GRAY v. CITY OF LANCASTER et al

Plaintiff: RONALD BRIAN GRAY
Defendant: CITY OF LANCASTER, OFFICER TIMOTHY SINNOT and OFFICER JAKE BINGHAM
Case Number: 5:2018cv04578
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: State Reapportionment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint filed by JAKE BINGHAM, CITY OF LANCASTER, TIMOTHY SINNOT.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(MACMAIN, DAVID)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TIMOTHY SINNOT, CITY OF LANCASTER, JAKE BINGHAM. TIMOTHY SINNOT waiver sent on 10/25/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (MACMAIN, DAVID)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TIMOTHY SINNOT, CITY OF LANCASTER, JAKE BINGHAM. CITY OF LANCASTER waiver sent on 10/25/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (MACMAIN, DAVID)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TIMOTHY SINNOT, CITY OF LANCASTER, JAKE BINGHAM. JAKE BINGHAM waiver sent on 10/25/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (MACMAIN, DAVID)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID J. MACMAIN on behalf of JAKE BINGHAM, CITY OF LANCASTER, TIMOTHY SINNOT with Certificate of Service(MACMAIN, DAVID)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW B. WEISBERG on behalf of RONALD BRIAN GRAY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(WEISBERG, MATTHEW)
October 24, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by RONALD BRIAN GRAY. (ahf)
October 24, 2018 Summons Issued as to JAKE BINGHAM, CITY OF LANCASTER, TIMOTHY SINNOT. 3 Forwarded To: Counsel on 10/25/2018 (ahf)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JAKE BINGHAM, CITY OF LANCASTER, TIMOTHY SINNOT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 186830.), filed by RONALD BRIAN GRAY.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAY v. CITY OF LANCASTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF LANCASTER
Represented By: DAVID J. MACMAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER TIMOTHY SINNOT
Represented By: DAVID J. MACMAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER JAKE BINGHAM
Represented By: DAVID J. MACMAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD BRIAN GRAY
Represented By: GARY SCHAFKOPF
Represented By: MATTHEW B. WEISBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?