STIPE et al v. CISSNA et al

Plaintiff: MICHAEL E. STIPE and ANA CASANDRA GALVEZ CHACON
Defendant: KATHY BAUSMAN, FRANCIS CISSNA and MICHAEL BORGEN
Case Number: 5:2018cv04339
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF 11/28/2018 THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED BY SIXTY DAYS THROUGH AND INCLUDING FEBRUARY 11, 2019. SIGNED BY JUDGE: EDWARD G. SMITH. 11/28/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (sg, )
October 5, 2018 Summons Issued as to KATHY BAUSMAN, MICHAEL BORGEN, FRANCIS CISSNA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Four Forwarded To: Counsel on 10/9/18, one given to AUSA (jwl, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KATHY BAUSMAN, MICHAEL BORGEN, FRANCIS CISSNA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 185945.), filed by MICHAEL E. STIPE, ANA CASANDRA GALVEZ CHACON.(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STIPE et al v. CISSNA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHY BAUSMAN
Represented By: LAUREN E. DEBRUICKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCIS CISSNA
Represented By: LAUREN E. DEBRUICKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL BORGEN
Represented By: LAUREN E. DEBRUICKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL E. STIPE
Represented By: CRAIG SHAGIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANA CASANDRA GALVEZ CHACON
Represented By: CRAIG SHAGIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?