GILL v. STROUSE et al

Plaintiff: MELISSA M. GILL
Defendant: ANNETTE STROUSE, JOSEPH EUGENE NAGY and LYNN A. STROUSE
Counter Defendant: JAMES DODD-O, THOMAS, THOMAS & HAFER, LLP, MICHAEL BISHOP and GREGORY KUNKLE
Case Number: 5:2018cv03490
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 Amended NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, by JOSEPH EUGENE NAGY. IFP Previously Granted Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk and (DT) Modified on 10/5/2018 (dt, ).
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #5 Notice of Appeal filed by JOSEPH EUGENE NAGY. USCA Case Number 18-3148 (dmc, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL by JOSEPH EUGENE NAGY. IFP GRANTED Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk. Copy of TPO form sent to pro se defendant. (DT) Modified on 9/26/2018 (dt, ).
September 17, 2018 Certified Copy of Order, dated 8/27/2018, along with docket entries, mailed to the Court of Common Pleas of Northampton County on 9/17/2018. (md)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT NAGY IS GRANTED LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE NOTICES OF REMOVAL ARE DEEMED FILED. CIVIL ACTION NUMBER 18-3490 IS REMOVED TO THE NORTHAMPTON COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). WITHIN THIRTY DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, NAGY MAY FILE AN AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL IN CIVIL ACTION NUMBER 18-3481, ETC. IF NAGY FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, CIVIL ACTION NUMBER 18-3481 WILL BE REMANDED TO THE NORTHAMPTON COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/24/18. 8/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE'. (REF. 18-3481)(ky, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ky, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS BY JOSEPH EUGENE NAGY (ky)Modified on 8/23/2018 (lvj, ).
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOSEPH EUGENE NAGY from NORTHAMPTON COUNTY, case number C-48-CV-2017-9597. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ky, ) Modified on 8/23/2018 (lvj, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GILL v. STROUSE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNETTE STROUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH EUGENE NAGY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYNN A. STROUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: JAMES DODD-O
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: THOMAS, THOMAS & HAFER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: MICHAEL BISHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: GREGORY KUNKLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA M. GILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?