DERR et al v. NORTHUMBERLAND COUNTY CHILDREN AND YOUTH SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: GRACE M. DERR, WILLIAM J. DERR and STEPHEN A. DERR
Defendant: NOURTHUMBERLAND COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, CATHY GEMBERLING, KIMBERLY BEST, JILL SNYDER, RICHARD J. SCHOCH, SHAWN HOMAN, NORTHUMBERLAND COUNTY CHILDREN AND YOUTH SERVICES, LISA SCHAFFERR, MARIE MILKE, SAMUEL J. SHICACATANO, AMANDA WILLIARD, KIMBERLY BILLS CARPENTER, KATRINA GOWNLEY, "SELISSA" MAUGER, MONIKA HOMAN, FAMILIES UNITED NETWORK and KATHY HOLLABAOUGH
Case Number: 5:2019cv00417
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 LETTER MAILED TO PRO SE PARTY REGARDING TRANSFER OF CASE (jl, )
February 1, 2019 Original record transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pa via inter-district transfer system. (fb)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FORTHWITH TRANSFER THIS CASE TO THE CLERK OF THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS SHALL BE LEFT TO THE DISCRETION OF THE TRANSFEREE COURT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE IN THIS DISTRICT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/31/19. 1/31/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(jl, )
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (mas, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against KIMBERLY BEST, KIMBERLY BILLS CARPENTER, FAMILIES UNITED NETWORK, CATHY GEMBERLING, KATRINA GOWNLEY, KATHY HOLLABAOUGH, MONIKA HOMAN, SHAWN HOMAN, "SELISSA" MAUGER, MARIE MILKE, NORTHUMBERLAND COUNTY CHILDREN AND YOUTH SERVICES, NOURTHUMBERLAND COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, LISA SCHAFFERR, RICHARD J. SCHOCH, SAMUEL J. SHICACATANO, JILL SNYDER, AMANDA WILLIARD, filed by WILLIAM J. DERR, GRACE M. DERR, STEPHEN A. DERR. IFP FILED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mas, ) Modified on 1/30/2019 (mas, ).
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS FILED BY STEPHEN A. DERR. AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF THE APPLICATION. (mas, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS FILED BY GRACE M. DERR, WILLIAM J. DERR. AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF THE APPLICATION. (mas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DERR et al v. NORTHUMBERLAND COUNTY CHILDREN AND YOUTH SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRACE M. DERR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM J. DERR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN A. DERR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOURTHUMBERLAND COUNTY COMMISSIONERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHY GEMBERLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY BEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JILL SNYDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD J. SCHOCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAWN HOMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHUMBERLAND COUNTY CHILDREN AND YOUTH SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA SCHAFFERR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIE MILKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL J. SHICACATANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANDA WILLIARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY BILLS CARPENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATRINA GOWNLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "SELISSA" MAUGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONIKA HOMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAMILIES UNITED NETWORK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHY HOLLABAOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?