BELL v. PHILLIPS FEED AND PET SUPPLY, N.E., LLC et al

Plaintiff: GREG BELL
Defendant: VALLEY PET SUPPLY, LLC, PHILLIPS FEED AND PET SUPPLY, N.E., LLC and PHILLIPS FOOD SERVICE, INC.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00085
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT AN ON THE RECORD INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) IS SCHEDULED FOR 4/4/2019 AT 9:30 A.M., BEFORE THE HON. CHAD F. KENNEY IN COURTROOM 6A, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILA., PA 19106, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 3/4/19. 3/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including THL Phillips Topco., L.P. with Certificate of Service by PHILLIPS FEED AND PET SUPPLY, N.E., LLC, PHILLIPS FOOD SERVICE, INC., VALLEY PET SUPPLY, LLC.(HOFMANN, JOSEPH)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Answer to Complaint With Affirmative Defenses by PHILLIPS FEED AND PET SUPPLY, N.E., LLC, PHILLIPS FOOD SERVICE, INC., VALLEY PET SUPPLY, LLC.(HOFMANN, JOSEPH)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 Corrected WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GREG BELL. Waiver sent to VALLEY PET SUPPLY, LLC on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (CHASE, JONATHAN) Modified on 1/16/2019 (tjd).
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GREG BELL. PHILLIPS FEED AND PET SUPPLY, N.E., LLC waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (CHASE, JONATHAN)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GREG BELL. PHILLIPS FOOD SERVICE, INC. waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (CHASE, JONATHAN)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GREG BELL. VALLEY PET SUPPLY, LLC waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (CHASE, JONATHAN)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTA LEVKO on behalf of GREG BELL (LEVKO, CHRISTA)
January 7, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GREG BELL. (jwl, )
January 7, 2019 Summons Issued as to PHILLIPS FEED AND PET SUPPLY, N.E., LLC, PHILLIPS FOOD SERVICE, INC., VALLEY PET SUPPLY, LLC. Three Forwarded To: Counsel on 1/8/19 (jwl, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PHILLIPS FEED AND PET SUPPLY, N.E., LLC, PHILLIPS FOOD SERVICE, INC., VALLEY PET SUPPLY, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 190551.), filed by GREG BELL.(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELL v. PHILLIPS FEED AND PET SUPPLY, N.E., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREG BELL
Represented By: JONATHAN W. CHASE
Represented By: CHRISTA LEVKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALLEY PET SUPPLY, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH P. HOFMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIPS FEED AND PET SUPPLY, N.E., LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH P. HOFMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIPS FOOD SERVICE, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH P. HOFMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?