MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. DOE
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Case Number: 5:2018cv04272
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC of Service of Subpoena.(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 10/19/2018 (md).
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA. PLAINTIFF ESTABLISHED "GOOD "CAUSE" EXISTS TO SERVE A THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA ON RCN. ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 29, 2018, PLAINTIFF MAY SERVE RCN WITH A RULE 45 SUBPOENA REQUIRING RCN TO PROVIDE PLAINTIFF WITH DATA EVIDENCING OR IDENTIFYING THE LAST KNOWN NAME, ADDRESS, TELEPHONE NUMBER, AND E-MAIL ADDRESS OF THE PERSON TO WHOM RCN ASSIGNED AN IP ADDRESS AT ISSUE IN THE COMPLAINT. PLAINTIFF SHALL ATTACH A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE SUBPOENA UPONRCN. WITHOUT FURTHER LEAVE OF COURT, PLAINTIFF MAY NOT SERVE A RULE 45 SUBPOENA ON OTHER SERVICE PROVIDERS IDENTIFIED BY RCN IN RESPONSE TO THE SUBPOENA. IF RCN QUALIFIES AS A "CABLE OPERATOR" UNDER 4 7 U.S.C. 522(5), IT SHALL COMPLY WITH 47 U.S.C. 551(C)(2)(B) BY SENDING A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE PERSON IDENTIFIED WITH THE IP ADDRESS AT ISSUE IN THE COMPLAINT. PLAINTIFF MAY ONLY USE THE INFORMATION DISCLOSED IN RESPONSE TO A RULE 45 SUBPOENA SERVED ON RCN FOR THE PURPOSE OF ITS COMPLAINT TO SERVE THE APPROPRIATE PARTIES. PLAINTIFF MAY AMEND ITS COMPLAINT TO ADD DEFENDANTS NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 21, 2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 10/15/18. 10/15/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to File To Serve Third Party Subpoena filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Memorandum)(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(amas)
October 3, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (amas)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 185792.), filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Designation Form, #5 Case Management Track Form)(amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER P. FIORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?