LEZOTTE et al v. RONAK REALTY GROUP, LLC et al

Plaintiff: MARY LEZOTTE and DANIEL LEZOTTE
Defendant: RONAK REALTY GROUP, LLC and SRI GUNINA, LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv04621
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing:Please be advised that an initial pretrial conference has been scheduled before Judge Edward G. Smith in the above-captioned case. The conference will be held at the Holmes Building, 101 Larry Holmes Drive, 4th Floor, Easton, Pennsylvania 18042 on Friday, January 11, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. (sres, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by RONAK REALTY GROUP, LLC, SRI GUNINA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(EDWARDS, SHAWN)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 Praecipe to Withdraw Request for Default/Default Judgment by DANIEL LEZOTTE, MARY LEZOTTE. (ANDERSEN, BENJAMIN) Modified on 12/4/2018 (md).
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Default/Default Judgment DANIEL LEZOTTE, MARY LEZOTTE against All Defendants. (ANDERSEN, BENJAMIN) Modified on 12/3/2018 (md).
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman re: served Summons upon Krupa Patel, Controller (Sri Gunina LLC) by Personal on 11/07/2018 (ANDERSEN, BENJAMIN)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman re: served Summons upon Krupa Patel, Controller (Ronak Realty Group LLC) by Personal on 11/07/2018 (ANDERSEN, BENJAMIN)
October 26, 2018 Summons Issued as to RONAK REALTY GROUP, LLC, SRI GUNINA, LLC. Two Originals Forwarded To: Counsel on 10/29/18 (ti, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RONAK REALTY GROUP, LLC, SRI GUNINA, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 186922.), filed by DANIEL LEZOTTE, MARY LEZOTTE.(ti, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEZOTTE et al v. RONAK REALTY GROUP, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY LEZOTTE
Represented By: BENJAMIN A. ANDERSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL LEZOTTE
Represented By: BENJAMIN A. ANDERSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONAK REALTY GROUP, LLC
Represented By: SHAWN D EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRI GUNINA, LLC
Represented By: SHAWN D EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?