GONZALEZ v. BERRYHILL
Plaintiff: STACIE GONZALEZ
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 5:2018cv05187
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: LINDA K CARACAPPA
Referring Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (jl, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 Procedural Order 1/22/19 Entered and copies mailed and e-mailed. (jl, )
January 22, 2019 3 Summons Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: 2 TO U.S. MARSHAL; 1 TO U.S. ATTORNEY on 1/22/19 (jl, )
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/22/19.1/22/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE LINDA K. CARACAPPA TO HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 12/12/2018. 12/20/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent by STACIE GONZALEZ.. (DEXTER, JUDITH)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment. (Attachments: #1 Consent)(er, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL (IFP PENDING), filed by STACIE GONZALEZ.(er, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY STACIE GONZALEZ.DECLARATION.(er, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GONZALEZ v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACIE GONZALEZ
Represented By: JUDITH A. DEXTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?