LANCASTER v. MANOR CARE OF ALLENTOWN PA, LLC et al

Plaintiff: ROBIN LANCASTER
Defendant: HEARTLAND EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC and MANOR CARE OF ALLENTOWN PA, LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv05505
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michelle Kliner re: served Complaint upon Jackie Franklin by Personal on 2/6/2019 (BAIRD, GRAHAM)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corrected WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBIN LANCASTER. Waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (BAIRD, GRAHAM) Modified on 1/16/2019 (tjd).
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBIN LANCASTER. MANOR CARE OF ALLENTOWN PA, LLC waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (BAIRD, GRAHAM)
December 21, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ROBIN LANCASTER. (jwl, )
December 21, 2018 Summons Issued as to HEARTLAND EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC, MANOR CARE OF ALLENTOWN PA, LLC. Two Forwarded To: Counsel on 12/21/18 (jwl, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HEARTLAND EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC, MANOR CARE OF ALLENTOWN PA, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 189779.), filed by ROBIN LANCASTER.(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANCASTER v. MANOR CARE OF ALLENTOWN PA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEARTLAND EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANOR CARE OF ALLENTOWN PA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBIN LANCASTER
Represented By: GRAHAM F. BAIRD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?