KENNEDY v. GETZ, et al
Plaintiff: EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY
Defendant: ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF THE PENNSYLVANIA COURTS, MALACHY EDWARD MANNION, PHILIP CARL PETRUS, RICHARD H. D'AMBROSIA, THE UNIFIED JUDICIAL SYSTEM OF PENNSYLVANIA, PENNSYLVANIA BAR ASSOCIATION, RICHARD CHARLES CLINK, WILLIAM I. ARBUCKLE, THOMAS B. DARR, PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE, BRADLEY J. GETZ, THOMAS G. SAYLOR and ROBERT EVANCHICK
Case Number: 5:2018cv03532
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 14 JUDICIAL NOTICE by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY, FINDINGS OF FACT, WRIT OF ERROR. (er, )
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to #9 Notice of Appeal filed by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY: WITHIN 21 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF FILING OF THIS ORDER, THE PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO RESPOND AS TO WHETHER THIS APPEAL SHOULD BE DISMISSED OR TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE THIRD CIRCUIT. THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS STAYED. (va, ) Modified on 10/2/2018 (md).
September 14, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re #9 Notice of Appeal filed by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY. USCA Case Number 18-2368. (va, ) Modified on 10/2/2018 (md).
September 5, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #9 Notice of Appeal filed by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY. USCA Case Number 18-2949 (dmc, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 10 OBJECTION TO ORDER - Hearing Requested by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY, Certificate of Service. (er, )
August 31, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of Appeals as to #6 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion) by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY. IFP GRANTED. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(DT) Modified on 9/4/2018 (DT).
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 (FILED IN ERROR, DUPLICATE)OPINION/ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED A MALICIOUS AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM. KENNEDY MAY NOT FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THIS MATTER. THE COURT PLACED KENNEDY ON NOTICE THAT FILING ANOTHER NEW CASE REGARDING THE EVENTS OF JUNE 2, 2017, AUGUST 28, 2017, AS WELL AS HIS INCARCERATION FROM AUGUST 28-30, 2017, MAY RESULT IN RESTRICTION OF HIS FILING PRIVILEGES. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/27/18. 8/28/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE'. (ky, ) (FILED IN ERROR AS DUPLICATIVE) Modified on 8/29/2018 (dt, ). Modified on 8/29/2018 (ky, ).
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 (FILED IN ERROR, DUPLICATE) MEMORANDUM/OPINION THAT THE COURT WILL GRANT KENNEDY LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DISMISS HIS COMPLAINT AS MALICIOUS. IF KENNEDY SEEKS TO CLARIFY OR AMEND HIS CLAIMS REGARDING THE EVENTS OF JUNE 2, 2017, AUGUST 28, 2017, AND HIS INCARCERATION FROM AUGUST 28-30, 2017, HE MUST DO SO IN CIVIL ACTION NO. 18-977. IN LIGHT OF KENNEDY'S FILING HISTORY, THE COURT WILL PLACE HIM ON NOTICE THAT FILING ANOTHER NEW CASE REGARDING THESE SAME EVENTS MAY RESULT IN RESTRICTION OF HIS FILING PRIVILEGES. KENNEDY WILL NOT BE PERMITTED TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THIS MATTER. AN APPROPRIATE ORDER FOLLOWS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/27/18. (FILED IN ERROR AS DUPLICATIVE) 8/28/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE'. ( ky, ) Modified on 8/29/2018 (dt, ). Modified on 8/29/2018 (ky, ).
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF 8/27/2018 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (ECF NO. 1) AND HIS PRO SE COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 2), IT IS ORDERED THAT: LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED AS MALICIOUS AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH THE IN COURT'S MEMORANDUM. KENNEDY MAY NOT FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THIS MATTER. THE COURT PLACES KENNEDY ON NOTICE THAT FILING ANOTHER NEW CASE REGARDING THE EVENTS OF JUNE 2, 2017, AUGUST 28, 2017, AS WELL AS HIS INCARCERATION FROM AUGUST 28-30, 2017, MAY RESULT IN RESTRICTION OF HIS FILING PRIVILEGES. SEE ABDUL-AKBAR V. WATSON 901 F.3d 329,333 (3d CIR. 1990). THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. 8/28/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF. (DT)
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF 8/27/2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. 08/28/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINITFF.(DT) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/29/2018) (dt, ).
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 Letter dated 8/22/2018 from Edward Thomas Kennedy to The Honorable Jeffrey L. Schmehl. Re: Demands and Objections. (DT) (dt, ).
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES.(DT)
August 20, 2018 JURY TRIAL DEMANDED by PRO SE PLAINTIFF EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY. (DT)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF THE PENNSYLVANIA COURTS, WILLIAM I. ARBUCKLE, RICHARD CHARLES CLINK, RICHARD H. D'AMBROSIA, THOMAS B. DARR, ROBERT EVANCHICK, BRADLEY J. GETZ, MALACHY EDWARD MANNION, PENNSYLVANIA BAR ASSOCIATION, PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE, PHILIP CARL PETRUS, THOMAS G. SAYLOR, THE UNIFIED JUDICIAL SYSTEM OF PENNSYLVANIA, filed by PRO SE PLAINTIFF EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Designation Form, Case Management Track Form)(DT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2018: #2 Envelope) (md, ).
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. (DT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KENNEDY v. GETZ, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF THE PENNSYLVANIA COURTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALACHY EDWARD MANNION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP CARL PETRUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD H. D'AMBROSIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNIFIED JUDICIAL SYSTEM OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA BAR ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD CHARLES CLINK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM I. ARBUCKLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS B. DARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRADLEY J. GETZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS G. SAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT EVANCHICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?