD, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?